Cruz et al v. Signify North America Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Juan Cruz and Emily Lopez-Cruz
Defendant: Signify North America Corporation, Philips Lighting N.A. Co., George Harbt, Damien Fritz and Cynthia Byrd
Case Number: 3:2022cv01081
Filed: August 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Sarala V Nagala
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendants' motion to dismiss is hereby extended until November 4, 2022. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 10/24/2022. (Kuegler, Adam)
October 21, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) until November 4, 2022 by Juan Cruz, Emily Lopez-Cruz. (Ranks, Andrew)
October 21, 2022 Filing 24 Joint STATUS REPORT of Counsel by Cynthia Byrd, Damien Fritz, George Harbt, Signify North America Corporation. (Rotondo, James)
October 13, 2022 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sarala V. Nagala: granting #19 Motion to Stay Discovery;Motion Hearing held on 10/13/2022 re #19 Consent MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss filed by Cynthia Byrd, George Harbt, Signify North America Corporation, Damien Fritz, Scheduling Conference held on 10/13/2022. 19 minutes (Court Reporter Denae Hovland.) (Bozek, M.)
October 13, 2022 Set Deadline: Status Report due by 10/27/2022. (Bozek, M.)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Stay Discovery. For the reasons discussed on the record during the October 13, 2022, status conference, Defendants' motion to stay discovery pending the resolution of Defendants' motion to dismiss (ECF No. #13 ) is granted. Pursuant to the Court's oral order on the record, by October 27, 2022, the parties shall submit a joint status report addressing whether referral to a Magistrate Judge for settlement purposes is appropriate at this time. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 10/13/2022. (Kuegler, Adam)
October 7, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Scheduling Conference set for 10/13/2022 11:00 AM via Zoom before Judge Sarala V. Nagala. (Bozek, M.)
October 7, 2022 NOTICE regarding hearing via Zoom: The scheduling conference scheduled for 10/13/2022 at 11:00 AM will be conducted via Zoom. The video link is https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1608495632?pwd=UHFBV25Bemx6MDVBaTNVOGUrWUJ2Zz09 and call in numbers are 1-669-254-5252 US (San Jose) or 1-646-828-7666 US (New York).Meeting ID: 160 849 5632 Meeting Password: 584160Please note: Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, screenshots, streaming, and rebroadcasting in any form, of court proceedings. The Judicial Conference of the United States, which governs the practices of the federal courts, has prohibited it. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. (Bozek, M.)
October 4, 2022 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Austin, Matthew)
October 4, 2022 Filing 19 Consent MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss by Cynthia Byrd, Damien Fritz, George Harbt, Signify North America Corporation.Responses due by 10/25/2022 (Austin, Matthew)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 9/26/2022.(Bozek, M.)
September 19, 2022 Filing 17 Supplemental NOTICE by Cynthia Byrd, Damien Fritz, George Harbt, Signify North America Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Return of Notice Papers, #2 Superior Court Docket - Cruz et al. v. Signify et al., #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal (electronically filed))(Austin, Matthew)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time. Responses to Defendants' pending motion to dismiss (ECF No. #13 ) shall be filed by October 28, 2022. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 09/14/2022. (Kuegler, Adam)
September 13, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) until October 28, 2022 by Juan Cruz, Emily Lopez-Cruz. (Ranks, Andrew)
September 2, 2022 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) filed by Cynthia Byrd, Damien Fritz, George Harbt, Signify North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 2018 Case Complaint, #2 Affidavit of George Harbt, #3 Affidavit of Cynthia Byrd, #4 Affidavit of Damian Fritz)(Austin, Matthew)
September 2, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) by Cynthia Byrd, Damien Fritz, George Harbt, Signify North America Corporation.Responses due by 9/23/2022 (Austin, Matthew)
September 2, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew B Ranks on behalf of Juan Cruz, Emily Lopez-Cruz (Ranks, Andrew)
August 26, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Notice (Other) filed by Cynthia Byrd, George Harbt, Signify North America Corporation, Damien Fritz, #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Cynthia Byrd, George Harbt, Signify North America Corporation, Damien Fritz, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Signify North America Corporation, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Signify North America Corporation, #10 Protective Order, #9 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Notice of Appearance filed by Cynthia Byrd, George Harbt, Signify North America Corporation, Damien Fritz, #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Cynthia Byrd, George Harbt, Signify North America Corporation, Damien Fritz, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Cynthia Byrd, George Harbt, Signify North America Corporation, Damien Fritz. Signed by Clerk on 8/26/2022. (Mendez, D)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 8/26/2022. (Mendez, D)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 8/26/2022. (Mendez, D)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/25/2022. Discovery due by 2/25/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 4/1/2023. Signed by Clerk on 8/26/2022. (Mendez, D)
August 26, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Fay Kalichman on behalf of Cynthia Byrd, Damien Fritz, George Harbt, Signify North America Corporation (Kalichman, Hannah)
August 26, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James H. Rotondo on behalf of Cynthia Byrd, Damien Fritz, George Harbt, Signify North America Corporation (Rotondo, James)
August 26, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by Cynthia Byrd, Damien Fritz, George Harbt, Signify North America Corporation (Notice of No Pending Motions) (Austin, Matthew)
August 26, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by Cynthia Byrd, Damien Fritz, George Harbt, Signify North America Corporation (Statement Pursuant to Standing Order in Removed Cases) (Austin, Matthew)
August 26, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Signify North America Corporation. (Austin, Matthew)
August 26, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew W. Austin on behalf of Cynthia Byrd, Damien Fritz, George Harbt, Signify North America Corporation (Austin, Matthew)
August 26, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Signify North America Corporation from Connecticut Superior Court, case number N/A. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7047500, filed by Signify North America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint (Superior Court), #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Joint Offer of Compromise (Superior Court))(Austin, Matthew)
August 26, 2022 Judge Sarala V. Nagala added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz et al v. Signify North America Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signify North America Corporation
Represented By: Hannah Fay Kalichman
Represented By: James H. Rotondo
Represented By: Matthew W. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips Lighting N.A. Co.
Represented By: Hannah Fay Kalichman
Represented By: James H. Rotondo
Represented By: Matthew W. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Harbt
Represented By: Hannah Fay Kalichman
Represented By: James H. Rotondo
Represented By: Matthew W. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damien Fritz
Represented By: Hannah Fay Kalichman
Represented By: James H. Rotondo
Represented By: Matthew W. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Byrd
Represented By: Hannah Fay Kalichman
Represented By: James H. Rotondo
Represented By: Matthew W. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Cruz
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Garza
Represented By: Andrew B Ranks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Lopez-Cruz
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Garza
Represented By: Andrew B Ranks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?