Carr et al v. Becerra
Plaintiff: Deborah Carr, Brenda Moore, Mary Ellen Wilson, Mary Shaw and Carol Katz
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Case Number: 3:2022cv00988
Filed: August 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: The emergency motion for referral to a U.S. Magistrate Judge (ECF No. 57) and motion for modification of scheduling order (ECF No. 49) are DENIED, and the Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 3) -- but NOT the motion for class certification (ECF No. 44) -- is hereby referred for adjudication to United States District Judge Omar A. Williams, who is acting as duty judge in the Hartford seat of Court for the month of October. Shortly after this case was filed, this Court held a telephonic status conference on August 8, 2022, to discuss the motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction. (See ECF Nos. 18 and 19.) At that conference, Defendant's counsel stated, and confirmed in a notice filed after the conference (ECF No. 20), that the Defendant would inform the State of Connecticut that the Defendant would not enforce the challenged Interim Final Rule with respect to the two plaintiffs who were then seeking injunctive relief "until at least 15 days after the Court resolves the motion for preliminary injunction." (ECF No. 20.) At the time, there were a total of three plaintiffs, all Connecticut residents. On August 26, 2022, however, the plaintiffs filed an amended class action complaint adding two more plaintiffs, one a resident of Nebraska and the other a resident of Delaware, and also sought, for the first time, to represent a nationwide class of similarly situated persons. (On the same day, plaintiffs filed a motion to certify the class, which is not yet fully briefed.) At a status conference held on September 20, 2022, the undersigned informed counsel that his trial schedule -- including a murder trial and two long-scheduled and large civil trials, as well as a September trial that took longer than expected -- would not permit the undersigned to devote the attention needed to these motions until at least December 5, and even then that the undersigned could not realistically finalize a ruling (or rulings) until January, 2023. Because Plaintiffs' counsel indicated that urgent action was needed on the motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction, including for the two new plaintiffs who reside outside Connecticut (see, e.g., ECF No. 49 at 2-3), the Court offered the parties two alternative options: (1) consenting to the jurisdiction of a U.S. Magistrate Judge for purposes of the entire case, which, as the Court informed counsel, would likely result in a more expeditious disposition than the undersigned could manage in light of his trial schedule; and (2) the undersigned's referring this case to a U.S. Magistrate Judge for a recommended ruling on pending motions. The undersigned informed the parties that, with regard to option #1, they were not required to consent, and that option #2, though it might save some time by sparing the undersigned the need to conduct a hearing and providing the undersigned with recommendations, was not ideal from the standpoint of judicial economy and might not result in a final ruling significantly sooner than the undersigned's own schedule would permit. Thereafter, the Defendant indicated that he would not consent to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. Upon further reflection, and after checking with the duty judge for the month of October, Judge Omar A. Williams, the undersigned has determined that the most efficient way to handle this case under these unusual circumstances -- and the one with the highest likelihood of securing an expeditious disposition on the pending motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction -- is to refer that motion, and that motion alone, to Judge Williams for decision. That motion, if it has merit, is the most urgent matter pending in the case, and the Court's duty judge system is designed to offer an alternative for handling urgent matters -- but only urgent matters -- when the presiding district judge is unavailable on an urgent basis, as is the case here. Although the undersigned previously found that it would be in the interest of judicial economy to consolidate the hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction with a hearing on the motion for class certification, the undersigned has reconsidered that determination. While the plaintiffs have suggested that all class members are facing the same irreparable harm, that remains to be seen, and the motion for class certification does not attach any evidence from prospective class members (other than the named plaintiffs themselves) showing that their current situations evince irreparable harm; this point is salient because the Interim Final Rule being challenged was adopted almost two years ago, and the declarations filed by the named plaintiffs suggest that the rule may have had different impacts on them at different times (to the extent it caused the States involved to send the notices described in the declarations). While that does not necessarily mean that all prospective class members cannot show irreparable harm, it likely does mean that there would need to be some showing to that effect for the Court to grant injunctive relief on a class-wide basis. For all these reasons, the Court will not refer the motion for class certification to Judge Williams at this time but will keep the December 5 hearing date in place to entertain argument on that motion. The undersigned thanks Judge Williams for stepping in to the