Kistler et al v. Stanley Black & Decker Inc et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Lang and James Kistler
Defendant: Stanley Black & Decker Inc, The Board of Trustees of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., The Administrative Committee of the Stanley Black & Decker Retirement Account Plan, Does 1-20, Board of Trustees of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., Administrative Committee of the Stanley Black & Decker Retirement Account Plan and Does 1-20, Whose Names Are Currently Unknown
Amicus Curiae: American Benefits Council, ERISA Industry Committee, American Retirement Association, Committee on Investment of Employee Benefit Assets, Inc. and Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Case Number: 3:2022cv00966
Filed: July 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Referring Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2023 Filing 83 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Motion Hearing held on 8/3/2023. #37 Motion to Dismiss filed by Stanley Black & Decker Inc is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART without prejudice. Amended pleadings due 9/2/2023. Total Time: 43 minutes (Court Reporter: Melissa Cianciullo) (Reis, Julia)
July 28, 2023 Filing 82 RESPONSE re #80 Notice (Other), #76 Notice (Other) by James Kistler, Lisa Lang. (Rubinow, Laurie)
July 21, 2023 Filing 81 NOTICE by James Kistler, Lisa Lang of Filing of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Rubinow, Laurie)
July 19, 2023 Filing 80 NOTICE by Stanley Black & Decker Inc of Filing Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Squillario, Jennifer)
July 14, 2023 Filing 79 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 8/3/2023 01:00 PM Motion Hearing re: Motion to Dismiss, doc. no. 37, set for 8/3/2023 03:00 PM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Khabbaz, D.)
July 5, 2023 Filing 78 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing re: Motion to Dismiss, doc. no. 37, set for 8/3/2023 01:00 PM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Khabbaz, D.)
June 28, 2023 Filing 77 NOTICE by James Kistler, Lisa Lang of Filing of Supplemental Authority (D'Agostino, Anna)
June 28, 2023 Filing 76 NOTICE by Stanley Black & Decker Inc of Filing Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Squillario, Jennifer)
June 15, 2023 Filing 75 NOTICE by Stanley Black & Decker Inc of Filing Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Squillario, Jennifer)
April 28, 2023 Filing 74 Fourth NOTICE by Stanley Black & Decker Inc re #38 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, #37 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Nolin, Peter)
March 15, 2023 Filing 73 NOTICE by Stanley Black & Decker Inc of Filing Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Squillario, Jennifer)
February 27, 2023 Filing 72 RESPONSE re #70 Notice (Other), #65 Notice (Other) by James Kistler, Lisa Lang. (Rubinow, Laurie)
February 24, 2023 Filing 71 RESPONSE re #59 Response, #64 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by James Kistler, Lisa Lang. (Rubinow, Laurie)
February 21, 2023 Filing 70 NOTICE by Stanley Black & Decker Inc of Filing Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Squillario, Jennifer)
February 6, 2023 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #47 MOTION for Attorney(s) ADAM L. DEMING to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7134323) by American Benefits Council, American Retirement Association, Committee on Investment of Employee Benefit Assets, Inc., ERISA Industry Committee. (Porzio, Steven)
February 6, 2023 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #46 MOTION for Attorney(s) JOHN E. ROBERTS to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7134262) by American Benefits Council, American Retirement Association, Committee on Investment of Employee Benefit Assets, Inc., ERISA Industry Committee. (Porzio, Steven)
February 6, 2023 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #45 MOTION for Attorney(s) MYRON D. RUMELD to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7134259) by American Benefits Council, American Retirement Association, Committee on Investment of Employee Benefit Assets, Inc., ERISA Industry Committee. (Porzio, Steven)
February 6, 2023 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #44 MOTION for Attorney(s) RUSSELL L. HIRSCHHORN to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7134251) by American Benefits Council, American Retirement Association, Committee on Investment of Employee Benefit Assets, Inc., ERISA Industry Committee. (Porzio, Steven)
January 31, 2023 Filing 65 NOTICE by Stanley Black & Decker Inc of Filing Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Squillario, Jennifer)
January 25, 2023 Filing 64 Memorandum in Support re #37 MOTION to Dismiss Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. (Santos, Jaime)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Attorney Adam L. Deming to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/26/2023. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/25/2023. (Oliver, T.)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Attorney John E. Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/26/2023. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/25/2023. (Oliver, T.)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Attorney Myron D. Rumeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/26/2023. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/25/2023. (Oliver, T.)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #44 Motion Attorney Russell L. Hirschhorn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/26/2023. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/25/2023. (Oliver, T.)
