Kraminsky v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Plaintiff: Irina Kraminsky and Michael Kraminsky
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv01202
Filed: September 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Referring Judge: Maria E Garcia
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2022 Filing 21 Case remanded to State Court Judicial District of Danbury at Danbury. (Fanelle, N.)
November 2, 2022 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Fanelle, N.)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting on consent #15 Motion to Remand to State Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to (1) remand this case to the Connecticut Superior Court, judicial district of Danbury at Danbury and (2) close this case. The #17 Motion for Extension of Time is denied as moot.Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 10/28/2022. (Chambers, Jillian)
October 27, 2022 Filing 19 Consent RESPONSE of CVS Pharmacy, Inc. to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Dwyer, Paul)
October 27, 2022 Filing 18 Joint STIPULATION to Cap on Damages by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Dwyer, Paul)
October 26, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 2, 2022 for CVS Pharmacy, Inc, to object to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Dwyer, Paul)
October 6, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by David James Scully on behalf of Irina Kraminsky (Scully, David)
October 5, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Irina Kraminsky.Responses due by 10/26/2022 (Scully, David)
September 30, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. re #13 Answer to Complaint (Dwyer, Paul)
September 30, 2022 Filing 13 CVS Pharmacy, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by CVS Pharmacy, Inc..(Dwyer, Paul)
September 28, 2022 Filing 12 Second CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. for Service of Document Nos. 8 through 11 with Docket Text adding Judge Kari A. Dooley and Magistrate Judge Maria E. Garcia upon Plaintiff's Counsel (Dwyer, Paul)
September 26, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #10 Protective Order, #9 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Notice (Other) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., #3 Notice (Other) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., #1 Notice of Removal, filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., #4 Notice (Other) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., #7 Notice (Other) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 9/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 standing order on removed cases) (Fanelle, N.)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/23/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/23/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/22/2022 Discovery due by 3/25/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 4/29/2023 Signed by Clerk on 9/23/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
September 23, 2022 Judge Kari A. Dooley and Magistrate Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Freberg, B)
September 23, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. for Certification of Service of the Removal Documents upon Plaintiffs' Counsel (Dwyer, Paul)
September 23, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 7.3 by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Dwyer, Paul)
September 23, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. to Counsel Regarding Local Rule 5(b) (Dwyer, Paul)
September 23, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. of Pending Motions (Dwyer, Paul)
September 23, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. for Statement Pursuant to Standing Order in Removed Cases (Dwyer, Paul)
September 23, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Edwin Dwyer on behalf of CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Dwyer, Paul)
September 23, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. from CT Judicial District of Danbury, Superior Court, case number DBD-CV-22-6044013. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7079511, filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit b)(Dwyer, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kraminsky v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irina Kraminsky
Represented By: David James Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kraminsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Edwin Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?