Roh v. Shultz et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Dillon Roh
Defendant: Karl L. Shultz, Joanna Nunan, William G. Kelly, Arthur L. Ray and Akaninyene Inyang
Case Number: 3:2022cv00834
Filed: June 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701 Maritime Subsidy Board
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Attorney Jeffrey E. McFadden to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/10/2022. (LaLone, L.)
August 8, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jeffrey E. McFadden to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number BCTDC-7025887) by Joshua Dillon Roh. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Grubaugh, Joshua)
July 6, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Jillian R. Orticelli on behalf of Akaninyene Inyang, William G. Kelly, Joanna Nunan, Arthur L. Ray, Karl L. Shultz (Orticelli, Jillian)
July 5, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Grigsby Grubaugh on behalf of Joshua Dillon Roh (Grubaugh, Joshua)
July 1, 2022 Filing 25 Notice to counsel in transferred case. Signed by Clerk on 07/01/2022. (Peterson, M)
June 30, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Clerk on 06/30/2022. (Peterson, M)
June 30, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 06/30/2022. (Peterson, M)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 06/30/2022. (Peterson, M)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 06/30/2022. (Peterson, M)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/29/2022. Discovery due by 12/30/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 2/3/2023. Signed by Clerk on 06/30/2022. (Peterson, M)
June 30, 2022 Filing 19 Case electronically transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:21-cv-02560.
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER regarding defendants' #13 Motion to Transfer and TRANSFERRING this case to the U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut. See Memorandum Opinion and Order for further details. Transfer due by 6/24/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 14, 2022. (lcbah2)
April 5, 2022 Filing 17 REPLY to opposition to motion re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Connecticut filed by AKANINYENE INYANG, WILLIAM G. KELLY, JOANNA NUNAN, ARTHUR L. RAY, KARL L. SHULTZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Silverman, Bradley)
April 5, 2022 Filing 16 ERRATA Withdrawal of Reply Brief by AKANINYENE INYANG, WILLIAM G. KELLY, JOANNA NUNAN, ARTHUR L. RAY, KARL L. SHULTZ re #15 Reply to opposition to Motion filed by JOANNA NUNAN, WILLIAM G. KELLY, AKANINYENE INYANG, ARTHUR L. RAY, KARL L. SHULTZ. (Silverman, Bradley)
April 4, 2022 Filing 15 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO ERRATA FILED ON 4/5/2022.....REPLY to opposition to motion re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Connecticut filed by AKANINYENE INYANG, WILLIAM G. KELLY, JOANNA NUNAN, ARTHUR L. RAY, KARL L. SHULTZ. (Silverman, Bradley) Modified on 4/5/2022 (zeg).
March 29, 2022 Filing 14 Memorandum in opposition to re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Connecticut filed by JOSHUA DILLON ROH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Jeffrey E. McFadden)(McFadden, Jeffrey) Modified docket event/text on 4/1/2022 (zeg).
March 15, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Connecticut by AKANINYENE INYANG, WILLIAM G. KELLY, JOANNA NUNAN, ARTHUR L. RAY, KARL L. SHULTZ. (Silverman, Bradley)
February 11, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 3/17/2022. (ztg)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendants' #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, and DIRECTING defendants, by March 17, 2022, to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 11, 2022. (lcbah2)
February 9, 2022 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by AKANINYENE INYANG, WILLIAM G. KELLY, JOANNA NUNAN, ARTHUR L. RAY, KARL L. SHULTZ. (Silverman, Bradley)
February 9, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Silverman on behalf of All Defendants (Silverman, Bradley)
February 7, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda A. Gonzalez-Horowitz on behalf of All Defendants (Gonzalez-Horowitz, Brenda)
December 21, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. AKANINYENE INYANG served on 10/19/2021; WILLIAM G. KELLY served on 10/19/2021; JOANNA NUNAN served on 10/19/2021; ARTHUR L. RAY served on 10/19/2021; KARL L. SHULTZ served on 10/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McFadden, Jeffrey)
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McFadden, Jeffrey)
December 21, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/17/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McFadden, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to KARL L. SHULTZ, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
December 13, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney for District of Columbia re #2 Errata filed by JOSHUA DILLON ROH. Related document: #2 Errata filed by JOSHUA DILLON ROH.(McFadden, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 5, 2021. (lcbah2)
October 5, 2021 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb)
October 3, 2021 Filing 2 ERRATA Complaint by JOSHUA DILLON ROH re #1 Complaint, filed by JOSHUA DILLON ROH. (McFadden, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8775183) filed by JOSHUA DILLON ROH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Shultz, #6 Summons Nunan, #7 Summons Kelly, #8 Summons Ray, #9 Inyang)(McFadden, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roh v. Shultz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Dillon Roh
Represented By: Joshua Grigsby Grubaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl L. Shultz
Represented By: Jillian R. Orticelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanna Nunan
Represented By: Jillian R. Orticelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William G. Kelly
Represented By: Jillian R. Orticelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur L. Ray
Represented By: Jillian R. Orticelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akaninyene Inyang
Represented By: Jillian R. Orticelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?