Motz et al v. Citigroup Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Juliette Motz and Vivek Shah
Defendant: Citigroup Inc., The Board of Trustees of Citigroup Inc., The Administrative Committee of the Citi Retirement Savings Plan, Does 1 - 20, Board of Trustees of Citigroup Inc., Administrative Committee of the Citi Retirement Savings Plan and Does No. 1-20, Whose Names Are Currently Unknown
Case Number: 3:2022cv00965
Filed: July 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1109 Breach of Fiduciary Duties
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Meaghan McLaine VerGow on behalf of Administrative Committee of the Citi Retirement Savings Plan, Board of Trustees of Citigroup Inc., Citigroup Inc. (VerGow, Meaghan)
September 16, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Deanna Rice on behalf of Administrative Committee of the Citi Retirement Savings Plan, Board of Trustees of Citigroup Inc., Citigroup Inc. (Rice, Deanna)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Attorney Deanna M. Rice to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 9/13/2022. (LaLone, L.)
September 12, 2022 Filing 30 MOTION for Attorney(s) Deanna M. Rice to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Administrative Committee of the Citi Retirement Savings Plan, Board of Trustees of Citigroup Inc., Citigroup Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Shearin, James)
September 9, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by James T. Shearin on behalf of Administrative Committee of the Citi Retirement Savings Plan, Board of Trustees of Citigroup Inc., Citigroup Inc. (Shearin, James)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying as moot #17 Motion to Appear pro hac vice in light of the filing of ECF No. 22. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/8/2022. (Rickevicius, L.)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying without prejudice #22 Motion to Appear pro hac vice for failure to provide the required good cause showing addressing the Local Rule requirement that Local counsel maintains an office within the District of Connecticut. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/8/2022. (Rickevicius, L.)
September 7, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Alec Berin on behalf of Juliette Motz, Vivek Shah (Berin, Alec)
September 7, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna K. D'Agostino on behalf of Juliette Motz, Vivek Shah (D'Agostino, Anna)
September 7, 2022 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Anna K. D'Agostino to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7053348) by Juliette Motz, Vivek Shah. (D'Agostino, Anna)
September 7, 2022 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Alec J. Berin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7053340) by Juliette Motz, Vivek Shah. (Berin, Alec)
September 6, 2022 Filing 22 Corrected MOTION for Attorney(s) Deanna M. Rice to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7058807) by Administrative Committee of the Citi Retirement Savings Plan, Board of Trustees of Citigroup Inc., Citigroup Inc.. (Godesky, Leah) Modified to edit text to reflect corrected motion on 9/7/2022 (Chartier, AnnMarie).
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #16 MOTION for Attorney Meaghan VerGow to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 09/02/2022. (Peterson, M)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #10 MOTION for Attorney Anna K. D'Agostino to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/1/2022. Signed by Clerk on 9/2/2022. (Peterson, M)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Attorney Alec J. Berin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/1/2022. Signed by Clerk on 09/2/2022. (Peterson, M)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Attorney James C. Shah to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/1/2022. Signed by Clerk on 9/2/2022. (Peterson, M)
September 1, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Deanna M. Rice to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7055137) by Administrative Committee of the Citi Retirement Savings Plan, Board of Trustees of Citigroup Inc., Citigroup Inc.. (Godesky, Leah)
September 1, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Meaghan VerGow to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7055033) by Administrative Committee of the Citi Retirement Savings Plan, Board of Trustees of Citigroup Inc., Citigroup Inc.. (Godesky, Leah)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to November 14, 2022 for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/1/2022. (Rickevicius, L.)
September 1, 2022 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. (Rickevicius, L.)
August 31, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 14, 2022(Unopposed) for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' #1 Complaint, by Administrative Committee of the Citi Retirement Savings Plan, Board of Trustees of Citigroup Inc., Citigroup Inc.. (Godesky, Leah)
August 31, 2022 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Citigroup Inc.. (Godesky, Leah)
August 31, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Leah Godesky on behalf of Administrative Committee of the Citi Retirement Savings Plan, Board of Trustees of Citigroup Inc., Citigroup Inc. (Godesky, Leah)
August 31, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Miller on behalf of Juliette Motz, Vivek Shah (Miller, James)
August 31, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Anna K. D'Agostino to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7053348) by Juliette Motz, Vivek Shah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Anna K. D'Agostino)(Rubinow, Laurie)
August 31, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Alec J. Berin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7053340) by Juliette Motz, Vivek Shah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Alec J. Berin)(Rubinow, Laurie)
August 31, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) James C. Shah to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7053300) by Juliette Motz, Vivek Shah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of James C. Shah)(Rubinow, Laurie)
August 17, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juliette Motz, Vivek Shah. Administrative Committee of the Citi Retirement Savings Plan served on 8/16/2022, answer due 9/6/2022; Board of Trustees of Citigroup Inc. served on 8/16/2022, answer due 9/6/2022; Citigroup Inc. served on 8/16/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (Rubinow, Laurie)
August 5, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Administrative Committee of the Citi Retirement Savings Plan, Board of Trustees of Citigroup Inc., Citigroup Inc., Does* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Laurie Rubinow* *Miller Shah LLP* *65 Main Street* *Chester, CT 06412*. (LaLone, L.)
August 5, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Administrative Committee of the Citi Retirement Savings Plan, Board of Trustees of Citigroup Inc., Citigroup Inc., Does. (Rubinow, Laurie)
August 2, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, filed by Vivek Shah, Juliette Motz Signed by Clerk on 8/2/2022.(LaLone, L.)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/29/2022.(LaLone, L.)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/29/2022.(LaLone, L.)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/27/2022 Discovery due by 1/28/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 3/4/2023 Signed by Clerk on 7/29/2022.(LaLone, L.)
July 29, 2022 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Freberg, B)
July 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Citigroup Inc., Does 1 - 20, The Administrative Committee of the Citi Retirement Savings Plan, The Board of Trustees of Citigroup Inc. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number BCTDC-7017249.), filed by Juliette Motz, Vivek Shah. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rubinow, Laurie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Motz et al v. Citigroup Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliette Motz
Represented By: Laurie Rubinow
Represented By: James E. Miller
Represented By: Alec Berin
Represented By: Anna K. D'Agostino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivek Shah
Represented By: Laurie Rubinow
Represented By: James E. Miller
Represented By: Alec Berin
Represented By: Anna K. D'Agostino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Inc.
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Represented By: Deanna Rice
Represented By: Leah Godesky
Represented By: Meaghan McLaine VerGow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Trustees of Citigroup Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Administrative Committee of the Citi Retirement Savings Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of Citigroup Inc.
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Represented By: Deanna Rice
Represented By: Leah Godesky
Represented By: Meaghan McLaine VerGow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrative Committee of the Citi Retirement Savings Plan
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Represented By: Deanna Rice
Represented By: Leah Godesky
Represented By: Meaghan McLaine VerGow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does No. 1-20, Whose Names Are Currently Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?