Homesite Ins. Co. v. Magnotta et al
Plaintiff: Homesite Insurance Company and Homesite Ins. Co.
Defendant: Randy Magnotta and Alyssa Kibbie
Case Number: 3:2022cv01325
Filed: October 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2023 Filing 24 Memorandum in Opposition re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Alyssa Kibbie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Underlying Complaint)(Pavano, John)
August 18, 2023 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/18/2023. 6 minutes (Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Bozek, M.)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OF CONFERENCE AND ORDER. The Court heard from counsel regarding the status of discovery. With respect to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, defendant Kibbie shall file any objection or other response by August 28, 2023, and plaintiff may file any replies to the oppositions of defendant Magnotta and defendant Kibbie by September 7, 2023 (allowing extra time because of the Labor Day weekend). The Court anticipates it will thereafter set a date for oral argument. Defense counsel advised that they do not intend to file motions for summary judgment. Counsel advised that there is some remaining discovery outstanding, and the Court advised that counsel should promptly consult with respect to this and advise the Court if there is an impasse for which the Court should conduct a discovery conference. All counsel appearing for defendant Kibbie should ensure that they have filed notices of appearance on the docket. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/18/2023. (Wang, S.)
August 15, 2023 Filing 21 Memorandum in Opposition re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Randy Magnotta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Spadaccini, Louis)
August 11, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 8/11/2023 Telephone Status Conference set for 8/18/2023 03:45 PM before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. Parties are instructed to call 877-402-9753; Access Code 8576007#. (Lewis, D)
July 25, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Homesite Ins. Co..Responses due by 8/15/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Exhibit A (Policy), #4 Exhibit B (Magnotta INT responses), #5 Exhibit C (Magnotta RFAs))(Ringold, James)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 GENERAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Report (Doc. #17 ) is hereby APPROVED as modified by this order. All discovery shall be completed by October 31, 2023, and all other interim discovery dates set forth in the parties' Rule 26(f) Report are hereby adopted. Any dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by November 30, 2023, and any response to dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by December 30, 2023. The parties' joint trial memorandum is due by November 30, 2023, or within 30 days of the Court's ruling on dispositive summary judgment motions, whichever date is later. The Court will thereafter set a trial date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to jury selection within 30 days of the filing of the joint trial memorandum. Please refer to Judge Meyer's webpage on the District of Connecticut website for Judge Meyer's "Instructions for Discovery Disputes" and "Instructions for Joint Trial Memorandum" and "Pretrial Preferences" and "Trial Preferences." The parties are encouraged to commence discovery forthwith and to arrange their schedules in contemplation of the briefing deadlines for any dispositive motions, because the Court is unlikely to grant a future request for an extension of the scheduling order absent extraordinary and unforeseeable circumstances. A telephonic status conference will be held on August 11, 2023 at 3:15 p.m. Parties are instructed to call 877-402-9753; Access Code 8576007#. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/27/23.(Barry, Donna)
January 25, 2023 Filing 17 First REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ringold, James)
January 11, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Alyssa Kibbie.(Pavano, John)
January 11, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John Jay Pavano on behalf of Alyssa Kibbie (Pavano, John)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #13 ) until January 30, 2023 to file the Rule 26(f) report. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/22/22. (Barry, Donna)
December 12, 2022 Reset Deadline: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/30/2023 (Barry, Donna)
December 8, 2022 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until January 30, 2023 to file the Rule 26(f) report by Homesite Ins. Co.. (Ringold, James)
November 16, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Randy Magnotta.(Spadaccini, Louis)
November 16, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Anthony Spadaccini on behalf of Randy Magnotta (Spadaccini, Louis)
November 11, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Alyssa Kibbie waiver sent on 10/24/2022, answer due 12/23/2022 filed by Homesite Ins. Co.. (Ringold, James)
November 1, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure, and initial orders served on Randy Magnotta on 10/26/2022, filed by Homesite Ins. Co.. (Ringold, James)
October 24, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Alyssa Kibbie* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James Efrem Ringold* *Loughlin Fitzgerald, P.C.-Wallingford* *150 South Main Street* *Wallingford, CT 06492*. (Chartier, AnnMarie)
October 24, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Randy Magnotta* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James Efrem Ringold* *Loughlin Fitzgerald, P.C.-Wallingford* *150 South Main Street* *Wallingford, CT 06492*. (Chartier, AnnMarie)
October 24, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Homesite Ins. Co., #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Protective Order, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Homesite Ins. Co. Signed by Clerk on 10/24/2022.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/21/2022.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/21/2022.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/20/2022 Discovery due by 4/22/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 5/27/2023 Signed by Clerk on 10/21/2022.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
October 21, 2022 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Oliver, T.)
October 21, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Homesite Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Homesite Securities Company LLC, Corporate Parent Homesite Group Incorporated, Corporate Parent AMFAM, Inc., Corporate Parent American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., Corporate Parent AmFam Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent American Family Insurance Mutual Holding Company for Homesite Insurance Company. (Ringold, James)
October 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7109878.), filed by Homesite Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Underlying Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (insurance policy))(Ringold, James)
October 21, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Randy Magnotta. (Ringold, James)
October 21, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Alyssa Kibbie. (Ringold, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Homesite Ins. Co. v. Magnotta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homesite Insurance Company
Represented By: James Efrem Ringold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homesite Ins. Co.
Represented By: James Efrem Ringold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Magnotta
Represented By: Louis Anthony Spadaccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alyssa Kibbie
Represented By: John Jay Pavano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?