handle the motion for injunctive relief with respect to the named plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/29/2022. (Davis, Christina)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Memorandum in Opposition re #44 MOTION to Certify Class of Plaintiffs Nationwide filed by Xavier Becerra. (McMahon, Madeline)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Emergency MOTION Referral to U.S. Magistrate Judge re 47 Notice of Hearing on Motion,, #49 MOTION Modification of Scheduling re: Hearing re 46 Order,,,,,,, , 46 Order,,,,,,, by Deborah Carr, Carol Katz, Brenda Moore, Mary Shaw, Mary Ellen Wilson.Responses due by 10/14/2022 (Toubman, Sheldon)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: For the reasons discussed during today's conference call, the hearing scheduled for December 2, 5, and 6, 2022 shall now be held only on December 5, 2022. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/21/22. (Constantine, A.)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael P. Shea: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/20/2022. 27 minutes(Court Reporter J. Monette.) (Johnson, D.)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Second AFFIDAVIT re #44 MOTION to Certify Class of Plaintiffs Nationwide Signed By Sheldon V. Toubman filed by Deborah Carr, Carol Katz, Brenda Moore, Mary Shaw, Mary Ellen Wilson. (Toubman, Sheldon)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REPLY to Response to #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Deborah Carr, Carol Katz, Brenda Moore, Mary Shaw, Mary Ellen Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Attorney)(Toubman, Sheldon)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/20/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Michael P. Shea (Johnson, D.)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: The time of the telephonic conference on September 20, 2022 is changed to 2 pm. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/16/22. (Constantine, A.)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: A telephonic status conference is scheduled for Tuesday, September 20, 2022 at 3:30 pm. Chambers will email the dial in information to counsel. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/16/22.(Constantine, A.)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #44 MOTION to Certify Class of Plaintiffs Nationwide. opposition due by 9/26/2022 (Johnson, D.)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: The defendant's motion (ECF No. #48 ) for an extension of time until September 26, 2022 in which to file its opposition to the plaintiffs' motion (ECF No. #44 ) for class certification is granted. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/15/22. (Constantine, A.)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION Modification of Scheduling re: Hearing re 46 Order,,,,,,, by Deborah Carr, Carol Katz, Brenda Moore, Mary Shaw, Mary Ellen Wilson.Responses due by 10/5/2022 (Toubman, Sheldon)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 26, 2022 to file Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Xavier Becerra. (McMahon, Madeline)
September 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Because of the Court's trial schedule, including a currently ongoing trial that is taking longer than expected, and the Court's other commitments, it is necessary to postpone the hearing on the plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction. In addition, the Court notes that the plaintiffs recently filed a motion for class certification and finds that it would be in the interest of judicial economy to consolidate the hearing on that motion with the hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction. Further, a continuance of both hearings will give the parties an opportunity to conduct at least limited discovery prior to the hearing, which should enable the parties to conduct a more efficient and informative hearing. Accordingly, the Court hereby vacates its order (ECF No. 19 ) scheduling the hearing on the preliminary injunction motion for September 27 and 28, 2022, and schedules a consolidated hearing on the motions for preliminary injunction and class certification for December 2, 5, and 6, 2022. Proceedings will begin at 9am and conclude at 4pm. If the parties, after meeting and conferring, believe that the hearing is likely to be be concluded in two days, they shall filed a notice on the docket so indicating at least 14 days before the hearing. In that case, the Court will hold the hearing on December 5 and 6, 2022. The parties shall exchange exhibit and witness lists no later than 7 days before the hearing. They shall file such lists, with any objections noted by the adverse party and the legal grounds for such objections, on the docket three days before the hearing. They shall also each deliver to chambers two sets of exhibits in a three ring binder for the Court and the law clerk. The Court encourages the parties to work together to conduct any necessary discovery before the hearing. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/10/22. (Constantine, A.)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #44 MOTION to Certify Class of Plaintiffs Nationwide. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2022, 12/5/22, 12/6/22 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Michael P. Shea. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/9/22.(Johnson, D.)