Corwin et al v. Boehringer-Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Corwin, Robert Abrahams, Tonya Acosta, Shamisha Adams, Tejon Adams, George Allochuku, Nancy Baldwin, Ginnie Henderson, Ralph Beberaggi, Julian Behrend, Dmond Belt, Adriena Bennettt, Gregory Berry, Shauntee Billups, Kenneth Booker, Jeffrey Bradant, Vincent Bridges, Walter Briscoe, Tim Brogdon, Janet Browers, Eric Brown, Ronald Brown, Charles Bryant, Carer Burnet, Deshana Byerly, John Caffrey, Caroline Calhoun, Patricia Cannon, Antonio Carraway, Mary Chamberlain, Malcolm Coleman, Michael Colson, Gerry Cooper, John Crabb, Jasmine Cullins, Roger Davis, Ofelia DeCoro, Dolores De La Cruz, Keith Dean, Lisha Donaby, Eric Howard, Jane Evans, Max Flores, Joseph Flowers, Aaron Fortune, Vickie Foster, Rodney Frazier, Dakwan Gallaspie, Alvin Garcia, Felicia Gibbs, James Giddens, Jermaine Gillett, Martin Glover, Alvin Goode, Brandon Grant, Edward Gray, Eileen Greene, Jamal Hakim, Lesha Hall, Derrick Harris, Contressa Haynes, Cynthia Highsmith, Justin Howard, Laquisha Howard, Tom Huff, Lorene Altamore, William Husdpeth, Brandon Jackson, Isaiah Jackson, Melvin Jackson, Trayvon James, Arthur Johnson, Darnell Jones, Jason Josey, Lai-l'y Kingera, Vannesha Knott, Kenneth Koch, Nancy Laird, Edward Langan, Glenda Iones, Tejon Marcet Adams, Nanacy Baldwin, Ralph P. Beberaggi, Dmond Kennard Belt, Shauntee Bilups, Jeffrey Bradent, Tim D. Brogdon, Carter Burnet, Mary Chamberlin, Malcolm Antonio, Roger K. Davis, Jane H. Evans, Vickie A. Foster, James Thomas Giddens, Alvinene Goode, Iescha Hall, Lorene Altmore, Isaiah Fackson, Darnell Emanuelle Jones, Larry Kingera and Glenda Jones
Defendant: Boehringer-Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Glaxosmithkline LLC, Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and Sanofi US Services Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv01436
Filed: November 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Referring Judge: Robert M Spector
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2023 Filing 43 MOTION for Attorney(s) Emily Renshaw Pistilli to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7187106) by Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Glasser, James)
January 4, 2023 Filing 42 MOTION for Attorney(s) M. Elaine Horn to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7187102) by Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Glasser, James)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXCUSE. The Court GRANTS the motion to excuse in-person appearance of clients (Doc. #40 ). If, however, any clients or client representatives of either party wishes to observe the court hearing by Zoom, then counsel may contact Judge Meyer's courtroom deputy to request such arrangements. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/22/22. (Barry, Donna)
December 21, 2022 Filing 40 MOTION for 'Motion to Excuse In-Person Attendance' Order by Robert Abrahams, Tonya Acosta, Shamisha Adams, Tejon Marcet Adams, George Allochuku, Lorene Altmore, Malcolm Antonio, Nanacy Baldwin, Ralph P. Beberaggi, Julian Behrend, Dmond Kennard Belt, Adriena Bennettt, Gregory Berry, Shauntee Bilups, Kenneth Booker, Jeffrey Bradent, Vincent Bridges, Walter Briscoe, Tim D. Brogdon, Janet Browers, Eric Brown, Ronald Brown, Charles Bryant, Carter Burnet, Deshana Byerly, John Caffrey, Caroline Calhoun, Patricia Cannon, Antonio Carraway, Mary Chamberlin, Michael Colson, Gerry Cooper, John Corwin, John Crabb, Jasmine Cullins, Roger