Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center v. Hartford HealthCare Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center and Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center, INC
Defendant: Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Hospital, Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc. and Integrated Care Partners, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00050
Filed: January 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Fish, William)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until March 23, 2022to Reply #42 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center, Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center, INC. (Fish, William)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #38 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph Antel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6842253) by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., Hartford Hospital, Integrated Care Partners, LLC. (Staib, Karen)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #37 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joshua Obear to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6837731) by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., Hartford Hospital, Integrated Care Partners, LLC. (Staib, Karen)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #36 MOTION for Attorney(s) Eric Stock to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6837727) by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., Hartford Hospital, Integrated Care Partners, LLC. (Staib, Karen)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #35 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jamie France to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6837723) by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., Hartford Hospital, Integrated Care Partners, LLC. (Staib, Karen)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #34 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stephen Weissman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6837707) by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., Hartford Hospital, Integrated Care Partners, LLC. (Staib, Karen)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #39 MOTION for Attorney(s) Leo Caseria to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6842271) by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., Hartford Hospital, Integrated Care Partners, LLC. (Caseria, Leo)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #31 consent motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint to and including February 23, 2022, nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 03/01/22. (Covello, Alfred)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting the #40 motion for the pro hac vice admission of Attorney Thomas J. Dillickrath. Attorney Dillickrath shall provide a certificate of good standing on or before 4/30/2022. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 3/1/2022. (Sondergeld, C.)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting the #39 motion for the pro hac vice admission of Attorney Leo Caseria. Attorney Caseria shall provide a certificate of good standing on or before 4/30/2022. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 3/1/2022. (Sondergeld, C.)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting the #38 motion for the pro hac vice admission of Attorney Joseph Antel. Attorney Antel shall provide a certificate of good standing on or before 4/30/2022. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 3/1/2022. (Sondergeld, C.)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting the #37 motion for the pro hac vice admission of Attorney Joshua Obear. Attorney Obear shall provide a certificate of good standing on or before 4/30/2022. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 3/1/2022. (Sondergeld, C.)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting the #36 motion for the pro hac vice admission of Attorney Eric Stock. Attorney Stock shall provide a certificate of good standing on or before 4/30/2022. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 3/1/2022. (Sondergeld, C.)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting the #35 motion for the pro hac vice admission of Attorney Jamie France. Attorney France shall provide a certificate of good standing on or before 4/30/2022. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 3/1/2022. (Sondergeld, C.)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting the #34 motion for the pro hac vice admission of Attorney Stephen Weissman. Attorney Weissman shall provide a certificate of good standing on or before 4/30/2022. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 3/1/2022. (Sondergeld, C.)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Memorandum in Support re #42 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., Hartford Hospital, Integrated Care Partners, LLC. (Fahey, Patrick)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., Hartford Hospital, Integrated Care Partners, LLC.Responses due by 3/16/2022 (Fahey, Patrick)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Integrated Care Partners, LLC. (Fahey, Patrick)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Attorney(s) Thomas J. Dillickrath to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6842277) by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., Hartford Hospital, Integrated Care Partners, LLC. (Fahey, Patrick)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Attorney(s) Leo Caseria to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6842271) by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., Hartford Hospital, Integrated Care Partners, LLC. (Fahey, Patrick)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph Antel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6842253) by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., Hartford Hospital, Integrated Care Partners, LLC. (Fahey, Patrick)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joshua Obear to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6837731) by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., Hartford Hospital, Integrated Care Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Obear)(Staib, Karen)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for Attorney(s) Eric Stock to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6837727) by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., Hartford Hospital, Integrated Care Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Stock)(Staib, Karen)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jamie France to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6837723) by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., Hartford Hospital, Integrated Care Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. France)(Staib, Karen)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stephen Weissman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6837707) by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., Hartford Hospital, Integrated Care Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of S. Weissman)(Staib, Karen)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center.