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Memorandum in Opposition re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Xavier Becerra. (McMahon, Madeline)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION to Certify Class of Plaintiffs Nationwide by Deborah Carr, Carol Katz, Brenda Moore, Mary Shaw, Mary Ellen Wilson.Responses due by 9/16/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Plaintiff Shaw, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Plaintiff Katz, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Atty. Toubman)(Toubman, Sheldon)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 AMENDED COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION against Xavier Becerra, filed by Brenda Moore, Deborah Carr, Mary Ellen Wilson, Mary Shaw, Carol Katz.(Toubman, Sheldon)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Regan Bailey on behalf of Deborah Carr, Brenda Moore, Mary Ellen Wilson (Bailey, Regan)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha Jane Perkins on behalf of Deborah Carr, Brenda Moore, Mary Ellen Wilson (Perkins, Martha)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Miriam Heard on behalf of Deborah Carr, Brenda Moore, Mary Ellen Wilson (Heard, Miriam)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Alyse Dorfman on behalf of Deborah Carr, Brenda Moore, Mary Ellen Wilson (Dorfman, Deborah)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Harvey Reiter on behalf of Deborah Carr, Brenda Moore, Mary Ellen Wilson (Reiter, Harvey)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #32 MOTION for Attorney(s) Harvey Reiter to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Deborah Carr, Brenda Moore, Mary Ellen Wilson. (Toubman, Sheldon)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Wong on behalf of Deborah Carr, Brenda Moore, Mary Ellen Wilson (Wong, Carol)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #32 MOTION for Attorney Harvey Reiter to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/15/2022. Signed by Clerk on 08/16/2022. (Peterson, M)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #28 MOTION for Attorney Deborah Dorfman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; granting #29 MOTION for Attorney Jane Perkins to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; granting #30 MOTION for Attorney Miriam Delaney Heard to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; granting #31 MOTION for Attorney Carol Wong to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; granting #33 MOTION for Attorney Regan Bailey to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 08/16/2022. (Peterson, M)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION for Attorney(s) Regan Bailey to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Deborah Carr, Brenda Moore, Mary Ellen Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Attorney with Cert. of Good Standing)(Toubman, Sheldon)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Attorney(s) Harvey Reiter to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Deborah Carr, Brenda Moore, Mary Ellen Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Attorney)(Toubman, Sheldon)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Attorney(s) Carol Wong to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Deborah Carr, Brenda Moore, Mary Ellen Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Attorney with Cert. of Good Standing)(Toubman, Sheldon)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Attorney(s) Miriam Delaney Heard to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Deborah Carr, Brenda Moore, Mary Ellen Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Attorney with Cert. of Good Standing)(Toubman, Sheldon)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jane Perkins to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Deborah Carr, Brenda Moore, Mary Ellen Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Attorney with Cert. of Good Standing)(Toubman, Sheldon)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Attorney(s) Deborah Dorfman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Deborah Carr, Brenda Moore, Mary Ellen Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Attorney with Cert. of Good Standing)(Toubman, Sheldon)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: The motion (ECF No. #15 ) is DENIED for failure to comply with Local Rule 83.1(d)(1)(b) ("The motion shall be accompanied by an affidavit, duly sworn and executed by the proposed visiting attorney: identifying the bar of each court of which said attorney is and has ever been a member, and the corresponding bar identification number(s); or if no such numbers have been assigned, so stating."). The motion can be re-filed in accordance with the Local Rule. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/9/22. (Constantine, A.)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: The motion (ECF No. #14 ) is DENIED for failure to comply with Local Rule 83.1(d)(1)(b) ("The motion shall be accompanied by an affidavit, duly sworn and executed by the proposed visiting attorney: identifying the bar of each court of which said attorney is and has ever been a member, and the corresponding bar identification number(s); or if no such numbers have been assigned, so stating."). The motion can be re-filed in accordance with the Local Rule. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/9/22. (Constantine, A.)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: The motion (ECF No. #13 ) is DENIED for failure to comply with Local Rule 83.1(d)(1)(a) ("The motion shall be accompanied by an affidavit, duly sworn and executed by the proposed visiting attorney stating the proposed visiting attorney's... telephone number...") and Rule 83.1(d)(1)(b) ("The motion shall be accompanied by an affidavit, duly sworn and executed by the proposed visiting attorney: identifying the bar of each court of which said attorney is and has ever been a member, and the corresponding bar identification number(s); or if no such numbers have been assigned, so stating."). The motion can be re-filed in accordance with the Local Rule. