Maguire v. Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Kane Maguire
Defendant: Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC, AMPF Holding, LLC, Anthony Joseph Salerno, James J. Flaherty Jr., AMPF Holding LLC and James J. Flaherty, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00128
Filed: January 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RESPONSE re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by James J. Flaherty, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Flaherty Affidavit and Exhibits), #2 Exhibit B (Return of Service), #3 Exhibit C (Hold Letter))(Barbarula, Michael)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 RESPONSE re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by AMPF Holding LLC, Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC, Anthony Joseph Salerno. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Reiling declaration))(Ringold, James)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Memorandum in Opposition re #30 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Patricia Kane Maguire. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Patricia Kane Maguire)(Pastore, Joseph)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #33 Motion for Extension of Time and #35 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court extends the deadline for the parties to meet and confer, and then to file, a Rule 26(f) report until thirty (30) days after the Court rules on the pending motion to compel arbitration, ECF No. 30. Discovery otherwise shall proceed with regard to the motion for a prejudgment remedy, ECF No. 6. As raised in an oral motion before the Court today in a status conference, see ECF No. 42, the Court also extends the deadline for James J. Flaherty, Esq., to file a responsive pleading for fourteen (14) days, until March 28th, 2022. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/14/2022. (Dalton, A.)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Status Conference held on 3/14/2022. Total Time: 0 hours and 21 minutes (Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Dalton, Ashley)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Memorandum in Opposition to Ameriprise Defendants re #35 MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 days after a ruling on the Motion to Compel to (1) meet and confer regarding and (2) file a Rule 26(f) report filed by Patricia Kane Maguire. (Pastore, Joseph)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 REPLY to Response to #32 MOTION for Disclosure of Assets filed by Patricia Kane Maguire. (Pastore, Joseph)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Status Conference via videoconference set for 3/14/2022 11:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Zoom information to follow. (Dalton, A.)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Conference. The Court will hold a status conference via videoconference on Monday, March 14, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. The Court notes that, in setting the status conference for this date and time, it did so with awareness of the pending deadlines in the case. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/4/2022. (Dalton, A.)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE regarding hearing via Zoom: The Status Conference scheduled for 3/14/2022 at 11:00 am will be conducted via Zoom. The video link is https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1619233763?pwd=TExPRDVZdlN1aU9rUG1FMUVtckswdz09 and call in number is +1 646 828 7666.Meeting ID: 161 923 3763 Meeting Password: 773443Please note: Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, screenshots, streaming, and rebroadcasting in any form, of court proceedings. The Judicial Conference of the United States, which governs the practices of the federal courts, has prohibited it. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. (Dalton, Ashley)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Memorandum in Opposition re #33 MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 days after a decision on Motion to Compel Arbitrationfor the filing of responsive pleading and response to PJR Application 27 Order, 19 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,, filed by Patricia Kane Maguire. (Pastore, Joseph)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Consent MOTION for Status Conference by AMPF Holding LLC, Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC, Anthony Joseph Salerno. (Conway, John)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 days after a ruling on the Motion to Compel to (1) meet and confer regarding and (2) file a Rule 26(f) report by AMPF Holding LLC, Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC, Anthony Joseph Salerno. (Conway, John)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 OBJECTION re #32 MOTION for Disclosure of Assets filed by James J. Flaherty, Jr. (Barbarula, Michael)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 days after a decision on Motion to Compel Arbitrationfor the filing of responsive pleading and response to PJR Application 27 Order, 19 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,, by James J. Flaherty, Jr. (Barbarula, Michael)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Disclosure of Assets by Patricia Kane Maguire. (Pastore, Joseph)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C Barbarula on behalf of James J. Flaherty, Jr (Barbarula, Michael)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by AMPF Holding LLC, Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC, Anthony Joseph Salerno.Responses due by 3/17/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A (Salerno declaration), #3 Exhibit A-1 (Delaware conversion filings), #4 Exhibit A-2 (SPS Agreement), #5 Exhibit A-3 (Brokerage Agreement), #6 Exhibit A-4 (Application), #7 Exhibit A-5 (Letter))(Ringold, James)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RICO Case Statement by Patricia Kane Maguire. (Pastore, Joseph)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Order to Show Cause. Responses due by 3/18/2022 (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. Based on the status report, ECF No. 26, the Court extends the deadline for a response to the motion for a temporary restraining order and/or prejudgment remedy until March 18, 2022. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/8/2022. (Dalton, A.)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Joint STATUS REPORT by Patricia Kane Maguire. (Pastore, Joseph)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Leanne Murray Shofi on behalf of Patricia Kane Maguire (Shofi, Leanne)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Set Deadlines/Hearings:( Status Report due by 2/7/2022), Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Order to Show Cause.