Munshani v. Protegrity USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sunil Munshani
Defendant: Protegrity USA, Inc. and Protegrity Corporation
Case Number: 3:2022cv01354
Filed: October 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: Thomas O Farrish
2 Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2023 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 1/19/2024. (Murphy, Tatihana)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Amend/Correct #28 Scheduling Order.Fact discovery deadline set for January 19, 2024. All other remaining deadlines in the current scheduling order, ECF No. #28 , shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/30/2023. (Rafla-Yuan, Deanna)
October 27, 2023 Filing 31 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #28 Scheduling Order,,,,,, by Protegrity Corporation, Protegrity USA, Inc..Responses due by 11/17/2023 (Stafstrom, Steven)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court GRANTS the First MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/15/23 to Respond and/or Object to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/2/2023. (Rafla-Yuan, Deanna)
September 29, 2023 Filing 29 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/15/23 to Respond and/or Object to Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents by Protegrity Corporation, Protegrity USA, Inc.. (Frank, Monte)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER:The Court adopts the following schedule for pre-trial deadlines based on the parties' Rule 26(f) Report, the Court's preferences with respect to scheduling, and the Court's current calendar: -Initial disclosures due by June 23, 2023.-Joinder of parties due by June 23, 2023. -Amended pleadings due by July 14, 2023.-Fact depositions shall be completed by October 31, 2023. -Damages analysis due by January 19, 2024.-Designation of expert witnesses for any issues on which the parties bear the burden of proof due by January 19, 2025.-Depositions of expert witnesses for any issues on which the parties bear the burden of proof shall be completed by February 23, 2024. -Designation of expert witnesses for any issues on which the parties do not bear the burden of proof due by March 22, 2024.-Depositions of expert witnesses for any issues on which the parties do not bear the burden of proof shall be completed by May 3, 2024.-All discovery shall close by May 3, 2024.-Dispositive motions due by July 19, 2024. -Joint trial memorandum is due by August 30, 2024, or thirty (30) days after the --Court rules on any dispositive motions. -Trial ready date is September 30, 2024, or thirty (30) days after the joint trial memorandum is filed. If, after the close of discovery, the parties wish to meet with a Magistrate Judge to discuss settlement, the parties may jointly file such a request by May 24, 2024. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/6/2023. (Diallo, I.)
June 2, 2023 Filing 27 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Spears, Brian)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time. The Parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed scheduling order in this case by June 2, 2023. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/16/2023. (Diallo, I.)
May 15, 2023 Filing 25 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until June 2, 2023, to complete 26(f) conference by Sunil Munshani. (Spears, Brian)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER finding as moot #20 Motion to Stay. On December 16, 2022, Plaintiff moved to stay this case until he is sentenced in the underlying criminal case against him in the Southern District of New York. Defendants opposed the motion. See Defs.' Opp'n to the Mot. to Stay, ECF No. 22 (Jan. 3, 2023). On April 10, 2023, the Honorable Jed Rakoff sentenced Plaintiff in the underlying criminal case. See United States v. Munshani, et al., No. 1:22-cr-00215-JSR. The Court may take judicial notice of matters of public record. See, e.g., Mangiafico v. Blumenthal, 471 F.3d 391, 398 (2d Cir. 2006); Johnson v. Pugh, No. 11-CV-385, 2013 WL 3013661, at *2 (E.D.N.Y. June 18, 2013) (finding it "proper to take judicial notice of plaintiff's guilty plea, conviction, and sentencing as a matter of public record... "). Accordingly, the motion to stay is denied as moot. The parties are directed to confer and submit a joint proposed scheduling order in this case by May 19, 2023. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/13/2023. (Diallo, I.)
January 17, 2023 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #20 MOTION to Stay filed by Sunil Munshani. (Spears, Brian)
January 3, 2023 Filing 22 Memorandum in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Stay filed by Protegrity Corporation, Protegrity USA, Inc.. (Frank, Monte)
December 20, 2022 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/20/2022. Total Time: 10 minutes(Court Reporter Sharon Montini.) (Jean-Jacques, Walter)
December 16, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION to Stay by Sunil Munshani.Responses due by 1/6/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Spears, Brian)
December 16, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/20/2022 at 11:30 AM before Judge Victor A. BoldenDial-in: (888) 808-6929 Passcode: 9284309 (Jean-Jacques, Walter)
December 15, 2022 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Frank, Monte)
December 15, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Protegrity Corporation, Protegrity USA, Inc..(Frank, Monte)
December 5, 2022 Answer deadline updated for Protegrity Corporation to 12/18/2022; Protegrity USA, Inc. to 12/18/2022. (Murphy, Tatihana)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until December 18, 2022 to respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/29/2022. (Jean-Jacques, Walter)
November 28, 2022 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until December 18, 2022 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Complaint by Protegrity Corporation, Protegrity USA, Inc.. (Frank, Monte)
November 23, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Stafstrom, Jr on behalf of Protegrity Corporation, Protegrity USA, Inc. (Stafstrom, Steven)
November 23, 2022 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Protegrity Corporation, Protegrity USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Xcelera Inc. for Protegrity Corporation, Protegrity USA, Inc.. (Frank, Monte)
November 23, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Monte E. Frank on behalf of Protegrity Corporation, Protegrity USA, Inc. (Frank, Monte)
November 2, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sunil Munshani. Protegrity Corporation served on 10/28/2022, answer due 11/18/2022. (Spears, Brian)
November 2, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sunil Munshani. Protegrity USA, Inc. served on 10/27/2022, answer due 11/17/2022. (Spears, Brian)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Victor A. Bolden for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/31/22.(Johnson, D.)
October 28, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Notice of Related Case filed by Sunil Munshani, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Sunil Munshani, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Sunil Munshani, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 10/28/2022. (Peterson, M)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/27/2022. (Peterson, M)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/27/2022. (Peterson, M)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/26/2022. Discovery due by 4/28/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 6/2/2023. Signed by Clerk on 10/27/2022. (Peterson, M)
October 27, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ivan J. Ladd-Smith on behalf of Sunil Munshani (Ladd-Smith, Ivan)
October 27, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case by Sunil Munshani (Spears, Brian)
October 27, 2022 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Protegrity Corporation, Protegrity USA, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Brian E. Spears* *Spears Manning & Martini LLC* *2425 Post Road Suite 203* *Southport, CT 06890*. (Freberg, B)
October 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7116169.), filed by Sunil Munshani.(Spears, Brian)
October 27, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Spears, Brian)
October 27, 2022 Judge Michael P. Shea and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munshani v. Protegrity USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunil Munshani
Represented By: Brian E. Spears
Represented By: Ivan J. Ladd-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protegrity USA, Inc.
Represented By: Monte E. Frank
Represented By: Steven J. Stafstrom, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protegrity Corporation
Represented By: Monte E. Frank
Represented By: Steven J. Stafstrom, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?