January 25, 2023 Filing 59 RESPONSE re #58 Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,, #37 MOTION to Dismiss (AMICI CURIAE BRIEF OF THE AMERICAN BENEFITS COUNCIL, THE ERISA INDUSTRY COMMITTEE, THE AMERICAN RETIREMENT ASSOCIATION, AND THE COMMITTEE ON INVESTMENT OF EMPLOYEE BENEFIT ASSETS INC.) filed by American Benefits Council, American Retirement Association, Committee on Investment of Employee Benefit Assets, Inc., ERISA Industry Committee. (Porzio, Steven)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: granting #43 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief and granting #48 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. For the reasons explained in the attached Order, I grant both motions for leave to participate as amici curiae to the extent the organizations seek permission to file amicus briefs, but I deny the motions to the extent they seek leave to participate as amici curiae in any other way. Amici are instructed to electronically file their amicus briefs forthwith. Additionally, I permit the plaintiff to file one, single brief responding to both amicus briefs. The deadline for the plaintiff's response brief shall be February 24, 2023.Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/25/2023. (Khabbaz, D.)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #56 Joint Motion to Stay Discovery and adopting the parties' limited discovery procedures as set forth in the Rule 26(f) report, doc. no. #34 . Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/13/2023. (Khabbaz, D.)
January 10, 2023 Filing 56 Joint MOTION to Stay DISCOVERY by Stanley Black & Decker Inc.Responses due by 1/31/2023 (Squillario, Jennifer)
December 23, 2022 Filing 55 REPLY to Response to #37 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Stanley Black & Decker Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Reply Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Reply Memorandum of Law)(Squillario, Jennifer)
December 16, 2022 Filing 54 REPLY to Response to #48 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for the Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America for Leave to Participate as Amicus Curiae filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. (Santos, Jaime)
December 16, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaime Santos on behalf of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America (Santos, Jaime)
December 2, 2022 Filing 52 Memorandum in Opposition re #48 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for the Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America for Leave to Participate as Amicus Curiae filed by James Kistler, Lisa Lang. (Rubinow, Laurie)
December 2, 2022 Filing 51 Memorandum in Opposition re #43 MOTION for Leave to File Brief and Participate as Amici Curiae filed by James Kistler, Lisa Lang. (Rubinow, Laurie)
November 29, 2022 Filing 50 AFFIDAVIT re #49 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Signed By Laurie Rubinow filed by James Kistler, Lisa Lang. (Rubinow, Laurie)
November 29, 2022 Filing 49 Memorandum in Opposition re #37 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James Kistler, Lisa Lang. (Rubinow, Laurie)
November 14, 2022 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for the Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America for Leave to Participate as Amicus Curiae by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Brief of Amicus Curiae Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Santos, Jaime)
November 11, 2022 Filing 47 MOTION for Attorney(s) ADAM L. DEMING to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7134323) by American Benefits Council, American Retirement Association, Committee on Investment of Employee Benefit Assets, Inc., ERISA Industry Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - AFFIDAVIT OF ADAM L. DEMING)(Porzio, Steven)
November 11, 2022 Filing 46 MOTION for Attorney(s) JOHN E. ROBERTS to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7134262) by American Benefits Council, American Retirement Association, Committee on Investment of Employee Benefit Assets, Inc., ERISA Industry Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - AFFIDAVIT OF JOHN E. ROBERTS)(Porzio, Steven)
November 11, 2022 Filing 45 MOTION for Attorney(s) MYRON D. RUMELD to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7134259) by American Benefits Council, American Retirement Association, Committee on Investment of Employee Benefit Assets, Inc., ERISA Industry Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - AFFIDAVIT OF MYRON D. RUMELD)(Porzio, Steven)
