Stamford Town Center, LLC v. Express Fashion Operations, LLC
Plaintiff: Stamford Town Center, LLC
Defendant: Express Fashion Operations, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv01333
Filed: October 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2022 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Johnson, D.)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. Because this case has been reported as settled in full, the #13 motion to remand and the #21 motion to consolidate are hereby DENIED as moot.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/20/2022. (Davis, Christina)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. This case has been reported settled. Therefore, this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Rather than continue to keep the case open on the docket, the Clerk is directed administratively to close the file without prejudice to reopening on or before March 6, 2023. If the parties wish to file a stipulation of dismissal (for approval by the Court or simply for inclusion in the Court's file), they may do so on or before March 6, 2023. The dates set forth in this order may be extended for good cause pursuant to a motion filed in accordance with Local Rule 7.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/20/2022. (Davis, Christina)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: A settlement conference was held on 12/19/2022. A minute entry for the conference has been entered in a related matter (3:22cc1029(MPS)). The parties reached a settlement at today's settlement conference. They will spend the coming days drafting and executing the written settlement agreement. The parties have asked that, in this case, unlike the 3:22cv1029(MPS) case, the Court enter an administrative closure order which gives them 75 days to move to re-open the case, if necessary, to allow for the performance of one key provision of the settlement. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on December 19, 2022. (Briskin, Corey)
November 29, 2022 Filing 23 Memorandum in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:22-CV-01029-MPS filed by Stamford Town Center, LLC. (Burke, Liam)
November 18, 2022 Filing 22 Memorandum in Opposition Express Fashion's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Express Fashion Operations, LLC. (Roberts, Greil)
November 8, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:22-CV-01029-MPS by Express Fashion Operations, LLC.Responses due by 11/29/2022 (Roberts, Greil)
November 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: A settlement conference is scheduled in this case for December 19, 2022, at 10:00am. Please see the attached Settlement Conference Order for detailed instructions and deadlines. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on November 5, 2022. (Briskin, Corey)
November 5, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A settlement conference via Zoom is scheduled for 12/19/2022 at 10:00am with Judge Robert M. Spector. The Court has scheduled the settlement conference for 12/19/22 because that is the date the parties requested. (Briskin, Corey)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Spector for Settlement Conference Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 11/4/22.(Johnson, D.)(per order #17) Modified on 11/8/2022 (Johnson, D.).
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. Pending the resolution of the plaintiff's #13 Motion to Remand to State Court, this case is hereby REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Spector for consideration in the early settlement conference proceedings in Stamford Town Center, LLC v. Express Fashion Operations, LLC, Dkt. No. 22-cv-1029 (MPS). Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 11/4/2022. (Davis, Christina)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Michael P. Shea for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/3/2022. (Reis, Julia)
October 31, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer and affirmative defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Stamford Town Center, LLC by Express Fashion Operations, LLC.(Roberts, Greil)
October 28, 2022 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Stamford Town Center, LLC. (Burke, Liam)
October 28, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Stamford Town Center, LLC.Responses due by 11/18/2022 (Burke, Liam)
October 28, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Liam S. Burke on behalf of Stamford Town Center, LLC (Burke, Liam)
October 25, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Express Fashion Operations, LLC, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Express Fashion Operations, LLC, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Express Fashion Operations, LLC, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Express Fashion Operations, LLC, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Express Fashion Operations, LLC, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Express Fashion Operations, LLC, #7 Notice (Other) filed by Express Fashion Operations, LLC, #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #9 Electronic Filing Order, #10 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 10/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals)(Reis, Julia)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/24/2022. (Reis, Julia)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/24/2022. (Reis, Julia)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/23/2022. Discovery due by 4/25/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 5/30/2023. Signed by Clerk on 10/24/2022. (Reis, Julia)
October 24, 2022 Judge Stefan R. Underhill and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Freberg, B)
October 24, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE by Express Fashion Operations, LLC NOTICE OF SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Roberts, Greil)
October 24, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Fashion Operations, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Express, LLC, Corporate Parent Express, Inc., Other Affiliate Express Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate Express Topco LLC for Express Fashion Operations, LLC. (Roberts, Greil)
October 24, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by Express Fashion Operations, LLC Notice of Pending Motions (Roberts, Greil)
October 24, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by Express Fashion Operations, LLC Certificate of Compliance with Standing Order on Removed Cases (Roberts, Greil)
October 24, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Douglas Bullard on behalf of Express Fashion Operations, LLC (Bullard, Andrew)
October 24, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Greil Roberts on behalf of Express Fashion Operations, LLC (Roberts, Greil)
October 24, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Express Fashion Operations, LLC from Stamford Housing Session, case number NWH-CV22-6008192-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7111889, filed by Express Fashion Operations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Roberts, Greil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stamford Town Center, LLC v. Express Fashion Operations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stamford Town Center, LLC
Represented By: Liam S. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Fashion Operations, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Douglas Bullard
Represented By: Greil Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?