K. Davis, Dolores De La Cruz, Ofelia DeCoro, Keith Dean, Lisha Donaby, Jane H. Evans, Isaiah Fackson, Max Flores, Joseph Flowers, Aaron Fortune, Vickie A. Foster, Rodney Frazier, Dakwan Gallaspie, Alvin Garcia, Felicia Gibbs, James Thomas Giddens, Jermaine Gillett, Martin Glover, Alvinene Goode, Brandon Grant, Edward Gray, Eileen Greene, Jamal Hakim, Iescha Hall, Derrick Harris, Contressa Haynes, Ginnie Henderson, Cynthia Highsmith, Eric Howard, Justin Howard, Laquisha Howard, Tom Huff, William Husdpeth, Brandon Jackson, Melvin Jackson, Trayvon James, Arthur Johnson, Darnell Emanuelle Jones, Glenda Jones, Jason Josey, Larry Kingera, Vannesha Knott, Kenneth Koch, Nancy Laird, Edward Langan. (Raabe, Craig)
December 15, 2022 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to #30 MOTION to Remand to State Court CORRECTED - PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REMAND PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1332(D) filed by Robert Abrahams, Tonya Acosta, Shamisha Adams, Tejon Marcet Adams, George Allochuku, Lorene Altmore, Malcolm Antonio, Nanacy Baldwin, Ralph P. Beberaggi, Julian Behrend, Dmond Kennard Belt, Adriena Bennettt, Gregory Berry, Shauntee Bilups, Kenneth Booker, Jeffrey Bradent, Vincent Bridges, Walter Briscoe, Tim D. Brogdon, Janet Browers, Eric Brown, Ronald Brown, Charles Bryant, Carter Burnet, Deshana Byerly, John Caffrey, Caroline Calhoun, Patricia Cannon, Antonio Carraway, Mary Chamberlin, Michael Colson, Gerry Cooper, John Corwin, John Crabb, Jasmine Cullins, Roger K. Davis, Dolores De La Cruz, Ofelia DeCoro, Keith Dean, Lisha Donaby, Jane H. Evans, Isaiah Fackson, Max Flores, Joseph Flowers, Aaron Fortune, Vickie A. Foster, Rodney Frazier, Dakwan Gallaspie, Alvin Garcia, Felicia Gibbs, James Thomas Giddens, Jermaine Gillett, Martin Glover, Alvinene Goode, Brandon Grant, Edward Gray, Eileen Greene, Jamal Hakim, Iescha Hall, Derrick Harris, Contressa Haynes, Ginnie Henderson, Cynthia Highsmith, Eric Howard, Justin Howard, Laquisha Howard, Tom Huff, William Husdpeth, Brandon Jackson, Melvin Jackson, Trayvon James, Arthur Johnson, Darnell Emanuelle Jones, Glenda Jones, Jason Josey, Larry Kingera, Vannesha Knott, Kenneth Koch, Nancy Laird, Edward Langan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Craig Raabe)(Bruegger, John)
December 12, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION.Oral argument on motion for remand (Doc. #30 ) and motion for leave to withdraw plaintiffs' motion to consolidate (Doc. #32 ) set set for January 12, 2023 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom Three, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. For cases involving parties who are represented by counsel, Judge Meyer ordinarily expects that the parties themselves will be present for hearings on any dispositive motions (i.e., motions to dismiss and for summary judgment). If an individual party (or party representative in the case of a company/entity party) is not present, Judge Meyer will inquire of counsel why the party or party representative has chosen not to attend the hearing and may require the filing of a signed waiver of presence with a statement of reasons. If the argument is scheduled to proceed in full or in part by means of a video link, then the parties or party representatives are welcome to attend the argument by video. (Barry, Donna)