November 11, 2022 Filing 44 MOTION for Attorney(s) RUSSELL L. HIRSCHHORN to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7134251) by American Benefits Council, American Retirement Association, Committee on Investment of Employee Benefit Assets, Inc., ERISA Industry Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - AFFIDAVIT OF RUSSELL L. HIRSCHHORN)(Porzio, Steven)
November 11, 2022 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to File Brief and Participate as Amici Curiae by American Benefits Council, American Retirement Association, Committee on Investment of Employee Benefit Assets, Inc., ERISA Industry Committee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief)(Porzio, Steven)
November 11, 2022 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Benefits Council, American Retirement Association, Committee on Investment of Employee Benefit Assets, Inc., ERISA Industry Committee. (Porzio, Steven)
November 11, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J Porzio on behalf of American Benefits Council, ERISA Industry Committee, American Retirement Association, Committee on Investment of Employee Benefit Assets, Inc. (Porzio, Steven)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: The joint stipulation #39 , filed on 11/9/2022, is approved. I respectfully request the Clerk to terminate as defendants the Board of Trustees of Stanley Bleck & Decker Retirement Account Plan and the Administrative Committee of the Stanley Black & Decker Account Plan. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/10/2022. (Khabbaz, D.)
November 9, 2022 Filing 39 Joint STIPULATION by Administrative Committee of the Stanley Black & Decker Retirement Account Plan, Board of Trustees of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., Stanley Black & Decker Inc. (Nolin, Peter)
November 4, 2022 Filing 38 Memorandum in Support re #37 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Stanley Black & Decker Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 2 to Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit 3 to Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit 4 to Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit 5 to Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit 6 to Motion to Dismiss, #7 Exhibit 7 to Motion to Dismiss, #8 Exhibit 8 to Motion to Dismiss, #9 Exhibit 9 to Motion to Dismiss, #10 Exhibit 10 to Motion to Dismiss, #11 Exhibit 11 to Motion to Dismiss, #12 Exhibit 12 to Motion to Dismiss, #13 Exhibit 13 to Motion to Dismiss, #14 Exhibit 14 to Motion to Dismiss, #15 Exhibit 15 to Motion to Dismiss, #16 Exhibit 16 to Motion to Dismiss)(Nolin, Peter)
November 4, 2022 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss by Stanley Black & Decker Inc.Responses due by 11/25/2022 (Nolin, Peter)
November 4, 2022 Filing 36 Joint STIPULATION dismissing certain parties by Stanley Black & Decker Inc. (Nolin, Peter)
October 20, 2022 Answer deadline updated for all defendants to 11/4/2022. (Reis, Julia)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before November 4, 2022. If Defendants' response is a motion to dismiss, the Court sets the following schedule: Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion to dismiss on or before November 25, 2022. Defendants shall file a reply in support of the motion to dismiss on or before December 23, 2022. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/20/2022. (Khabbaz, D.)
October 19, 2022 Filing 34 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Rubinow, Laurie)
October 19, 2022 Filing 33 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until November 4, 2022 to file reply to complaint and to set schedule on motion to dismiss #1 Complaint, by Administrative Committee of the Stanley Black & Decker Retirement Account Plan, Board of Trustees of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., Stanley Black & Decker Inc. (Nolin, Peter)
October 6, 2022 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #9 MOTION for Attorney(s) James C. Shah to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7053623) by James Kistler, Lisa Lang. (Shah, James)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Stefan R. Underhill for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/27/2022.(Gould, K.)
