Perry v. Government Employees Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Perry
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Co.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00910
Filed: July 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Memorandum in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Jeffrey Perry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition to Perpetuate Testimony, #2 Exhibit Motion to Strike, #3 Exhibit Court Order)(Kluberdanz, Brian)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Kluberdanz on behalf of Jeffrey Perry (Kluberdanz, Brian)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. The parties' Rule 26(f) Report is overdue. It shall be filed on or before September 19, 2022. Additionally, it has come to the Court's attention that counsel for the Plaintiff has failed to file a notice of appearance pursuant to Local Rule 5(b). Attorney Kluberdanz is directed to file a notice of appearance forthwith. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/7/2022.(Gould, K.)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting absent objection #22 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's #10 Motion to Dismiss on or before September 16, 2022. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/9/2022. (Sweeney, Kevin)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Response as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) until 09/16/2022 by Jeffrey Perry. (Kluberdanz, Brian)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset Deadline as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 9/16/2022. (Bernard, Hannah)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Avigael C Fyman on behalf of Government Employees Insurance Co. (Fyman, Avigael)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by David S Wilck on behalf of Government Employees Insurance Co. (Wilck, David)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David S. Wilck, Esq. Signed by Clerk on 7/29/2022. (Imbriani, Susan)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Avigael C. Fyman, Esq. Signed by Clerk on 7/29/2022. (Imbriani, Susan)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE by Government Employees Insurance Co. re #16 Certificate of Good Standing OF SERVICE (Cristofaro, Elizabeth)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #15 MOTION for Attorney(s) David S. Wilck to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7014274) by Government Employees Insurance Co.. (Cristofaro, Elizabeth)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) David S. Wilck to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7014274) by Government Employees Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David S Wilck in Support of Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice)(Cristofaro, Elizabeth)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE by Government Employees Insurance Co. re #13 Certificate of Good Standing OF SERVICE (Cristofaro, Elizabeth)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Avigael C. Fyman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7014233) by Government Employees Insurance Co.. (Cristofaro, Elizabeth)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Avigael C. Fyman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7014233) by Government Employees Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Avigael C. Fyman in Support of Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice)(Cristofaro, Elizabeth)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Government Employees Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Elizabeth M. Cristofaro in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Auto Policy, #3 Exhibit B - Amended Declaration, #4 Exhibit C - Umbrella Policy)(Cristofaro, Elizabeth)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) by Government Employees Insurance Co..Responses due by 8/17/2022 (Cristofaro, Elizabeth)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 7/20/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Notice (Other) filed by Government Employees Insurance Co., #4 Notice (Other) filed by Government Employees Insurance Co., #3 Notice (Other) filed by Government Employees Insurance Co., #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Protective Order, Add and Terminate Judges, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Government Employees Insurance Co. Signed by Clerk on 7/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Fanelle, N.)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/20/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/20/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/18/2022 Discovery due by 1/19/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 2/23/2023 Signed by Clerk on 7/20/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Government Employees Insurance Company STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 (Cristofaro, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/20/2022 (Walker, J.).
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE by Government Employees Insurance Company STATEMENT PURSUANT TO STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES (Cristofaro, Elizabeth)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE by Government Employees Insurance Company OF PENDING MOTIONS (Cristofaro, Elizabeth)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Government Employees Insurance Company from Judicial District of Stamford/Norwalk at Stamford, case number FST-CV-22-6057214S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7005068, filed by Government Employees Insurance Company.(Cristofaro, Elizabeth)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Government Employees Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Perry
Represented By: Brian Kluberdanz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Co.
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Cristofaro
Represented By: David S Wilck
Represented By: Avigael C Fyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?