December 8, 2022 Filing 37 OBJECTION re #30 MOTION to Remand to State Court CORRECTED - PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REMAND PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1332(D), #26 MOTION to Remand to State Court PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REMAND PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C.SECTION 1332(D) filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Boehringer-Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Fahey, Patrick)
November 29, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by John Bruegger on behalf of Robert Abrahams, Tonya Acosta, Shamisha Adams, Tejon Marcet Adams, George Allochuku, Lorene Altmore, Malcolm Antonio, Nanacy Baldwin, Ralph P. Beberaggi, Julian Behrend, Dmond Kennard Belt, Adriena Bennettt, Gregory Berry, Shauntee Bilups, Kenneth Booker, Jeffrey Bradent, Vincent Bridges, Walter Briscoe, Tim D. Brogdon, Janet Browers, Eric Brown, Ronald Brown, Charles Bryant, Carter Burnet, Deshana Byerly, John Caffrey, Caroline Calhoun, Patricia Cannon, Antonio Carraway, Mary Chamberlin, Michael Colson, Gerry Cooper, John Corwin, John Crabb, Jasmine Cullins, Roger K. Davis, Dolores De La Cruz, Ofelia DeCoro, Keith Dean, Lisha Donaby, Jane H. Evans, Isaiah Fackson, Max Flores, Joseph Flowers, Aaron Fortune, Vickie A. Foster, Rodney Frazier, Dakwan Gallaspie, Alvin Garcia, Felicia Gibbs, James Thomas Giddens, Jermaine Gillett, Martin Glover, Alvinene Goode, Brandon Grant, Edward Gray, Eileen Greene, Jamal Hakim, Iescha Hall, Derrick Harris, Contressa Haynes, Ginnie Henderson, Cynthia Highsmith, Eric Howard, Justin Howard, Laquisha Howard, Tom Huff, William Husdpeth, Brandon Jackson, Melvin Jackson, Trayvon James, Arthur Johnson, Darnell Emanuelle Jones, Glenda Jones, Jason Josey, Larry Kingera, Vannesha Knott, Kenneth Koch, Nancy Laird, Edward Langan (Bruegger, John)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #16 ) until January 17, 2023 to file a responsive pleading to the plaintiffs' complaint.Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/21/22. (Barry, Donna)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. The Court DENIES without prejudice the motion to consolidate (Doc. #15 ) on the ground that it bears a state court caption and invokes Connecticut state court procedural rules as grounds for its filing. If warranted, the parties may file any renewed motions in the form prescribed under the federal rules of civil procedure and bearing a federal court caption. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/21/22. (Barry, Donna)
November 21, 2022 Docket Entry Correction: Answer deadline has been updated to 1/17/23 in accordance with Order (Doc. # 35 ). (Barry, Donna)
November 21, 2022 Answer deadline updated for Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Boehringer-Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC to 1/17/2023. (Barry, Donna) Modified on 11/27/2022 to correct typo (Barry, Donna).
November 17, 2022 Filing 33 Memorandum in Support re #32 MOTION for Leave to File CORRECTED - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION TO CLARIFY PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE filed by Robert Abrahams, Tonya Acosta, Shamisha Adams, Tejon Marcet Adams, George Allochuku, Lorene Altmore, Malcolm Antonio, Nanacy Baldwin, Ralph P. Beberaggi, Julian Behrend, Dmond Kennard Belt, Adriena Bennettt, Gregory Berry, Shauntee Bilups, Kenneth Booker, Jeffrey Bradent, Vincent Bridges, Walter Briscoe, Tim D. Brogdon, Janet Browers, Eric Brown, Ronald Brown, Charles Bryant, Carter Burnet, Deshana Byerly, John Caffrey, Caroline Calhoun, Patricia