Sakr v. Utica National Insurance Co. et al
Plaintiff: Assaad Sakr
Defendant: Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina, IAT Insurance Company, Utica National Insurance Co. and IAT Insurance Group
Case Number: 3:2022cv00915
Filed: July 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2022 Filing 27 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION for More Definite Statement until 12/9/2022 by Assaad Sakr. (Green, Forest)
September 9, 2022 Filing 26 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 MOTION to Dismiss until 12/9/2022 by Assaad Sakr. (Green, Forest)
September 9, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION for Forest E. Green (CT30123) to Withdraw as Attorney by Assaad Sakr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice and Certified Mail Receipt)(Green, Forest)
August 24, 2022 Filing 24 Memorandum in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Utica National Insurance Co.. (Welch, Michael)
August 24, 2022 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Signed By Tom Schmitt filed by Utica National Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy)(Welch, Michael)
August 24, 2022 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Signed By Michael P. Welch, Esq. filed by Utica National Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Marshal's return of service)(Welch, Michael)
August 24, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by Utica National Insurance Co..Responses due by 9/14/2022 (Welch, Michael)
August 23, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for More Definite Statement by IAT Insurance Group, Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina.Responses due by 9/13/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Adams, Kathleen)
August 23, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Welch on behalf of Utica National Insurance Co. (Welch, Michael)
August 11, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael P. Welch to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7028310) by Utica National Insurance Co.. (Fulco, Dominic)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Attorney Michael P. Welch to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/9/2022. Signed by Clerk on 8/10/2022. (LaLone, L.)
August 9, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael P. Welch to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7028310) by Utica National Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael P. Welch)(Fulco, Dominic)
August 2, 2022 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Utica National Insurance Co.. (Fulco, Dominic)
July 26, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #13 Protective Order, #5 Notice (Other) filed by IAT Insurance Group, Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina, #6 Notice of Appearance filed by Utica National Insurance Co., #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Utica National Insurance Co., #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until August 24, 2022 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Utica National Insurance Co., #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until August 24, 2022 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by IAT Insurance Group, Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina, #3 Notice (Other) filed by IAT Insurance Group, Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by IAT Insurance Group, Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina, 10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by IAT Insurance Group, Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina, #4 Notice (Other) filed by IAT Insurance Group, Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina, #11 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #12 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 07/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Peterson, M)
July 22, 2022 Answer deadline updated for IAT Insurance Group to 8/24/2022; Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina to 8/24/2022; Utica National Insurance Co. to 8/24/2022. (Johnson, D.)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. The defendants' #8 #9 Consent Motions for Extensions of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint are hereby GRANTED. The defendants' responses to the plaintiff's complaint shall be filed no later than August 24, 2022. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 7/22/2022. (Davis, Christina)
July 22, 2022 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until August 24, 2022 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Utica National Insurance Co.. (Fulco, Dominic)
July 21, 2022 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until August 24, 2022 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by IAT Insurance Group, Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina. (Adams, Kathleen)
July 21, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Nathaniel Kaplan on behalf of Utica National Insurance Co. (Kaplan, Jeffrey)
July 21, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dominic Fulco, III on behalf of Utica National Insurance Co. (Fulco, Dominic)
July 21, 2022 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Freberg, B)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 07/20/2022. (Peterson, M)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 07/20/2022. (Peterson, M)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/18/2022. Discovery due by 1/19/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 2/23/2023. Signed by Clerk on 07/20/2022. (Peterson, M)
July 20, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by IAT Insurance Company, Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina Notice of Pending Motions (Adams, Kathleen)
July 20, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by IAT Insurance Company, Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina Notice to Counsel Re: Local Rule 5(b) (Adams, Kathleen)
July 20, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by IAT Insurance Company, Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina Notice of Removal Statement (Adams, Kathleen)
July 20, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IAT Insurance Company, Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina. (Adams, Kathleen)
July 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina, IAT Insurance Company from Judicial District of New Britian, case number HHB-CV22-6073720. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7006213, filed by Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina, IAT Insurance Company.(Adams, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sakr v. Utica National Insurance Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Assaad Sakr
Represented By: Forest Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina
Represented By: Kathleen F. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAT Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathleen F. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utica National Insurance Co.
Represented By: Dominic Fulco, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Nathaniel Kaplan
Represented By: Michael Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAT Insurance Group
Represented By: Kathleen F. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?