Lops v. Youtube et al
Plaintiff: Leonel Lops
Defendant: Youtube and Susan Wojcicki
Case Number: 3:2022cv00843
Filed: July 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2022 Filing 33 First OBJECTION filed by Leonel Lops. (Lops, Leonel)
August 18, 2022 Filing 32 MOTION to Vacate . Letter Motion to vacate presumptive August 22, 2022 deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Permanent Injunctive Relief by Susan Wojcicki, Youtube. (Mancini, A.)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER. Plaintiffs motions for default judgment for failure to appear (Docs. #21 , #23 , and #25 ) are denied. Counsel appeared on behalf of defendants Youtube and Susan Wojcicki (Doc. #17 ) on August 2, 2022 and the Court granted a motion for an extension of time until September 26, 2022 to respond to plaintiff's complaint and amended motion for preliminary injunction (Doc. # 30 ). It is so ordered.Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/5/22. (Barry, Donna)
August 4, 2022 Filing 26 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's #17 Notice of Appearance filed by Leonel Lops. (Freberg, B)
August 4, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) by Leonel Lops. (Freberg, B)
August 4, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Keep Preliminary Injunction by Leonel Lops. (Freberg, B)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. The Court GRANTS the motion for extension of time (Doc. #18 ) to file any answer or other response to the complaint and any response to the amended motion for preliminary injunction by September 26, 2022. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/3/22. (Barry, Donna)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER finding as moot plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #3 ) in light of the filing of an Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #11 ).Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/3/22. (Barry, Donna)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. SELF-REPRESENTED FILERS ARE REQUIRED TO COMPLY WITH THE JUDGE'S STANDARD ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER WHICH IS ATTACHED. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/3/22.(Barry, Donna)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting plaintiff's Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing (Doc. #12 ). Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/3/22. (Barry, Donna)
August 3, 2022 Answer deadline updated for Susan Wojcicki and Youtube to 9/26/2022.Reset deadline as to Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #11 ) - Responses due by 9/26/2022. (Barry, Donna)
August 2, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) by Leonel Lops. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Freberg, B)
August 2, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to Remove the Amended Injunctive Relief by Leonel Lops. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Freberg, B)
August 2, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #1 Complaint by Susan Wojcicki, Youtube. (Mancini, A.)
August 2, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by A. John P. Mancini on behalf of Susan Wojcicki, Youtube (Mancini, A.)
August 1, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) by Leonel Lops. (Freberg, B)
August 1, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Permanent Injunctive Relief by Leonel Lops. (Freberg, B)
August 1, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Remove the Amended Injunctive Relief by Leonel Lops.(Freberg, B)
July 27, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leonel Lops. Susan Wojcicki served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022. (Carr, Dave)
July 27, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leonel Lops. Youtube served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022. (Carr, Dave)
July 19, 2022 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER for Preliminary Hearing by Leonel Lops. (Carr, Dave)
July 19, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION To Participate in Electronic Filing Order by Leonel Lops. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Carr, Dave)
July 19, 2022 Filing 11 AMENDED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Leonel Lops.Responses due by 8/9/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibits)(Carr, Dave)
July 19, 2022 Filing 10 Consent to Electronic Notice By Self-Represented Litigant (Carr, Dave)
July 18, 2022 Filing 14 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Carr, Dave)
July 7, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 Report on Patent/Trademark Form, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Leonel Lops, #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Leonel Lops, #5 Protective Order, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Leonel Lops, #6 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 7/7/2022.(Carr, Dave)
July 7, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Susan Wojcicki, Youtube* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Leonel Lops* *127 Tuthill St.* *West Haven, CT 06516*. (Carr, Dave)
July 7, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Susan Wojcicki, Youtube. (Carr, Dave)
July 6, 2022 Filing 7 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Carr, Dave)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/6/2022.(Carr, Dave)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/6/2022.(Carr, Dave)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/4/2022 Discovery due by 1/5/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 2/9/2023 Signed by Clerk on 7/6/2022.(Carr, Dave)
July 6, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Leonel Lops.Responses due by 7/27/2022 (Carr, Dave)
July 6, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance by Leonel Lops (Carr, Dave)
July 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Susan Wojcicki, Youtube, filed by Leonel Lops.(Carr, Dave)
July 6, 2022 Filing fee received from Leonel Lops: $ 402, receipt number NHV25255 (Carr, Dave) Modified on 7/7/2022 to add receipt number (Carr, Dave).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lops v. Youtube et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonel Lops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youtube
Represented By: A. John P. Mancini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Wojcicki
Represented By: A. John P. Mancini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?