Cannon, Antonio Carraway, Mary Chamberlin, Michael Colson, Gerry Cooper, John Corwin, John Crabb, Jasmine Cullins, Roger K. Davis, Dolores De La Cruz, Ofelia DeCoro, Keith Dean, Lisha Donaby, Jane H. Evans, Isaiah Fackson, Max Flores, Joseph Flowers, Aaron Fortune, Vickie A. Foster, Rodney Frazier, Dakwan Gallaspie, Alvin Garcia, Felicia Gibbs, James Thomas Giddens, Jermaine Gillett, Martin Glover, Alvinene Goode, Brandon Grant, Edward Gray, Eileen Greene, Jamal Hakim, Iescha Hall, Derrick Harris, Contressa Haynes, Ginnie Henderson, Cynthia Highsmith, Eric Howard, Justin Howard, Laquisha Howard, Tom Huff, William Husdpeth, Brandon Jackson, Melvin Jackson, Trayvon James, Arthur Johnson, Darnell Emanuelle Jones, Glenda Jones, Jason Josey, Larry Kingera, Vannesha Knott, Kenneth Koch, Nancy Laird, Edward Langan. (Raabe, Craig)
November 17, 2022 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File CORRECTED - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION TO CLARIFY PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE by Robert Abrahams, Tonya Acosta, Shamisha Adams, Tejon Marcet Adams, George Allochuku, Lorene Altmore, Malcolm Antonio, Nanacy Baldwin, Ralph P. Beberaggi, Julian Behrend, Dmond Kennard Belt, Adriena Bennettt, Gregory Berry, Shauntee Bilups, Kenneth Booker, Jeffrey Bradent, Vincent Bridges, Walter Briscoe, Tim D. Brogdon, Janet Browers, Eric Brown, Ronald Brown, Charles Bryant, Carter Burnet, Deshana Byerly, John Caffrey, Caroline Calhoun, Patricia Cannon, Antonio Carraway, Mary Chamberlin, Michael Colson, Gerry Cooper, John Corwin, John Crabb, Jasmine Cullins, Roger K. Davis, Dolores De La Cruz, Ofelia DeCoro, Keith Dean, Lisha Donaby, Jane H. Evans, Isaiah Fackson, Max Flores, Joseph Flowers, Aaron Fortune, Vickie A. Foster, Rodney Frazier, Dakwan Gallaspie, Alvin Garcia, Felicia Gibbs, James Thomas Giddens, Jermaine Gillett, Martin Glover, Alvinene Goode, Brandon Grant, Edward Gray, Eileen Greene, Jamal Hakim, Iescha Hall, Derrick Harris, Contressa Haynes, Ginnie Henderson, Cynthia Highsmith, Eric Howard, Justin Howard, Laquisha Howard, Tom Huff, William Husdpeth, Brandon Jackson, Melvin Jackson, Trayvon James, Arthur Johnson, Darnell Emanuelle Jones, Glenda Jones, Jason Josey, Larry Kingera, Vannesha Knott, Kenneth Koch, Nancy Laird, Edward Langan. (Raabe, Craig)
November 17, 2022 Filing 31 Memorandum in Support re #30 MOTION to Remand to State Court CORRECTED - PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REMAND PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1332(D) filed by Robert Abrahams, Tonya Acosta, Shamisha Adams, Tejon Marcet Adams, George Allochuku, Lorene Altmore, Malcolm Antonio, Nanacy Baldwin, Ralph P. Beberaggi, Julian Behrend, Dmond Kennard Belt, Adriena Bennettt, Gregory Berry, Shauntee Bilups, Kenneth Booker, Jeffrey Bradent, Vincent Bridges, Walter Briscoe, Tim D. Brogdon, Janet Browers, Eric Brown, Ronald Brown, Charles Bryant, Carter Burnet, Deshana Byerly, John Caffrey, Caroline Calhoun, Patricia Cannon, Antonio Carraway, Mary Chamberlin, Michael Colson, Gerry Cooper, John Corwin, John Crabb, Jasmine Cullins, Roger K. Davis, Dolores De La Cruz, Ofelia DeCoro, Keith Dean, Lisha Donaby, Jane H. Evans, Isaiah Fackson, Max Flores, Joseph Flowers, Aaron Fortune, Vickie A. Foster, Rodney Frazier, Dakwan Gallaspie, Alvin Garcia, Felicia Gibbs, James Thomas Giddens, Jermaine Gillett, Martin Glover, Alvinene Goode, Brandon Grant, Edward Gray, Eileen Greene, Jamal Hakim, Iescha Hall, Derrick Harris, Contressa Haynes, Ginnie Henderson, Cynthia Highsmith, Eric Howard, Justin Howard, Laquisha Howard, Tom Huff, William Husdpeth, Brandon Jackson, Melvin Jackson, Trayvon James, Arthur Johnson, Darnell Emanuelle Jones, Glenda Jones, Jason Josey, Larry Kingera, Vannesha Knott, Kenneth Koch, Nancy Laird, Edward Langan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Raabe, Craig)
