Sheiman v. US Dept of the Treasury
Plaintiff: Michael E. Sheiman
Defendant: Treasury, Dept of the and US Dept of the Treasury
Case Number: 3:2022cv01138
Filed: September 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Recovery of IRS Tax
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. SELF-REPRESENTED FILERS ARE REQUIRED TO COMPLY WITH THE JUDGE'S STANDARD ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER WHICH IS ATTACHED. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/28/22.(Johnson, D.)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The motion (ECF No. #7 ) to participate in electronic filing is granted. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/28/22. (Constantine, A.)
September 19, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION By Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing by Michael E. Sheiman. (Peterson, M)
September 19, 2022 Filing 6 Consent to Electronic Notice by Michael E. Sheiman (Peterson, M)
September 19, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Treasury, Dept of the* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. *Michael E. Sheiman* *12 Webb Street* *Hamden, CT 06517*. (Freberg, B)
September 19, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Treasury, Dept of the. (Freberg, B)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 09/08/2022. (Peterson, M)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 09/08/2022. (Peterson, M)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/7/2022. Discovery due by 3/10/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 4/14/2023. Signed by Clerk on 09/08/2022. (Peterson, M)
September 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Treasury, Dept of the, filed by Michael E. Sheiman. (Attachments: #1 Attachments) (Peterson, M)
September 8, 2022 Filing fee received from Michael Sheiman: $ 402.00, receipt number 25618 (Peterson, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheiman v. US Dept of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. Sheiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasury, Dept of the
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Dept of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?