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/9/22. (Constantine, A.)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: The motion (ECF No. #12 ) is DENIED for failure to comply with Local Rule 83.1(d)(1)(a) ("The motion shall be accompanied by an affidavit, duly sworn and executed by the proposed visiting attorney stating the proposed visiting attorney's... fax number...") and Rule 83.1(d)(1)(b) ("The motion shall be accompanied by an affidavit, duly sworn and executed by the proposed visiting attorney: identifying the bar of each court of which said attorney is and has ever been a member, and the corresponding bar identification number(s); or if no such numbers have been assigned, so stating."). The motion can be re-filed in accordance with the Local Rule. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/9/22. (Constantine, A.)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER : The motion (ECF No. #11 ) is DENIED for failure to comply with Local Rule 83.1(d)(1)(a) ("The motion shall be accompanied by an affidavit, duly sworn and executed by the proposed visiting attorney stating the proposed visiting attorney's... fax number...") and Rule 83.1(d)(1)(b) ("The motion shall be accompanied by an affidavit, duly sworn and executed by the proposed visiting attorney: identifying the bar of each court of which said attorney is and has ever been a member, and the corresponding bar identification number(s); or if no such numbers have been assigned, so stating."). The motion can be re-filed in accordance with the Local Rule. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/9/22. (Constantine, A.)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The motion (ECF No. #10 ) is DENIED for failure to comply with Local Rule 83.1(d)(1)(a) ("The motion shall be accompanied by an affidavit, duly sworn and executed by the proposed visiting attorney stating the proposed visiting attorney's... fax number...") and Rule 83.1(d)(1)(b) ("The motion shall be accompanied by an affidavit, duly sworn and executed by the proposed visiting attorney: identifying the bar of each court of which said attorney is and has ever been a member, and the corresponding bar identification number(s); or if no such numbers have been assigned, so stating."). The motion can be re-filed in accordance with the Local Rule. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/9/22. (Constantine, A.)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Evidentiary Hearing on Motion re: #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2022 09:30 AM in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Michael P. Shea Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/8/22.(Johnson, D.)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 9/8/2022; Reply brief due by 9/19/2022 (Johnson, D.)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE by Xavier Becerra (McMahon, Madeline)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: As set forth on the record during today's conference, and consented to by the parties, by close of business today the defendant shall file on the docket a summary of its position as to the enforcement of 42 C.F.R. 433.400(c)(2)(i)(B) as to Ms. Moore and Ms. Carr and what it has communicated to the State of Connecticut as to the same. The defendant's opposition to the plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction shall be filed by 9/8/22. The plaintiffs' reply brief shall be filed by 9/19. The Court will hold an evidentiary hearing on the plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction on 9/27 at 9:30 am in Courtroom 3. To the extent necessary, the hearing will continue to 9/28. Prior to 9/20, the parties shall confer regarding witnesses and exhibits for the hearing. By 5:00 PM on 9/20, the parties shall jointly file their witness and exhibit lists, and they shall indicate any objections the parties have to witnesses or exhibits. By noon on 9/22, the parties shall deliver to chambers two courtesy copies of all exhibits, each placed in a three-ring binder with a copy of the exhibit list at the front of the binder and each exhibit separately tabbed. The parties shall deliver the original set of exhibits along with an exhibit list to the Courtroom Deputy. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/8/22. (Constantine, A.)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael P. Shea: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/8/2022. 38 minutes(Court Reporter J. Monette.) (Johnson, D.)