Taylor v. New Haven et al
Plaintiff: Kenroy Taylor
Defendant: City of New Haven, Otoneil Reyes, Renee Dominguez, Stephen Torquati, Mark O'Neil, Christopher Cameron, Carlos Conceica, Edward Dunford, Martin Feliciano and Louis Decrescenzo
Case Number: 3:2022cv00533
Filed: April 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The defendants' Emergency First Motion for Extension of Time with Consent (ECF No. #10 ) is hereby GRANTED. The defendants shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by June 30, 2022. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 06/01/2022. (Ghinaglia Socorro, F.)
June 1, 2022 Answer deadline updated for Christopher Cameron to 6/30/2022; Carlos Conceica to 6/30/2022; Louis Decrescenzo to 6/30/2022; Renee Dominguez to 6/30/2022; Edward Dunford to 6/30/2022; Martin Feliciano to 6/30/2022; City of New Haven to 6/30/2022; Mark O'Neil to 6/30/2022; Otoneil Reyes to 6/30/2022; Stephen Torquati to 6/30/2022. (Ferguson, L.)
May 31, 2022 Filing 10 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time until June 30, 2022(with consent) to answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiffs Complaint #1 Complaint by Christopher Cameron, Carlos Conceica, Louis Decrescenzo, Renee Dominguez, Edward Dunford, Martin Feliciano, City of New Haven, Mark O'Neil, Otoneil Reyes, Stephen Torquati. (Sheehan, Cristin)
May 31, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Cristin E. Sheehan on behalf of Christopher Cameron, Carlos Conceica, Louis Decrescenzo, Renee Dominguez, Edward Dunford, Martin Feliciano, City of New Haven, Mark O'Neil, Otoneil Reyes, Stephen Torquati (Sheehan, Cristin)
May 16, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenroy Taylor. Kenroy Taylor served on 5/10/2022, answer due 5/31/2022. (Atkinson, Cameron)
April 13, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Christopher Cameron, Carlos Conceica, Louis Decrescenzo, Renee Dominguez, Edward Dunford, Martin Feliciano, City of New Haven, Mark O'Neil, Otoneil Reyes, Stephen Torquati* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Cameron Lee Atkinson* *Pattis & Smith, LLC* *383 Orange Street* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (LaLone, L.)
April 13, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Kenroy Taylor, #5 Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 4/13/2022.(LaLone, L.)
April 12, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE re: Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 4/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Initial Discovery Protocol Attachment)(LaLone, L.)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 4/12/2022.(LaLone, L.)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 4/12/2022.(LaLone, L.)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/11/2022 Discovery due by 10/12/2022 Dispositive Motions due by 11/16/2022 Signed by Clerk on 4/12/2022.(LaLone, L.)
April 12, 2022 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Freberg, B)
April 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6898455.), filed by Kenroy Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Atkinson, Cameron)
April 12, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Atkinson, Cameron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. New Haven et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenroy Taylor
Represented By: Cameron Lee Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New Haven
Represented By: Cristin E. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otoneil Reyes
Represented By: Cristin E. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Dominguez
Represented By: Cristin E. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Torquati
Represented By: Cristin E. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark O'Neil
Represented By: Cristin E. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Cameron
Represented By: Cristin E. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Conceica
Represented By: Cristin E. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Dunford
Represented By: Cristin E. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Feliciano
Represented By: Cristin E. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Decrescenzo
Represented By: Cristin E. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?