M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation v. Athens Inc. et al
Plaintiff: M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation f/k/a People's Capital and Leasing Corp., M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation and People
Defendant: Athens Inc., Anthony Dobbs and Grand Canyon Destinations LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv01353
Filed: October 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Athens Inc., Anthony Dobbs, and Grand Canyon Destinations, LLC by M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation. (Goldstein, Evan)
December 8, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Anthony Dobbs waiver sent on 12/8/2022, answer due 2/6/2023 filed by M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation. (Goldstein, Evan)
November 17, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation. Grand Canyon Destinations LLC served on 11/8/2022, answer due 11/29/2022. (Goldstein, Evan)
November 17, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation. Athens Inc. served on 11/8/2022, answer due 11/29/2022. (Goldstein, Evan)
October 27, 2022 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Athens Inc., Anthony Dobbs, Grand Canyon Destinations LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Evan S. Goldstein* *Updike, Kelly & Spellacy, P.C.* *225 Asylum Street, Ste 20th Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Imbriani, Susan)
October 27, 2022 Filing 6 ***ENTERED IN ERROR*** ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Athens Inc., Anthony Dobbs, Grand Canyon Destinations LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Evan S. Goldstein* *Updike, Kelly & Spellacy, P.C.* *225 Asylum Street, Ste 20th Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Imbriani, Susan) Modified on 10/27/2022 (Imbriani, Susan).
October 27, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation, #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 10/26/2022.(Imbriani, Susan)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/26/2022.(Imbriani, Susan)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/26/2022.(Imbriani, Susan)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/25/2022; Discovery due by 4/27/2023; Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2023. Signed by Clerk on 10/26/2022.(Imbriani, Susan)
October 26, 2022 Judge Victor A. Bolden and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Freberg, B)
October 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Athens Inc., Anthony Dobbs, Grand Canyon Destinations LLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7115461.), filed by M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation f/k/a People's Capital and Leasing Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldstein, Evan)
October 26, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Athens Inc., Anthony Dobbs, Grand Canyon Destinations LLC. (Goldstein, Evan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation v. Athens Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation f/k/a People's Capital and Leasing Corp.
Represented By: Evan S. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M&T Capital and Leasing Corporation
Represented By: Evan S. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People
Represented By: Evan S. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Athens Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Canyon Destinations LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?