September 26, 2022 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement for Stanley Black & Decker Inc. by Administrative Committee of the Stanley Black & Decker Retirement Account Plan, Board of Trustees of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., Stanley Black & Decker Inc. (Nolin, Peter)
September 21, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles M. Dyke on behalf of Administrative Committee of the Stanley Black & Decker Retirement Account Plan, Board of Trustees of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., Does, Stanley Black & Decker Inc (Dyke, Charles)
September 21, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Kathryn Squillario on behalf of Administrative Committee of the Stanley Black & Decker Retirement Account Plan, Board of Trustees of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., Does, Stanley Black & Decker Inc (Squillario, Jennifer)
September 21, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Cameron Taylor on behalf of Administrative Committee of the Stanley Black & Decker Retirement Account Plan, Board of Trustees of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., Does, Stanley Black & Decker Inc (Taylor, Ian)
September 19, 2022 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #20 MOTION for Attorney(s) JENNIFER K. SQUILLARIO to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7070018) by Administrative Committee of the Stanley Black & Decker Retirement Account Plan, Board of Trustees of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., Stanley Black & Decker Inc. (Nolin, Peter)
September 19, 2022 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ian Taylor to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7070180) by Administrative Committee of the Stanley Black & Decker Retirement Account Plan, Board of Trustees of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., Stanley Black & Decker Inc. (Nolin, Peter)
September 19, 2022 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #21 MOTION for Attorney(s) CHARLES M. DYKE to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7070149) by Administrative Committee of the Stanley Black & Decker Retirement Account Plan, Board of Trustees of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., Stanley Black & Decker Inc. (Nolin, Peter)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney(s) JENNIFER K. SQUILLARIO ; granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney(s) CHARLES M. DYKE ; granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney(s) Ian Taylor. Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/18/2022. Signed by Clerk on 9/19/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
September 15, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ian Taylor to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7070180) by Board of Trustees of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., Does, Stanley Black & Decker Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Taylor)(Nolin, Peter)
September 15, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney(s) CHARLES M. DYKE to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7070149) by Administrative Committee of the Stanley Black & Decker Retirement Account Plan, Board of Trustees of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., Does, Stanley Black & Decker Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Dyke)(Nolin, Peter)
September 15, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) JENNIFER K. SQUILLARIO to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7070018) by Administrative Committee of the Stanley Black & Decker Retirement Account Plan, Board of Trustees of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., Does, Stanley Black & Decker Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of)(Nolin, Peter)
September 7, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Alec Berin on behalf of James Kistler, Lisa Lang (Berin, Alec)
September 7, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Anna K. D'Agostino to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7053627) by James Kistler, Lisa Lang. (D'Agostino, Anna)
September 7, 2022 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Alec J. Berin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7053625) by James Kistler, Lisa Lang. (Berin, Alec)
September 7, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna K. D'Agostino on behalf of James Kistler, Lisa Lang (D'Agostino, Anna)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before October 21, 2022. If Defendants' response is a motion to dismiss, the Court sets the following schedule. Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion to dismiss on or before November 11, 2022. Defendant shall file a reply in support of the motion to dismiss on or before December 9, 2022.Counsel are reminded that pursuant to Local Rule 7(b)(3): "All motions for extension of time shall be filed at least three (3) business days before the deadline sought to be extended, except in cases in which compelling circumstances warranting an extension arise during the three days before the deadline. Any motion for extension of time filed fewer than three business days before the deadline sought to be extended shall, in addition to satisfying all other requirements of this Rule, set forth reasons why the motion was not filed at least three business days before the deadline in question." Future failures to comply with Local Rule 7(b)(3) may result in the denial of non-compliant motions for extension of time without prejudice to refiling of a compliant motion. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/6/2022. (Bernard, Hannah)
September 6, 2022 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/21/2022 to file reply to complaint and to set schedule on motion to dismiss by Administrative Committee of the Stanley Black & Decker Retirement Account Plan, Board of Trustees of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., Stanley Black & Decker Inc. (Nolin, Peter)
