Pravin v. Exactech Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Faina Pravin
Defendant: Exactech Inc., Exactech US Inc., Exactech, Inc. and Exactech, U.S., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00682
Filed: May 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2022 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Exactech US Inc., Exactech, Inc., Exactech, U.S., Inc.. (Polglase, Holly)
June 30, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Exactech US Inc., Exactech, Inc., Exactech, U.S., Inc..Responses due by 7/21/2022 (Polglase, Holly)
June 22, 2022 Response deadline updated for Exactech US Inc. to 6/30/2022; Exactech, Inc. to 6/30/2022; Exactech, U.S., Inc. to 6/30/2022. (Alexander, R.)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 consent motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint to and including June 30, 2022. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 06/22/22. (Codeanne, K.)
June 21, 2022 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until June 30, 2022 to file Response to the Complaint by Exactech, Inc., Exactech, U.S., Inc.. (Polglase, Holly)
June 21, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Exactech, U.S., Inc.. (Polglase, Holly)
June 21, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Exactech, Inc.. (Polglase, Holly)
June 21, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly M. Polglase on behalf of Exactech, Inc. (Polglase, Holly)
June 21, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly M. Polglase on behalf of Exactech, U.S., Inc. (Polglase, Holly)
May 23, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Exactech US Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Neal Lewis Moskow* *Ury & Moskow* *883 Black Rock Turnpike* *Fairfield, CT 06825*. (Mendez, D)
May 23, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Exactech, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Neal Lewis Moskow* *Ury & Moskow* *883 Black Rock Turnpike* *Fairfield, CT 06825*. (Mendez, D)
May 23, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Faina Pravin, #3 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 5/23/2022. (Mendez, D)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 5/19/2022. (Mendez, D)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/18/2022. Discovery due by 11/18/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 12/23/2022. Signed by Clerk on 5/19/2022. (Mendez, D)
May 19, 2022 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Oliver, T.)
May 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6938764.), filed by Faina Pravin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moskow, Neal)
May 19, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Exactech Inc.. (Moskow, Neal)
May 19, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Exactech US Inc.. (Moskow, Neal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pravin v. Exactech Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faina Pravin
Represented By: Neal Lewis Moskow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech US Inc.
Represented By: Holly M. Polglase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech, Inc.
Represented By: Holly M. Polglase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech, U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Holly M. Polglase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?