(Millinger, Alexa)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Fahey on behalf of Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., Hartford Hospital, Integrated Care Partners, LLC (Fahey, Patrick)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until February 23, 2022 to Respond To Complaint #1 Complaint, by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., Hartford Hospital, Integrated Care Partners, LLC. (Staib, Karen)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen T. Staib on behalf of Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., Hartford Hospital, Integrated Care Partners, LLC (Staib, Karen)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Fabien on behalf of Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center (Fabien, Paul)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Burandt on behalf of Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center (Burandt, Nicholas)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Ettinger on behalf of Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center (Ettinger, David)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nicholas A. Burandt to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6789707) by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center. (Fish, William)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Attorney Nicholas A. Burandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/19/2022. Signed by Clerk on 1/18/22. (Payton, R.)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Paul L. Fabien to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6789076) by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center. (Fish, William)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #14 MOTION for Attorney(s) David A. Ettinger to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6789089) by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center. (Fish, William)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by William S. Fish, Jr on behalf of Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center (Fish, William)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Attorney David A. Ettinger to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/14/2022. Signed by Clerk on 1/13/22. (Payton, R.)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Attorney Paul L. Fabien to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/14/2022. Signed by Clerk on 1/13/22. (Payton, R.)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Appearances, and Court Orders served on Integrated Care Partners, LLC on January 12, 2022, filed by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center. (Fish, William)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Appearances, and Court Orders served on Hartford Hospital on January 12, 2022, filed by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center. (Fish, William)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Appearances, and Court Orders served on Hartford Healthcare Corporation on January 12, 2022, filed by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center. (Fish, William)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Appearances, and Court Orders served on Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc. on January 12, 2022, filed by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center. (Fish, William)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nicholas A. Burandt to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6789707) by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Fish, William)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) David A. Ettinger to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6789089) by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Fish, William)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Paul L. Fabien to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6789076) by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Fish, William)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 01/12/2022.(Fazekas, J.)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Integrated Care Partners, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *William S. Fish, Jr.* *Hinckley Allen Snyder LLP - Htfd* *20 Church St.* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Fazekas, J.)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hartford Hospital* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *William S. Fish, Jr.* *Hinckley Allen Snyder LLP - Htfd* *20 Church St.* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Fazekas, J.)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *William S. Fish, Jr.* *Hinckley Allen Snyder LLP - Htfd* *20 Church St.* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Fazekas, J.)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hartford HealthCare Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *William S. Fish, Jr.* *Hinckley Allen Snyder LLP - Htfd* *20 Church St.* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Fazekas, J.)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Alexa Talin Millinger on behalf of Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Jeffrey J. Mirman on behalf of Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center Signed by Clerk on 01/12/2022.(Fazekas, J.)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 01/11/2022.(Fazekas, J.)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/12/2022. Discovery due by 7/13/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 8/17/2022. Signed by Clerk on 01/11/2022.(Fazekas, J.)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center identifying Corporate Parent Trinity Health of New England Corporation, Inc., Other Affiliate Trinity Health Corporation, Other Affiliate Catholic Health Ministries for Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center. (Fish, William)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexa Talin Millinger on behalf of Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center (Millinger, Alexa)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Mirman on behalf of Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center (Mirman, Jeffrey)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc., Hartford Hospital, Integrated Care Partners, LLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6786099.), filed by Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center.(Fish, William)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Hartford HealthCare Corporation. (Fish, William)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Hartford Hospital. (Fish, William)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Oliver, T.)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Integrated Care Partners, LLC. (Fish, William)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc.. (Fish, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center v. Hartford HealthCare Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center
Represented By: Alexa Talin Millinger
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Mirman
Represented By: William S. Fish, Jr.
Represented By: David A. Ettinger
Represented By: Paul Fabien
Represented By: Nicholas Burandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saint Francis Hospital and Medical Center, INC
Represented By: Alexa Talin Millinger
Represented By: David A. Ettinger
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Mirman
Represented By: Nicholas Burandt
Represented By: Paul Fabien
Represented By: William S. Fish, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford HealthCare Corporation
Represented By: Karen T. Staib
Represented By: Patrick M. Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Hospital
Represented By: Karen T. Staib
Represented By: Patrick M. Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Healthcare Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Karen T. Staib
Represented By: Patrick M. Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrated Care Partners, LLC
Represented By: Karen T. Staib
Represented By: Patrick M. Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?