M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation v. Miami Jet Tours Inc. et al
Plaintiff: M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation f/k/a People's Capital and Leasing Corp., M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation and People
Defendant: Miami Jet Tours Inc. and Rafael Mulkey
Case Number: 3:2022cv01345
Filed: October 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Referring Judge: Sarala V Nagala
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Samuel M. Sheldon to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7176936) by Miami Jet Tours Inc., Rafael Mulkey. (Gallagher, Terence)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying without prejudice #14 Motion for Attorney Sheldon to be admitted pro hac vice. Local Rule 83.1(d)(1)(b) requires a visiting attorney to identify the bar identification number of the bar of each court of which the attorney is a member, or state that no such number has been assigned. Although Attorney Sheldon represents that he is a member of the bars of various courts, the motion does not identify the bar numbers assigned by those courts or otherwise indicate that no bar numbers have been assigned. The motion may be refiled in compliance with the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 12/20/2022. (Rennie, Carolyn)
December 15, 2022 Answer deadline updated for Miami Jet Tours Inc. to 1/20/2023; Rafael Mulkey to 1/20/2023. (Bozek, M.)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time until January 20, 2023, to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 12/15/2022. (Rennie, Carolyn)
December 15, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Samuel M. Sheldon to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7170876) by Miami Jet Tours Inc., Rafael Mulkey. (Gallagher, Terence)
December 14, 2022 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until January 20, 2023 to answer, move or otherwise respond to Complaint by Miami Jet Tours Inc., Rafael Mulkey. (Gallagher, Terence)
December 14, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation. Miami Jet Tours Inc. served on 12/6/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Goldstein, Evan)
December 14, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation. Rafael Mulkey served on 11/26/2022, answer due 12/17/2022. (Goldstein, Evan)
December 13, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Miami Jet Tours Inc.. (Gallagher, Terence)
December 13, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Terence J. Gallagher, III on behalf of Miami Jet Tours Inc., Rafael Mulkey (Gallagher, Terence)
November 4, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation identifying Corporate Parent M&T Bank for M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation. (Goldstein, Evan)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 10/28/2022.(Bozek, M.)
October 27, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Miami Jet Tours Inc., Rafael Mulkey* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Evan S. Goldstein* *Updike, Kelly & Spellacy, P.C. Goodwin Square* *225 Asylum Street Ste 20th Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Mendez, D)
October 27, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation. Signed by Clerk on 10/27/2022.(Mendez, D)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 10/25/2022.(Mendez, D)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 10/25/2022.(Mendez, D)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/24/2022. Discovery due by 4/26/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 5/31/2023. Signed by Clerk on 10/25/2022. (Mendez, D)
October 25, 2022 Judge Sarala V. Nagala and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Freberg, B)
October 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7113704.), filed by M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation f/k/a People's Capital and Leasing Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldstein, Evan)
October 25, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Miami Jet Tours Inc., Rafael Mulkey. (Goldstein, Evan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation v. Miami Jet Tours Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation f/k/a People's Capital and Leasing Corp.
Represented By: Evan S. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation
Represented By: Evan S. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People
Represented By: Evan S. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami Jet Tours Inc.
Represented By: Terence J. Gallagher, III.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Mulkey
Represented By: Terence J. Gallagher, III.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?