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline McMahon on behalf of Xavier Becerra (McMahon, Madeline)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, TRO/PI Motion and Supporting Documents, 8/4/22 Court Order re TRO Motion were served on Attorneys Michelle McConaghy, David Nelson, John Larson, Alex Haas on 8/4/22, filed by Deborah Carr, Brenda Moore, Mary Ellen Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Service)(Toubman, Sheldon)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Harvey Reiter to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7025285) by Deborah Carr, Brenda Moore, Mary Ellen Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Attorney)(Toubman, Sheldon)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Deborah Dorfman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7025276) by Deborah Carr, Brenda Moore, Mary Ellen Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Attorney with Cert. of Good Standing)(Toubman, Sheldon)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Regan Bailey to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7025264) by Deborah Carr, Brenda Moore, Mary Ellen Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Attorney with Cert. of Good Standing)(Toubman, Sheldon)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Carol Wong to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7025248) by Deborah Carr, Brenda Moore, Mary Ellen Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Attorney with Cert. of Good Standing)(Toubman, Sheldon)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Miriam Delaney Heard to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7025216) by Deborah Carr, Brenda Moore, Mary Ellen Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Attorney with Cert. of Good Standing)(Toubman, Sheldon)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jane Perkins to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7025179) by Deborah Carr, Brenda Moore, Mary Ellen Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Attorney with Cert. of Good Standing)(Toubman, Sheldon)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Lynn McConaghy on behalf of Xavier Becerra (McConaghy, Michelle)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of the complaint, motion for temporary restraining order and supporting papers, and a copy of this order on the United States Attorney as well as on Assistant U.S. Attorneys Michelle McConaghy and David Nelson (Chief and Deputy Chief of the Civil Division, respectively) and on the Federal Programs Branch of the Civil Division in Washington, D.C., on or before 3pm on Friday, August 5, 2022, by (1) overnight, certified mail, and (2) email. Plaintiffs shall file proof of such service on the docket no later than 5pm on August 5. The Court will hold a telephonic status conference to discuss the motion for TRO at 2pm on August 8, 2022. Chambers will provide dial-in information. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/4/2022. (Wong, Qing Wai)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Electronic Summons Issued, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Mary Ellen Wilson, Deborah Carr, Brenda Moore, #6 Protective Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Deborah Carr Signed by Clerk on 08/04/2022. (Peterson, M)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/8/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Michael P. Shea (Johnson, D.)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 08/03/2022. (Peterson, M)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 08/03/2022. (Peterson, M)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/2/2022. Discovery due by 2/2/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 3/9/2023. Signed by Clerk on 08/03/2022. (Peterson, M)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Deborah Carr, Brenda Moore, Mary Ellen Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo in support of Motion for TRO/PI, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Plaintiff Carr, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Plaintiff Moore, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Plaintiff Wilson, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Atty. Toubman, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed TRO)(Toubman, Sheldon). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 8/4/2022 (Hushin, Z.).
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Xavier Becerra * with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Sheldon V. Toubman* *Disability Rights Connecticut* *846 Wethersfield Avenue* *Hartford, CT 06114*. (Hushin, Z.)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7022208.), filed by Deborah Carr, Brenda Moore, Mary Ellen Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment)(Toubman, Sheldon) Modified on 8/3/2022 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.).
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Xavier Becerra. (Toubman, Sheldon) Modified on 8/3/2022 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Hushin, Z.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carr et al v. Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Carr
Represented By: Sheldon V. Toubman
Represented By: Deborah Alyse Dorfman
Represented By: Harvey Reiter
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Represented By: Carol Wong
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Represented By: Miriam Heard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Moore
Represented By: Sheldon V. Toubman
Represented By: Deborah Alyse Dorfman
Represented By: Harvey Reiter
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Represented By: Carol Wong
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Represented By: Miriam Heard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ellen Wilson
Represented By: Sheldon V. Toubman
Represented By: Harvey Reiter
Represented By: Deborah Alyse Dorfman
Represented By: Regan Bailey
Represented By: Carol Wong
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Represented By: Miriam Heard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Shaw
Represented By: Sheldon V. Toubman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Katz
Represented By: Sheldon V. Toubman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Madeline McMahon
Represented By: Michelle Lynn McConaghy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?