November 17, 2022 Filing 30 MOTION to Remand to State Court CORRECTED - PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REMAND PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1332(D) by Robert Abrahams, Tonya Acosta, Shamisha Adams, Tejon Marcet Adams, George Allochuku, Lorene Altmore, Malcolm Antonio, Nanacy Baldwin, Ralph P. Beberaggi, Julian Behrend, Dmond Kennard Belt, Adriena Bennettt, Gregory Berry, Shauntee Bilups, Kenneth Booker, Jeffrey Bradent, Vincent Bridges, Walter Briscoe, Tim D. Brogdon, Janet Browers, Eric Brown, Ronald Brown, Charles Bryant, Carter Burnet, Deshana Byerly, John Caffrey, Caroline Calhoun, Patricia Cannon, Antonio Carraway, Mary Chamberlin, Michael Colson, Gerry Cooper, John Corwin, John Crabb, Jasmine Cullins, Roger K. Davis, Dolores De La Cruz, Ofelia DeCoro, Keith Dean, Lisha Donaby, Jane H. Evans, Isaiah Fackson, Max Flores, Joseph Flowers, Aaron Fortune, Vickie A. Foster, Rodney Frazier, Dakwan Gallaspie, Alvin Garcia, Felicia Gibbs, James Thomas Giddens, Jermaine Gillett, Martin Glover, Alvinene Goode, Brandon Grant, Edward Gray, Eileen Greene, Jamal Hakim, Iescha Hall, Derrick Harris, Contressa Haynes, Ginnie Henderson, Cynthia Highsmith, Eric Howard, Justin Howard, Laquisha Howard, Tom Huff, William Husdpeth, Brandon Jackson, Melvin Jackson, Trayvon James, Arthur Johnson, Darnell Emanuelle Jones, Glenda Jones, Jason Josey, Larry Kingera, Vannesha Knott, Kenneth Koch, Nancy Laird, Edward Langan.Responses due by 12/8/2022 (Raabe, Craig)
November 17, 2022 Filing 29 Memorandum in Support re #28 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION TO WITHDRAW PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION TO CLARIFY PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE filed by Robert Abrahams, Tonya Acosta, Shamisha Adams, Tejon Marcet Adams, George Allochuku, Lorene Altmore, Malcolm Antonio, Nanacy Baldwin, Ralph P. Beberaggi, Julian Behrend, Dmond Kennard Belt, Adriena Bennettt, Gregory Berry, Shauntee Bilups, Kenneth Booker, Jeffrey Bradent, Vincent Bridges, Walter Briscoe, Tim D. Brogdon, Janet Browers, Eric Brown, Ronald Brown, Charles Bryant, Carter Burnet, Deshana Byerly, John Caffrey, Caroline Calhoun, Patricia Cannon, Antonio Carraway, Mary Chamberlin, Michael Colson, Gerry Cooper, John Corwin, John Crabb, Jasmine Cullins, Roger K. Davis, Dolores De La Cruz, Ofelia DeCoro, Keith Dean, Lisha Donaby, Jane H. Evans, Isaiah Fackson, Max Flores, Joseph Flowers, Aaron Fortune, Vickie A. Foster, Rodney Frazier, Dakwan Gallaspie, Alvin Garcia, Felicia Gibbs, James Thomas Giddens, Jermaine Gillett, Martin Glover, Alvinene Goode, Brandon Grant, Edward Gray, Eileen Greene, Jamal Hakim, Iescha Hall, Derrick Harris, Contressa Haynes, Ginnie Henderson, Cynthia Highsmith, Eric Howard, Justin Howard, Laquisha Howard, Tom Huff, William Husdpeth, Brandon Jackson, Melvin Jackson, Trayvon James, Arthur Johnson, Darnell Emanuelle Jones, Glenda Jones, Jason Josey, Larry Kingera, Vannesha Knott, Kenneth Koch, Nancy Laird, Edward Langan. (Raabe, Craig) Modified on 11/17/2022 to correct text (Freberg, B). Modified on 11/17/2022 (Freberg, B).
