Assa Abloy AB et al v. CPC Patent Technologies Pty. Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Assa Abloy AB, Assa Abloy Inc., Assa Abloy Residential Group, Inc., August Home, Inc., HID Global Corporation and Assa Abloy Global Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: CPC Patent Technologies Pty. Ltd. and Charter Pacific Corporation Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00694
Filed: May 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Natalie A. Bennett to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7006098) by Assa Abloy AB, Assa Abloy Global Solutions, Inc., Assa Abloy Inc., Assa Abloy Residential Group, Inc., August Home, Inc., HID Global Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Blanchard, Michael)
June 10, 2022 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Charter Pacific Corporation Ltd. waiver sent on 5/25/2022, answer due 8/23/2022 filed by Assa Abloy AB. (Chartier, AnnMarie)
June 10, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to CPC Patent Technologies Pty. Ltd. waiver sent on 5/25/2022, answer due 8/23/2022 filed by Assa Abloy AB. (Chartier, AnnMarie)
May 25, 2022 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *CPC Patent Technologies Pty. Ltd., Charter Pacific Corporation Ltd.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael D. Blanchard* *Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP - Htfd, CT* *One State St.* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Peterson, M)
May 25, 2022 Filing 10 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits) (Peterson, M)
May 25, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Assa Abloy AB, Assa Abloy Global Solutions, Inc., Assa Abloy Inc., August Home, Inc., HID Global Corporation, Assa Abloy Residential Group, Inc., #3 Notice (Other), filed by Assa Abloy AB, Assa Abloy Global Solutions, Inc., Assa Abloy Inc., August Home, Inc., HID Global Corporation, Assa Abloy Residential Group, Inc., #6 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint,, filed by Assa Abloy AB, Assa Abloy Global Solutions, Inc., Assa Abloy Inc., August Home, Inc., HID Global Corporation, Assa Abloy Residential Group, Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Assa Abloy AB, Assa Abloy Global Solutions, Inc., Assa Abloy Inc., August Home, Inc., HID Global Corporation, Assa Abloy Residential Group, Inc., #7 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 05/25/2022. (Peterson, M)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Standing Order on Patent Cases Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 05/23/2022. (Peterson, M)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 05/23/2022. (Peterson, M)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 05/23/2022. (Peterson, M)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/22/2022. Discovery due by 11/22/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 12/27/2022. Signed by Clerk on 05/23/2022. (Peterson, M)
May 23, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Assa Abloy AB, Assa Abloy Global Solutions, Inc., Assa Abloy Inc., Assa Abloy Residential Group, Inc., August Home, Inc., HID Global Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Assa Abloy Inc. for Assa Abloy Global Solutions, Inc., Assa Abloy Residential Group, Inc., August Home, Inc., HID Global Corporation. (Blanchard, Michael)
May 23, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by Assa Abloy AB, Assa Abloy Global Solutions, Inc., Assa Abloy Inc., Assa Abloy Residential Group, Inc., August Home, Inc., HID Global Corporation of Filing Report or Determination of An Action Regarding a Patent (Blanchard, Michael)
May 23, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Blanchard on behalf of Assa Abloy AB, Assa Abloy Global Solutions, Inc., Assa Abloy Inc., Assa Abloy Residential Group, Inc., August Home, Inc., HID Global Corporation (Blanchard, Michael)
May 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CPC Patent Technologies Pty. Ltd., Charter Pacific Corporation Ltd. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6941946.), filed by Assa Abloy Global Solutions, Inc., Assa Abloy Residential Group, Inc., Assa Abloy Inc., Assa Abloy AB, August Home, Inc., HID Global Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Civil Cover Sheet)(Blanchard, Michael)
May 23, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Charter Pacific Corporation Ltd.. (Blanchard, Michael)
May 23, 2022 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)
May 23, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to CPC Patent Technologies Pty. Ltd.. (Blanchard, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Assa Abloy AB et al v. CPC Patent Technologies Pty. Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Assa Abloy AB
Represented By: Michael D. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Assa Abloy Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Assa Abloy Residential Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: August Home, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HID Global Corporation
Represented By: Michael D. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Assa Abloy Global Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPC Patent Technologies Pty. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Pacific Corporation Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?