U.S. Bank National Association v. Brown et al
Defendant: Morgan C. Brown and Danita Hair Brown
Cross Defendant: Morgan C Brown, III, Danita H Brown and Shearson American Express Mortgage Corp.
Counter Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo & Company, Household Realty Corporation, City of Stamford and Connecticut Department of Revenue Services
Cross Claimant: Internal Revenue Service and USA
Case Number: 3:2022cv00788
Filed: June 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Omar A Williams
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2022 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Answer with Crossclaim served on Danita H. Brown on 8/11/2022, filed by Danita H Brown. (Nunez, Jeffrey)
August 15, 2022 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Answer with Crossclaim served on Morgan C. Brown on 8/11/2022, filed by Morgan C Brown, III. (Nunez, Jeffrey)
August 15, 2022 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Answer with Counterclaim served on City of Stamford on 8/12/2022, filed by USA. (Nunez, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2022 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Answer with Counterclaim served on Shearson/American Express Mortgage Corporation C/O GE Capital Mortgage Services, Inc. C/O General Electric Company on 8/9/2022, filed by USA. (Nunez, Jeffrey)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting ECF No. #15 , Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file a Local Rule 26(f) Report on or before October 7, 2022. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 8/8/22. (Wagner, Rebecca)
August 8, 2022 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/7/2022 (Wagner, Rebecca)
August 5, 2022 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Shearson American Express Mortgage Corp. served on 8/4/2022, answer due 8/25/2022. (Nunez, Jeffrey)
August 5, 2022 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Household Realty Corporation served on 8/4/2022, answer due 8/25/2022. (Nunez, Jeffrey)
August 5, 2022 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. U.S. Bank National Association served on 8/4/2022, answer due 8/25/2022. (Nunez, Jeffrey)
August 4, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Morgan C Brown, III (Sklarz, Jeffrey)
August 4, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/07/2022 to file a Rule 26(f) Report Set Deadlines/Hearings by U.S. Bank National Association. (Forcella, Victoria)
August 2, 2022 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Danita H Brown, Morgan C Brown, III, City of Stamford, Connecticut Department of Revenue Services, Household Realty Corporation, Shearson American Express Mortgage Corp., U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo & Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jeffrey Nathan Nunez* *US Department of Justice - Tax Division* *Ben Franklin Station, PO Box 7328* *Washington, DC 20044*. (Barry, L)
August 1, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , CROSSCLAIM against Danita H Brown, Morgan C Brown, III, Shearson American Express Mortgage Corp., COUNTERCLAIM against U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo & Company, Household Realty Corporation, City of Stamford, Connecticut Department of Revenue Services by USA, Internal Revenue Service.(Nunez, Jeffrey)
August 1, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Danita H Brown, Morgan C Brown, III, City of Stamford, Connecticut Department of Revenue Services, Household Realty Corporation, Shearson American Express Mortgage Corp., U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo & Company. (Nunez, Jeffrey)
June 28, 2022 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/8/2022 (Wagner, Rebecca)
June 24, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE by USA re #7 Electronic Service Documents,, Statement Concerning Removal and Standing Order Issued [7-1] (Nunez, Jeffrey)
June 24, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Nathan Nunez on behalf of Internal Revenue Service, USA (Nunez, Jeffrey)
June 23, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Lynn Forcella on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association (Forcella, Victoria)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting ECF No. #8 , Motion for Extension of Time. The Internal Revenue Service and the United States shall respond to the complaint on or before August 1, 2022. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 6/22/22. (Wagner, Rebecca)
June 22, 2022 Answer deadline updated for Internal Revenue Service to 8/1/2022; USA to 8/1/2022. (Wagner, Rebecca)
June 21, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 1, 2022 to respond to the Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Internal Revenue Service, USA. (Turbert, Julie)
June 17, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Standing Protective Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Internal Revenue Service, USA, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Internal Revenue Service, USA, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Internal Revenue Service, USA. Signed by Clerk on 6/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order) (Velez, F.)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 6/17/2022. (Velez, F.)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 6/17/2022. (Velez, F.)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/16/2022; Discovery due by 12/17/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 1/21/2023. Signed by Clerk on 6/17/2022. (Velez, F.)
June 17, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by United States of America, United States of America, Internal Revenue Service re #1 Notice of Removal, of No Pending Motions (Turbert, Julie)
June 17, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie G. Turbert on behalf of United States of America, United States of America, Internal Revenue Service (Turbert, Julie)
June 17, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America, United States of America, Internal Revenue Service from Stamford Superior Court, case number FST-CV22-6056850-S., filed by United States of America, United States of America, Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Summons, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint)(Turbert, Julie)
June 17, 2022 Judge Omar A. Williams added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Morgan C Brown, III
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Sklarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Danita H Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Shearson American Express Mortgage Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Marsha Sheree Beckford
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Forcella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Household Realty Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: City of Stamford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Connecticut Department of Revenue Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan C. Brown
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Sklarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danita Hair Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Julie G. Turbert
Represented By: Jeffrey Nathan Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: USA
Represented By: Julie G. Turbert
Represented By: Jeffrey Nathan Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?