(Responses due by 2/14/2022 ) (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER. As discussed in a scheduling conference today, see ECF No. 21 , the parties shall, by February 7, 2022, file a joint status report with the Court. Responses to the motion for a prejudgment remedy, ECF No. #6 , will be due by February 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/31/2022. (Dalton, A.)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Scheduling and Status Conference held on 1/31/2022. Total Time: 0 hours and 8 minutes(Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Dalton, A.)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Status and Scheduling Conference via videoconference set for 1/31/2022 11:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT. Zoom information to follow. (Dalton, A.)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 and #17 Motions for Extension of Time. The Court extends the deadline to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint until thirty (30) days from the date that the Plaintiff files a RICO Case Statement.The Court further will hold a status conference via videoconference on Monday, January 31, 2022 at 11:00 am EST, solely to discuss additional scheduling matters in this case. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/28/2022. (Dalton, A.)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE regarding hearing via Zoom: The Status and Scheduling Conference scheduled for 1/31/2022 at 11:00 am will be conducted via Zoom. The video link is https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1610565143?pwd=V3BHRkFKcmMwMUY0dzZrMXR6RGswQT09 and call in number is +1 646 828 7666.Meeting ID: 161 056 5143 Meeting Password: 391310Please note: Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, screenshots, streaming, and rebroadcasting in any form, of court proceedings. The Judicial Conference of the United States, which governs the practices of the federal courts, has prohibited it. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. (Dalton, A.)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/27/2022.(Perez, J.)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Victor A. Bolden for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/27/2022.(LaLone, L.)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time until Thirty (30) Days After the Plaintiff Files a RICO Case Statement in Which To Plead in Response to the Complaint by James J. Flaherty, Jr. (Zellner, Jonathan)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until Thirty (30) days from the date that the Plaintiff Files a RICO Case Statement To File Responsive Pleading to Complaint by AMPF Holding LLC, Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC, Anthony Joseph Salerno. (Conway, John)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Zellner on behalf of James J. Flaherty, Jr (Zellner, Jonathan)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Ryan on behalf of James J. Flaherty, Jr (Ryan, Michael)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Pastore on behalf of Patricia Kane Maguire (Pastore, Joseph)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 01/25/2022.(Fazekas, J.)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Notice of Pending Motions filed by Anthony Joseph Salerno, AMPF Holding LLC, Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC, #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Patricia Kane Maguire, #2 Notice Pursuant to Standing Order on Removed Cases filed by Anthony Joseph Salerno, AMPF Holding LLC, Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Anthony Joseph Salerno, AMPF Holding LLC, Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC, #10 Standing Protective Order, #9 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by John F. Conway on behalf of Anthony Joseph Salerno, AMPF Holding LLC, Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC, #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 01/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMPF Holding, LLC, Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ameriprise Financial, Inc. for AMPF Holding, LLC; Corporate Parent AMPF Holding LLC for Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC. (Ringold, James)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James Efrem Ringold on behalf of AMPF Holding, LLC, Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC, Anthony Joseph Salerno (Ringold, James)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 01/24/2022.(Fazekas, J.)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 01/24/2022.(Fazekas, J.)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/25/2022. Discovery due by 7/26/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2022. Signed by Clerk on 01/24/2022.(Fazekas, J.)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy, Temporary Injunction, Preliminary Injunction (Responses due by 2/14/2022, ), Order to Show Cause by Patricia Kane Maguire. (Hushin, Z.)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Conway on behalf of AMPF Holding, LLC, Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC, Anthony Joseph Salerno (Conway, John)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE by AMPF Holding, LLC, Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC, Anthony Joseph Salerno Notice of Pending Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (pending state court motion and related orders))(Ringold, James)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE by AMPF Holding, LLC, Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC, Anthony Joseph Salerno Pursuant to Standing Order on Removed Cases (Ringold, James)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Anthony Joseph Salerno, AMPF Holding, LLC, Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC from Connecticut Superior Court, Judicial District of Stamford, case number FST-CV22-6054931-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6802166, filed by Anthony Joseph Salerno, AMPF Holding, LLC, Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (state court summons and complaint))(Ringold, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maguire v. Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Kane Maguire
Represented By: Joseph Pastore
Represented By: Leanne Murray Shofi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: John F. Conway
Represented By: James Efrem Ringold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMPF Holding, LLC
Represented By: John F. Conway
Represented By: James Efrem Ringold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Joseph Salerno
Represented By: John F. Conway
Represented By: James Efrem Ringold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J. Flaherty Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMPF Holding LLC
Represented By: John F. Conway
Represented By: James Efrem Ringold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J. Flaherty, Jr.
Represented By: Michael T. Ryan
Represented By: Jonathan Zellner
Represented By: Michael C Barbarula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?