November 17, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION TO WITHDRAW PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION TO CLARIFY PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE by Robert Abrahams, Tonya Acosta, Shamisha Adams, Tejon Marcet Adams, George Allochuku, Lorene Altmore, Malcolm Antonio, Nanacy Baldwin, Ralph P. Beberaggi, Julian Behrend, Dmond Kennard Belt, Adriena Bennettt, Gregory Berry, Shauntee Bilups, Kenneth Booker, Jeffrey Bradent, Vincent Bridges, Walter Briscoe, Tim D. Brogdon, Janet Browers, Eric Brown, Ronald Brown, Charles Bryant, Carter Burnet, Deshana Byerly, John Caffrey, Caroline Calhoun, Patricia Cannon, Antonio Carraway, Mary Chamberlin, Michael Colson, Gerry Cooper, John Corwin, John Crabb, Jasmine Cullins, Roger K. Davis, Dolores De La Cruz, Ofelia DeCoro, Keith Dean, Lisha Donaby, Jane H. Evans, Isaiah Fackson, Max Flores, Joseph Flowers, Aaron Fortune, Vickie A. Foster, Rodney Frazier, Dakwan Gallaspie, Alvin Garcia, Felicia Gibbs, James Thomas Giddens, Jermaine Gillett, Martin Glover, Alvinene Goode, Brandon Grant, Edward Gray, Eileen Greene, Jamal Hakim, Iescha Hall, Derrick Harris, Contressa Haynes, Ginnie Henderson, Cynthia Highsmith, Eric Howard, Justin Howard, Laquisha Howard, Tom Huff, William Husdpeth, Brandon Jackson, Melvin Jackson, Trayvon James, Arthur Johnson, Darnell Emanuelle Jones, Glenda Jones, Jason Josey, Larry Kingera, Vannesha Knott, Kenneth Koch, Nancy Laird, Edward Langan. (Raabe, Craig) Modified on 11/17/2022 to correct text (Freberg, B).
November 17, 2022 Filing 27 Memorandum in Support re #26 MOTION to Remand to State Court PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REMAND PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C.SECTION 1332(D) filed by Robert Abrahams, Tonya Acosta, Shamisha Adams, Tejon Marcet Adams, George Allochuku, Lorene Altmore, Malcolm Antonio, Nanacy Baldwin, Ralph P. Beberaggi, Julian Behrend, Dmond Kennard Belt, Adriena Bennettt, Gregory Berry, Shauntee Bilups, Kenneth Booker, Jeffrey Bradent, Vincent Bridges, Walter Briscoe, Tim D. Brogdon, Janet Browers, Eric Brown, Ronald Brown, Charles Bryant, Carter Burnet, Deshana Byerly, John Caffrey, Caroline Calhoun, Patricia Cannon, Antonio Carraway, Mary Chamberlin, Michael Colson, Gerry Cooper, John Corwin, John Crabb, Jasmine Cullins, Roger K. Davis, Dolores De La Cruz, Ofelia DeCoro, Keith Dean, Lisha Donaby, Jane H. Evans, Isaiah Fackson, Max Flores, Joseph Flowers, Aaron Fortune, Vickie A. Foster, Rodney Frazier, Dakwan Gallaspie, Alvin Garcia, Felicia Gibbs, James Thomas Giddens, Jermaine Gillett, Martin Glover, Alvinene Goode, Brandon Grant, Edward Gray, Eileen Greene, Jamal Hakim, Iescha Hall, Derrick Harris, Contressa Haynes, Ginnie Henderson, Cynthia Highsmith, Eric Howard, Justin Howard, Laquisha Howard, Tom Huff, William Husdpeth, Brandon Jackson, Melvin Jackson, Trayvon James, Arthur Johnson, Darnell Emanuelle Jones, Glenda Jones, Jason Josey, Larry Kingera, Vannesha Knott, Kenneth Koch, Nancy Laird, Edward Langan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Raabe, Craig)
November 17, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION to Remand to State Court PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REMAND PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C.SECTION 1332(D) by Robert Abrahams, Tonya Acosta, Shamisha Adams, Tejon Marcet Adams, George Allochuku, Lorene Altmore, Malcolm Antonio, Nanacy Baldwin, Ralph P. Beberaggi, Julian Behrend, Dmond Kennard Belt, Adriena Bennettt, Gregory Berry, Shauntee Bilups, Kenneth Booker, Jeffrey Bradent, Vincent Bridges, Walter Briscoe, Tim D. Brogdon, Janet Browers, Eric Brown, Ronald Brown, Charles Bryant, Carter Burnet, Deshana Byerly, John Caffrey, Caroline Calhoun, Patricia Cannon, Antonio Carraway, Mary Chamberlin, Michael Colson, Gerry Cooper, John Corwin, John Crabb, Jasmine Cullins, Roger K. Davis, Dolores De La Cruz, Ofelia DeCoro, Keith Dean, Lisha Donaby, Jane H. Evans, Isaiah Fackson, Max Flores, Joseph Flowers, Aaron Fortune, Vickie A. Foster, Rodney Frazier, Dakwan Gallaspie, Alvin Garcia, Felicia Gibbs, James Thomas Giddens, Jermaine Gillett, Martin Glover, Alvinene Goode, Brandon Grant, Edward Gray, Eileen Greene, Jamal Hakim, Iescha Hall, Derrick Harris, Contressa Haynes, Ginnie Henderson, Cynthia Highsmith, Eric Howard, Justin Howard, Laquisha Howard, Tom Huff, William Husdpeth, Brandon Jackson, Melvin Jackson, Trayvon James, Arthur Johnson, Darnell Emanuelle Jones, Glenda Jones, Jason Josey, Larry Kingera, Vannesha Knott, Kenneth Koch, Nancy Laird, Edward Langan.Responses due by 12/8/2022 (Raabe, Craig)
November 17, 2022 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC identifying Corporate Parent GlaxoSmithKline Finance plc, Corporate Parent GSK Finance (No 2) Limited for Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC. (Simpson, Robert)
November 17, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Boehringer-Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC Statement Regarding Standing Order In Removed Cases (Martini, Joseph)
November 16, 2022 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi US Services Inc.. (Martini, Joseph)
November 16, 2022 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Martini, Joseph)
