CM Systems, LLC v. TransAct Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: CM Systems, LLC
Defendant: TransAct Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00624
Filed: May 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2022 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Charles Landrum to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6983081) by CM Systems, LLC. (Rosenberg, Aaron)
July 1, 2022 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert Gravois to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6983070) by CM Systems, LLC. (Rosenberg, Aaron)
July 1, 2022 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew Crain to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6983040) by CM Systems, LLC. (Rosenberg, Aaron)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Attorney Andrew Crain to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #18 Motion for Attorney Robert Gravois to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #19 Motion for Attorney Charles Landrum to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificates of Good Standing due by 8/30/2022. Signed by Clerk on 7/1/2022. (Freberg, B)
June 30, 2022 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Neal M. Cohen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6981627) by TransAct Technologies, Inc.. (Park, Woo)
June 30, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Charles Landrum to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6983081) by CM Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Landrum Declaration)(Rosenberg, Aaron)
June 30, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert Gravois to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6983070) by CM Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Gravois Declaration)(Rosenberg, Aaron)
June 30, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew Crain to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6983040) by CM Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Crain Declaration)(Rosenberg, Aaron)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear pro hac vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/29/2022. Signed by Clerk on 6/30/2022. (Lewis, D)
June 29, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Neal M. Cohen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6981627) by TransAct Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Park, Woo)
June 7, 2022 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/15/2022 (Lewis, D)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 10, 2022 to respond to the Complaint #1 Complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/2/2022. (Lewis, D)
June 2, 2022 Answer deadline updated for TransAct Technologies, Inc. to 7/10/2022. (Lewis, D)
June 1, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 10, 2022 to respond to the Complaint #1 Complaint, by TransAct Technologies, Inc.. (Alquist, Elizabeth)
June 1, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Woo Sin Sean Park on behalf of TransAct Technologies, Inc. (Park, Woo)
June 1, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Alquist on behalf of TransAct Technologies, Inc. (Alquist, Elizabeth)
May 23, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CM Systems, LLC. TransAct Technologies, Inc. served on 5/20/2022, answer due 6/10/2022. (Rosenberg, Aaron)
May 18, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *TransAct Technologies, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Aaron Davis Rosenberg* *Sheehan Phinney Bass & Green* *28 State Street, 22nd Floor* *Boston, MA 02109*. (Freberg, B)
May 16, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to TransAct Technologies, Inc.. (Rosenberg, Aaron)
May 4, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Report on Patent/Trademark Form, #5 Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Order, #1 Complaint, filed by CM Systems, LLC Signed by Clerk on 5/4/2022.(Freberg, B)
May 3, 2022 Filing 7 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (Freberg, B)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER RE DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/3/2022.(Freberg, B)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/3/2022.(Freberg, B)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/3/2022.(Freberg, B)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/2/2022; Discovery due by 11/2/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 12/7/2022. Signed by Clerk on 5/3/2022.(Freberg, B)
May 3, 2022 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.)
May 3, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CM Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent RM Systems, Inc. for CM Systems, LLC. (Rosenberg, Aaron)
May 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TransAct Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6921502.), filed by CM Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A ('788 Patent), #2 Exhibit Ex. B ('020 Patent), #3 Exhibit Ex. C (Preliminary Exemplary Claim Chart), #4 Exhibit Ex. D (Preliminary Exemplary Claim Chart), #5 Appendix Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosenberg, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CM Systems, LLC v. TransAct Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CM Systems, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Davis Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransAct Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Alquist
Represented By: Woo Sin Sean Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?