Cortese v. Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership et al
Plaintiff: Vito Cortese
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, East Windsor Properties, L.P., Big Y Foods, Inc. and Prospect Hill Properties, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00408
Filed: March 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Charles S Haight
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Blumberg, Michael)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas M. Connors on behalf of East Windsor Properties, L.P., Prospect Hill Properties, L.P. (Connors, Douglas)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan J. O'Donnell on behalf of Big Y Foods, Inc. (O'Donnell, Susan)
March 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership Service of Court Orders in Removed Cases (Springer, George)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, #4 Answer to Complaint filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, #6 Notice (Other) filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, #8 Notice of Appearance filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #10 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 3/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals)(Reis, Julia)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 3/19/2022. (Reis, Julia)
March 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/18/2022. Discovery due by 9/18/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 10/23/2022. Signed by Clerk on 3/19/2022. (Reis, Julia)
March 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr added. (Freberg, B)
March 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Blumberg on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership (Blumberg, Michael)
March 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership identifying Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC for Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership. (Springer, George)
March 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership Statement Regarding Removed Case Per Local Standing Orders (Springer, George)
March 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership Pending Motions (Springer, George)
March 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership.(Springer, George)
March 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership Certificate of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court (Springer, George)
March 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by George C. Springer, Jr on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership (Springer, George)
March 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership from Hartford, case number HHD-CV22-6152485-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6870820, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership.(Springer, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cortese v. Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vito Cortese
Represented By: Paul M. Iannaccone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Represented By: Michael D. Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Windsor Properties, L.P.
Represented By: Douglas M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Y Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Susan J. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prospect Hill Properties, L.P.
Represented By: Douglas M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?