Civitello v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: John Noel Civitello
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2022cv01073
Filed: August 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER finding as moot #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; finding as moot #8 Recommended Ruling. The filing fee has been paid. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/21/22. (Caldero, M.)
October 21, 2022 Filing 10 Social Security Transcripts. (Fernandez, Sixtina)
October 21, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sixtina Fernandez on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Fernandez, Sixtina)
October 19, 2022 Filing fee received from Ivan Katz, Esq.: $402.00, receipt number 25826. (Freberg, B)
September 27, 2022 Filing 8 RECOMMENDED RULING denying #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John C. See the attached ruling. Objections due by 10/11/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria E. Garcia on 9/27/22. (Lefevre, Arthur)
August 24, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of New SSA Action: Electronic service of the complaint was made by the Clerk's Office upon the Social Security Office of General Counsel and the US Attorney's Office for the District of Connecticut. (Chartier, AnnMarie)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/24/2022.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/24/2022.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Chartier, AnnMarie)
August 24, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Noel Civitello. (Chartier, AnnMarie)
August 24, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ivan Michael Katz on behalf of John Noel Civitello (Chartier, AnnMarie)
August 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by John Noel Civitello. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chartier, AnnMarie)
August 24, 2022 Answer deadline updated for Kilolo Kijakazi to 10/23/2022. (Chartier, AnnMarie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Civitello v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Noel Civitello
Represented By: Ivan Michael Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Sixtina Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?