Allstate Insurance Company v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv01031
Filed: August 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Sarah A L Merriam
Referring Judge: Omar A Williams
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER. The court thanks the parties for submitting their Rule 26(f) Planning Report, see ECF No. #28 , and hereby APPROVES and ADOPTS all procedures and deadlines proposed therein, as amended herein. In addition, the parties' request for referral to a United States Magistrate Judge for a settlement conference is granted. The Clerk respectfully is requested to refer the case for that purpose. The court adopts the following deadlines:Discovery due by June 15, 2023.Dispositive Motions due by July 14, 2023.Joint Trial Memorandum due by July 14, 2023, or if dispositive motions are filed, the date specified in the courts ruling on such motions.The parties shall be ready for trial by August 28, 2023, or within forty-five days after the parties file their Joint Trial Memorandum, whichever is later. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 10/13/22. (Codeanne, K.)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hughes, Patrick)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 10/5/2022.(Perez, J.)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Omar A. Williams for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 10/5/2022.(Hushin, Z.)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Electrolux Home Products, Inc..(Chomiak, Robert)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC for Allstate Insurance Company. (Hughes, Patrick)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Jerome Cunningham on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Cunningham, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 First Corporate Disclosure Statement by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Chomiak, Robert)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick A. Hughes on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Hughes, Patrick)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE. All parties are advised that they may elect to consent to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge. United States Magistrate Judges do not conduct felony criminal trials; as a result, parties are often able to schedule a jury trial before a Magistrate Judge sooner and with more flexibility than a jury trial before a District Judge. If all parties consent to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge, the parties should complete and file the attached consent form. If any party does not consent, that information should not be conveyed to the Court, and no consent form should be filed. The Court notes that ordinarily, where the parties consent to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, any Magistrate Judge who has previously been involved in confidential settlement discussions would not be assigned to hear the trial. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 9/20/2022.(Caffrey, A.)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond E. Mack on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Mack, Raymond)
September 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting, in part, and denying, in part, #17 MOTION for Extension of Time. Defendant Electrolux has filed a renewed motion for extension of time to respond to the Complaint. See Doc. #17 . The Court denied the prior motion, Doc. #15 , because defendant failed to comply with Local Rule 7. The Court expressly advised defendant's counsel of the ways in which the motion was deficient, and ordered that any renewed motion must comply "in all respects with the Local Rules." Doc. #16. The Court stated, in part: "[D]efendant's motion fails to comply with Local Rule 7. It was filed on the deadline it seeks to extend and does not 'set forth reasons why the motion was not filed at least three business days before the deadline in question.' D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 7(b)(3). Indeed, counsel for defendant appeared in this matter on August 30, 2022, and had plenty of time to either file a response or seek an extension of time. See Doc. #8 , Doc. #9 ." Doc. #16. The renewed motion inexplicably does not even attempt to comply with Local Rule 7(b)(3). To the contrary, the renewed motion acknowledges that counsel filed an appearance on August 30, 2022, but fails to explain why counsel did not seek an extension of time at least three business days in advance of the deadline, as required by the Local Rules. In light of plaintiff's consent, and in the interest of efficiency, the Court will grant the non-compliant motion, in part. Defendant Electrolux shall respond to the Complaint on or before October 11, 2022. Future motions that do not comply with the Federal and Local Rules and with the orders or instructions of the Court will be summarily denied, and leave to refile may not be granted. All counsel are directed to carefully review the Local Rules of the District of Connecticut, which are available on the Court's website. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 9/10/2022. (Katz, S.)
September 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Responsive pleading deadline updated for Electrolux Home Products, Inc. to 10/11/2022. (Katz, S.)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/8/2022Renewed Motion for Enlargement to file a responsive pleading to the plaintiff's complaint by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Chomiak, Robert)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying, without prejudice to re-filing, #15 First Motion for Extension of Time until November 8, 2022, to file a responsive pleading.Defendant's response to the Complaint is due today, September 8, 2022, the same date on which defendant has filed its motion for an extension of time. This is problematic for several reasons.First, by filing the motion for extension of time on the day the response is due, defendant effectively, and unilaterally, extended the responsive pleading deadline.Second, defendant's motion fails to comply with Local Rule 7. It was filed on the deadline it seeks to extend and does not "set forth reasons why the motion was not filed at least three business days before the deadline in question." D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 7(b)(3). Indeed, counsel for defendant appeared in this matter on August 30, 2022, and had plenty of time to either file a response or seek an extension of time. See Doc. #8 , Doc. #9 . Most significantly, defendant has failed to demonstrate good cause for the requested extension, which "requires a particularized showing that the time limitation in question cannot reasonably be met despite the diligence of the party seeking the extension." D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 7(b)(1). Defendant provides no explanation whatsoever why it requires such a lengthy extension of the responsive pleading deadline.Defendant may file a renewed motion, provided that it complies in all respects with the Local Rules. Counsel is advised that in the future, motions which fail to comply with the Federal and Local Rules may be summarily denied, and leave to refile may not be granted.It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 9/8/2022. (Katz, S.)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/8/2022 to file a responsive pleading to the plaintiff's complaint by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Chomiak, Robert)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Raymond E. Mack, Esq. Signed by Clerk on 9/7/2022. (Imbriani, Susan)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Patrick A. Hughes, Esq. Signed by Clerk on 9/7/2022. (Imbriani, Susan)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Raymond E. Mack, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7057878) by Allstate Insurance Company. (Donnelly, Derek)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Patrick A. Hughes, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7057870) by Allstate Insurance Company. (Donnelly, Derek)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Electrolux Home Products, Inc. served on 8/18/2022, answer due 9/8/2022. (Donnelly, Derek)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/13/2022 (Caffrey, A.)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Chomiak, Jr on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. Revised (Chomiak, Robert)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. LaFleche on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (LaFleche, Adam)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Electrolux Home Products, Inc. * with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Derek E. Donnelly* *Law Office of Stuart G. Blackburn* *2 Concorde Way # 3C P.O. Box 608* *Windsor Locks, CT 06096*. (Caffrey, A.)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. All counsel and self-represented parties are advised that any requests for relief, including the rescheduling of conferences or hearings that have been calendared on ECF, must be made by filing of a motion on the docket, in full compliance with all applicable Federal and Local Rules. Relief from deadlines, orders, and calendars may not be obtained by calling or emailing chambers staff or the Clerk's Office. Court staff cannot provide advice or guidance, and ex parte communications with the Court are generally improper. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 8/15/2022.(Caffrey, A.)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Allstate Insurance Company, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, and #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 8/15/2022.(Caffrey, A.)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 8/15/2022.(Caffrey, A.)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 8/15/2022.(Caffrey, A.)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/14/2022; Discovery due by 2/14/2023; Dispositive Motions due by 3/21/2023 Signed by Clerk on 8/15/2022.(Caffrey, A.)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Electrolux Home Products, Inc. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7033666.), filed by Allstate Insurance Company.(Donnelly, Derek)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Donnelly, Derek)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam added. (Anastasio, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Derek E. Donnelly
Represented By: Patrick A. Hughes
Represented By: Raymond E. Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: Adam J. LaFleche
Represented By: Jeffrey Jerome Cunningham
Represented By: Robert J. Chomiak, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?