November 16, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer-Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with filed by Trayvon James, Melvin Jackson, Walter Briscoe, Keith Dean, Antonio Carraway, Kenneth Booker, Robert Abrahams, Deshana Byerly, Max Flores, Roger K. Davis, Vickie A. Foster, John Caffrey, Tejon Marcet Adams, Tonya Acosta, Martin Glover, Alvinene Goode, Arthur Johnson, Nanacy Baldwin, Isaiah Fackson, Tom Huff, Lisha Donaby, John Corwin, Laquisha Howard, Ginnie Henderson, Joseph Flowers, Glenda Jones, Eric Brown, Vannesha Knott, Jane H. Evans, Tim D. Brogdon, Jermaine Gillett, Ofelia DeCoro, Mary Chamberlin, Ralph P. Beberaggi, William Husdpeth, Brandon Grant, Dakwan Gallaspie, John Crabb, Dmond Kennard Belt, Contressa Haynes, Dolores De La Cruz, Jamal Hakim, Lorene Altmore, Janet Browers, Patricia Cannon, Jasmine Cullins, Caroline Calhoun, Kenneth Koch, Shauntee Bilups, Larry Kingera, Derrick Harris, Charles Bryant, James Thomas Giddens, Iescha Hall, Adriena Bennettt, Gregory Berry, Michael Colson, Carter Burnet, Alvin Garcia, Justin Howard, Aaron Fortune, Edward Gray, Ronald Brown, Gerry Cooper, Cynthia Highsmith, Julian Behrend, Brandon Jackson, Jason Josey, Felicia Gibbs, Eileen Greene, Malcolm Antonio, George Allochuku, Edward Langan, Shamisha Adams, Darnell Emanuelle Jones, Vincent Bridges, Eric Howard, Nancy Laird, Jeffrey Bradent, Rodney Frazier, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., #10 Notice of Appearance filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., #20 Protective Order, #13 Notice of Appearance filed by Pfizer, Inc., #6 Notice of Appearance filed by Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, #19 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice (Other), filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., #14 Notice (Other) filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., #4 Notice (Other) filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., #5 Notice of Appearance filed by Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, #17 Notice of Related Case, filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Pfizer, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Boehringer-Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., #9 Notice of Appearance filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Boehringer-Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until January 17, 2023 to file a responsive pleading to the Plaintiffs' Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Pfizer, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Boehringer-Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Boehringer-Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #11 Notice of Appearance filed by Pfizer, Inc., #18 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Pfizer, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 11/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Chartier, AnnMarie)
November 15, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Related Case by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Boehringer-Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Glasser, James)
November 15, 2022 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until January 17, 2023 to file a responsive pleading to the Plaintiffs' Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Boehringer-Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Simpson, Robert)
November 14, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC Corrected Notice of Pending Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Martini, Joseph)
November 14, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James O. Craven on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Craven, James)
November 14, 2022 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pfizer, Inc.. (Glasser, James)
November 14, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James I. Glasser on behalf of Pfizer, Inc. (Glasser, James)
November 14, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Janna Douville Eastwood on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Eastwood, Janna)
November 11, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Fahey on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Boehringer-Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Fahey, Patrick)
November 11, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Boehringer-Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH for Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation. (Welsh, Jaime)
November 11, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaime Ashley Welsh on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Boehringer-Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Welsh, Jaime)
November 11, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren R. Greenspoon on behalf of Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC (Greenspoon, Lauren)
November 11, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Reginald Simpson on behalf of Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC (Simpson, Robert)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/10/2022.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/10/2022.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/9/2023 Discovery due by 5/12/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 6/16/2023 Signed by Clerk on 11/10/2022.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
