USA v. 1980 Cessna T210N Airplane, Tail Number N4723Y, Serial Number 21063993 et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: 1980 Cessna T210N Airplane, Tail Number N4723Y, Serial Number 21063993
Claimant: Regina Santos Quispe
Case Number: 3:2022cv00826
Filed: June 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 USA Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time. Claimant Regina Santos Quispe may respond to the Complaint on or before September 23, 2022. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/24/2022. (Bernard, Hannah)
August 24, 2022 Filing 18 First MOTION for Extension of Time until September 23, 2022 To Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead in Response to Complaint by Regina Santos Quispe. (Young, C.)
August 24, 2022 Answer deadline updated for Regina Santos Quispe to 9/23/2022. (Bernard, Hannah)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Set Aside Default as to Claimant Regina Santos Quispe. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/22/2022. (Bernard, Hannah)
August 4, 2022 Filing 16 First MOTION to Set Aside Default by Regina Santos Quispe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Complaint)(Young, C.)
August 4, 2022 Filing 15 CLAIM Statement of Interest and Verified Claim by Regina Santos Quispe. (Young, C.)
August 4, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Christian Young on behalf of Regina Santos Quispe (Young, C.)
August 4, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by David Erez Dobin on behalf of Regina Santos Quispe (Dobin, David)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 *VACATED* ORDER granting #11 Motion for Default Entry 55(a) as to claimant Regina Santos Quispe. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/3/2022. (Gould, K.) Modified on 8/22/2022 (Gould, K.).
August 3, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Regina Santos Quispe by USA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Request for Default)(Nelson, David)
August 3, 2022 Filing 10 RETURN ON SERVICE by Publication filed by USA. Last publication date July 30, 2022. (Nelson, David)
August 3, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by USA (Nelson, David)
July 6, 2022 Filing 8 Warrant of Arrest in rem issued (Gould, K.)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. The Clerk of Court is directed to sign and issue the Warrant of Arrest in rem. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/30/2022. (Bernard, Hannah)
June 30, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Warrant of Arrest in Rem)(Nelson, David)
June 30, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by USA Signed by Clerk on 6/29/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/29/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/29/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/28/2022 Discovery due by 12/29/2022 Dispositive Motions due by 2/2/2023 Signed by Clerk on 6/29/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
June 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against One 1980 Cessna T210N Airplane, Tail Number N4723Y, Serial Number 21063993, filed by USA.(Nelson, David)
June 29, 2022 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. 1980 Cessna T210N Airplane, Tail Number N4723Y, Serial Number 21063993 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: David Christopher Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1980 Cessna T210N Airplane, Tail Number N4723Y, Serial Number 21063993
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Regina Santos Quispe
Represented By: C. Christian Young
Represented By: David Erez Dobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?