September 6, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Nolin on behalf of Administrative Committee of the Stanley Black & Decker Retirement Account Plan, Board of Trustees of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., Stanley Black & Decker Inc (Nolin, Peter)
September 6, 2022 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. (Bernard, Hannah)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney(s) James C. Shah; granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney(s) Alec J. Berin; granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney(s) Anna K. D'Agostino. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/31/2022. Signed by Clerk on 9/1/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
August 31, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Anna K. D'Agostino to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7053627) by James Kistler, Lisa Lang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Anna K. D'Agostino)(Rubinow, Laurie)
August 31, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Alec J. Berin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7053625) by James Kistler, Lisa Lang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Alec J. Berin)(Rubinow, Laurie)
August 31, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) James C. Shah to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7053623) by James Kistler, Lisa Lang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of James C. Shah)(Rubinow, Laurie)
August 31, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Miller on behalf of James Kistler, Lisa Lang (Miller, James)
August 17, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa Lang, James Kistler. Administrative Committee of the Stanley Black & Decker Retirement Account Plan served on 8/16/2022, answer due 9/6/2022; Board of Trustees of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. served on 8/16/2022, answer due 9/6/2022; Stanley Black & Decker Inc served on 8/16/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (Rubinow, Laurie)
August 8, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Administrative Committee of the Stanley Black & Decker Retirement Account Plan, Board of Trustees of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., Does, Stanley Black & Decker Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Laurie Rubinow* *Miller Shah LLP* *65 Main Street* *Chester, CT 06412*. (Imbriani, Susan)
August 5, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Administrative Committee of the Stanley Black & Decker Retirement Account Plan, Board of Trustees of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., Does, Stanley Black & Decker Inc. (Rubinow, Laurie)
August 1, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by James Kistler, Lisa Lang, #4 Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 8/1/2022.(Gould, K.)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/29/2022.(Gould, K.) M
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/29/2022.(Gould, K.)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2022; Discovery due by 1/31/2023; Dispositive Motions due by 3/7/2023. Signed by Clerk on 7/29/2022.(Gould, K.)
July 29, 2022 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Oliver, T.)
July 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does, Stanley Black & Decker Inc, Administrative Committee of the Stanley Black & Decker Retirement Account Plan, Board of Trustees of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7017272.), filed by Lisa Lang, James Kistler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rubinow, Laurie) Modified on 8/1/2022 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kistler et al v. Stanley Black & Decker Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Lang
Represented By: Laurie Rubinow
Represented By: Anna K. D'Agostino
Represented By: James E. Miller
Represented By: Alec Berin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kistler
Represented By: Laurie Rubinow
Represented By: Anna K. D'Agostino
Represented By: James E. Miller
Represented By: Alec Berin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Black & Decker Inc
Represented By: Charles M. Dyke
Represented By: Ian Cameron Taylor
Represented By: Jennifer Kathryn Squillario
Represented By: Peter M. Nolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Trustees of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Administrative Committee of the Stanley Black & Decker Retirement Account Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.
Represented By: Charles M. Dyke
Represented By: Ian Cameron Taylor
Represented By: Jennifer Kathryn Squillario
Represented By: Peter M. Nolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrative Committee of the Stanley Black & Decker Retirement Account Plan
Represented By: Charles M. Dyke
Represented By: Ian Cameron Taylor
Represented By: Jennifer Kathryn Squillario
Represented By: Peter M. Nolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20, Whose Names Are Currently Unknown
Represented By: Charles M. Dyke
Represented By: Ian Cameron Taylor
Represented By: Jennifer Kathryn Squillario
Represented By: Peter M. Nolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Benefits Council
Represented By: Steven J Porzio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ERISA Industry Committee
Represented By: Steven J Porzio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Retirement Association
Represented By: Steven J Porzio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Committee on Investment of Employee Benefit Assets, Inc.
Represented By: Steven J Porzio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Represented By: Jaime Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?