Ligeri et al v. Tischer et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Ligeri, Central Concepts, Inc. and Benjamin Joseph Ligeri
Defendant: Joshua Tischer, Optimistic Investments, LLC and Michael Murphy
Case Number: 3:2022cv00629
Filed: May 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi- bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Fanelle, N.)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. Though docketed as a motion, Plaintiffs' #16 Motion to Withdraw is a Notice of Dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is directed to close this file. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/10/2022. (Banker, Joshua)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw #1 Complaint with prejudice - case settled by Central Concepts, Inc., Benjamin Joseph Ligeri. (Chan, Paulus)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 6/16/2022. Hearing set for 7/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom Four-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Kari A. Dooley. (Banker, Joshua)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. The Hearing on Plaintiffs' #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is continued to July 12, 2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Annex, 915 Lafayette Boulevard, Bridgeport, Connecticut. Plaintiffs shall serve the Defendants in accordance with the Court's Order at ECF No. #8 on or before June 2, 2022. In making such service, Plaintiffs shall also provide notice of the continued hearing date to Defendants. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/20/2022. (Banker, Joshua)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until June 2, 2022 (service) and Hearing TBD by Courtto facilitate settlement discussions and effectuate service Complete Service/Hearing on Injunction 11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, by Central Concepts, Inc., Benjamin Joseph Ligeri. (Chan, Paulus)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 5/23/2022. Hearing set for 6/16/2022 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom Four-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Kari A. Dooley. (Banker, Joshua)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting nunc pro tunc #10 Motion for Extension of Time. The Hearing on Plaintiffs' #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is continued to June 16, 2022 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 4 - Annex, 915 Lafayette Boulevard, Bridgeport, Connecticut. Plaintiffs shall serve the Defendants in accordance with the Court's Order at ECF No. #8 on or before May 23, 2022. In making such service, Plaintiffs shall also provide notice of the continued hearing date to Defendants. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/17/2022. (Banker, Joshua)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time until Mid June, if Necessaryand to continue hearing on Injunction as parties are in active settlement talks To file return of service re TRO #7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and for Temporary Injunction after hearing on the merits, #8 Order, 9 Notice of Hearing on Motion, by Central Concepts, Inc., Benjamin Joseph Ligeri. (Chan, Paulus)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing on Plaintiffs' #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The parties shall appear for a motion hearing on May 23, 2022 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom Four-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Kari A. Dooley. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/6/2022. (Banker, Joshua)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. The Court shall schedule a hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction per the attached order. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/6/2022. (Banker, Joshua)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and for Temporary Injunction after hearing on the merits by Central Concepts, Inc., Benjamin Joseph Ligeri. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of TRO and Temp Injunction, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit)(Chan, Paulus)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Michael Murphy, Optimistic Investments, LLC, Joshua Tischer* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Paulus Chan* *Law offices of Paulus H Chan LLC* *157 Forest Hill Road* *North Haven, CT 06473*. (Fanelle, N.)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Central Concepts, Inc., Benjamin Joseph Ligeri Signed by Clerk on 5/5/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Chan, Paulus)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/4/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/4/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/3/2022 Discovery due by 11/3/2022 Dispositive Motions due by 12/8/2022 Signed by Clerk on 5/4/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Freberg, B)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint seeking TRO and Injunctive Relief in Addition to Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6922871.), filed by Benjamin Ligeri, Central Concepts, Inc..(Chan, Paulus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ligeri et al v. Tischer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Ligeri
Represented By: Paulus Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Concepts, Inc.
Represented By: Paulus Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Joseph Ligeri
Represented By: Paulus Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Tischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optimistic Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?