McMeans et al v. Navient Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Flora McMeans and Jason McMeans
Defendant: Navient Solutions, LLC, Sallie Mae and U.S. Department of Education
Case Number: 3:2022cv00294
Filed: February 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Approved. So ORDERED re #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Jason McMeans, Flora McMeans. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 4/14/2022. (Rickevicius, L.)
April 14, 2022 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (LaLone, L.)
April 13, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of THE PLAINTIFFS by All Plaintiffs (Inga, Hide)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Consent Motion for Extension of time to 4/22/2022 to respond to plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 03/22/2022. (Rickevicius, L.)
March 22, 2022 Answer deadline updated for Navient Solutions, LLC to 4/22/2022; Sallie Mae to 4/22/2022; U.S. Department of Education to 4/22/2022. (Rickevicius, L.)
March 21, 2022 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time until Up to and including April 22, 2022 Defendant's reply to the Complaint by Flora McMeans, Jason McMeans. (Inga, Hide)
March 10, 2022 Filing 7 First CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Flora McMeans, Jason McMeans SUPPLEMENTAL RETURN OF SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Inga, Hide)
March 10, 2022 Filing 6 First AFFIDAVIT of Service for SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT served on LEGAL ASSISTANT U.S ATTORNEY, SECRETARY OF NAVIENT CORPORATION, AGENT FOR SALLIE MAE on 02/28/2022, filed by Flora McMeans, Jason McMeans. (Inga, Hide)
February 24, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Navient Solutions, LLC, Sallie Mae, U.S. Department of Education* with answer to complaint due within *30* days. Attorney *Hide W. Inga* *John Q. Gale, LLC* *363 Main St. 4th Floor* *Hartford, CT 06106*. (LaLone, L.)
February 24, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Jason McMeans, Flora McMeans, #3 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 2/24/2022.(LaLone, L.)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 2/24/2022.(LaLone, L.)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 2/24/2022.(LaLone, L.)
February 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6843445.), filed by Flora McMeans, Jason McMeans.(Inga, Hide) Modified on 2/24/2022 to correct filers and filed against parties (Hushin, Z.).
February 24, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Inga, Hide)
February 24, 2022 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMeans et al v. Navient Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flora McMeans
Represented By: Hide W. Inga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason McMeans
Represented By: Hide W. Inga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navient Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sallie Mae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?