Protect Our Defenders et al v. United States Department of Defense et al
Plaintiff: Protect Our Defenders and Connecticut Veterans Legal Center
Defendant: United States Department of Defense and United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 3:2022cv01390
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: Sarala V Nagala
2 Judge: Robert A Richardson
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2022 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Status Conference held on 12/13/2022. Total Time: 3 minutes. (Court Reporter Sharon Montini) (Diallo, I.)
December 10, 2022 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/13/2022 at 11:30 a.m. before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Dial In: (888) 808-6929 Participant Code: 9284309 (Diallo, I.)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court GRANTS the Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall Answer or Respond to the Complaint by January 13, 2023. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/9/2022. (Diallo, I.)
December 8, 2022 Filing 20 First MOTION for Extension of Time until January 13, 2023 (29 Days) to Answer or Respond to #1 Complaint, by United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Justice. (Meskill, J. Brian)
December 8, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Brian Meskill on behalf of United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Justice (Meskill, J. Brian)
November 17, 2022 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Protect Our Defenders, Connecticut Veterans Legal Center. United States Department of Defense served on 11/14/2022, answer due 12/14/2022; United States Department of Justice served on 11/14/2022, answer due 12/14/2022. (Brooks, Meghan)
November 10, 2022 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Justice* with answer to complaint due within *30* days. Attorney *Meghan Brooks* *Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization Yale Law School* *PO Box 209090* *New Haven, CT 06520-9090*. (Imbriani, Susan)
November 10, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #10 Electronic Filing Order, #15 Standing Protective Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Connecticut Veterans Legal Center, Protect Our Defenders, #3 MOTION for Leave to File Law Student Intern Appearances filed by Connecticut Veterans Legal Center, Protect Our Defenders, #1 Complaint, filed by Connecticut Veterans Legal Center, Protect Our Defenders Signed by Clerk on 11/10/2022.(Imbriani, Susan)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 motion to Amend/Correct #12 Electronic Summons. See 5 U.S.C.A. 552(A)(4)(C) ("Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the defendant shall serve an answer or otherwise plead to any complaint made under this subsection within thirty days after service upon the defendant of the pleading in which such complaint is made, unless the court otherwise directs for good cause shown.") The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to reissue the Summons to reflect that Defendants shall file an Answer or a responsive pleading within thirty days after service upon them is completed. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/10/2022. (Diallo, I.)
November 9, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #12 Electronic Summons Reissued, by Connecticut Veterans Legal Center, Protect Our Defenders.Responses due by 11/30/2022 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Brooks, Meghan)
November 8, 2022 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Justice* with answer to complaint due within *30* days. Attorney *Meghan Brooks* *Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization Yale Law School* *P.O. Box 209090* *New Haven, CT 06520-9090*. (Imbriani, Susan)
November 8, 2022 Docket Entry Correction - Summons reissued as the number of days for response was incorrect as case is a FOIA case. (Imbriani, Susan)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave for Law Student Interns to Appear. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/7/2022. (Sullivan, John)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/4/2022.(Imbriani, Susan)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/4/2022.(Murphy, Tatihana)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Victor A. Bolden for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/4/2022.(Bozek, M.)
November 4, 2022 Filing 8 *** ENTERED IN ERROR*** ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Justice* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Meghan Brooks* *Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization Yale Law School* *P.O. Box 209090* *New Haven, CT 06520-9090*. (Mendez, D) Modified on 11/8/2022 (Imbriani, Susan).
November 4, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Protective Order, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Connecticut Veterans Legal Center, Protect Our Defenders, #3 MOTION for Leave to File Law Student Intern Appearances filed by Connecticut Veterans Legal Center, Protect Our Defenders, #1 Complaint, filed by Connecticut Veterans Legal Center, Protect Our Defenders. Signed by Clerk on 11/4/2022. (Mendez, D)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/3/2022. (Mendez, D)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/3/2022.(Mendez, D)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/2/2023. Discovery due by 5/5/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 6/9/2023. Signed by Clerk on 11/3/2022. (Mendez, D)
November 3, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Law Student Intern Appearances by Connecticut Veterans Legal Center, Protect Our Defenders. (Attachments: #1 Jackson Akselrad, #2 Brian Liu, #3 Renee Mihail, #4 Maggie Mills)(Brooks, Meghan)
November 3, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Wishnie on behalf of Connecticut Veterans Legal Center, Protect Our Defenders (Wishnie, Michael)
November 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7123777.), filed by Protect Our Defenders, Connecticut Veterans Legal Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K)(Brooks, Meghan)
November 3, 2022 Judge Sarala V. Nagala and Judge Robert A. Richardson added. (Oliver, T.)
November 3, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. in Freedom of Information Act action (Brooks, Meghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Protect Our Defenders et al v. United States Department of Defense et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Protect Our Defenders
Represented By: Meghan Brooks
Represented By: Michael J. Wishnie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connecticut Veterans Legal Center
Represented By: Meghan Brooks
Represented By: Michael J. Wishnie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Defense
Represented By: J. Brian Meskill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: J. Brian Meskill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?