November 10, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. by Robert Abrahams, Tonya Acosta, Shamisha Adams, Tejon Marcet Adams, George Allochuku, Lorene Altmore, Malcolm Antonio, Nanacy Baldwin, Ralph P. Beberaggi, Julian Behrend, Dmond Kennard Belt, Adriena Bennettt, Gregory Berry, Shauntee Bilups, Kenneth Booker, Jeffrey Bradent, Vincent Bridges, Walter Briscoe, Tim D. Brogdon, Janet Browers, Eric Brown, Ronald Brown, Charles Bryant, Carter Burnet, Deshana Byerly, John Caffrey, Caroline Calhoun, Patricia Cannon, Antonio Carraway, Mary Chamberlin, Michael Colson, Gerry Cooper, John Corwin, John Crabb, Jasmine Cullins, Roger K. Davis, Dolores De La Cruz, Ofelia DeCoro, Keith Dean, Lisha Donaby, Jane H. Evans, Isaiah Fackson, Max Flores, Joseph Flowers, Aaron Fortune, Vickie A. Foster, Rodney Frazier, Dakwan Gallaspie, Alvin Garcia, Felicia Gibbs, James Thomas Giddens, Jermaine Gillett, Martin Glover, Alvinene Goode, Brandon Grant, Edward Gray, Eileen Greene, Jamal Hakim, Iescha Hall, Derrick Harris, Contressa Haynes, Ginnie Henderson, Cynthia Highsmith, Eric Howard, Justin Howard, Laquisha Howard, Tom Huff, William Husdpeth, Brandon Jackson, Melvin Jackson, Trayvon James, Arthur Johnson, Darnell Emanuelle Jones, Glenda Jones, Jason Josey, Larry Kingera, Vannesha Knott, Kenneth Koch, Nancy Laird, Edward Langan.Responses due by 12/1/2022 (Hushin, Z.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2022: #1 Replacement PDF) (Hushin, Z.).
November 10, 2022 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Oliver, T.)
November 10, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC Certificate of Filing/Service of Notice of Removal (Martini, Joseph)
November 10, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC Notice of Pending Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Martini, Joseph)
November 10, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Martini, Joseph)
November 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc. from CT Superior Court, case number DBD-CV22-6044206-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7133674, filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Martini, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corwin et al v. Boehringer-Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Corwin
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Abrahams
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Acosta
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shamisha Adams
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tejon Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Allochuku
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginnie Henderson
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Beberaggi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Behrend
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dmond Belt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriena Bennettt
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Berry
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shauntee Billups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Booker
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Bradant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Bridges
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Briscoe
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Brogdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Browers
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Brown
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Brown
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Bryant
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carer Burnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deshana Byerly
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Caffrey
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Calhoun
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Cannon
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Carraway
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Chamberlain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malcolm Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Colson
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerry Cooper
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Crabb
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Cullins
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ofelia DeCoro
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores De La Cruz
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Dean
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisha Donaby
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Howard
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Flores
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Flowers
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Fortune
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Frazier
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakwan Gallaspie
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Garcia
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Gibbs
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Giddens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermaine Gillett
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Glover
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Goode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Grant
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Gray
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Greene
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamal Hakim
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesha Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Harris
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Contressa Haynes
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Highsmith
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Howard
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laquisha Howard
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Huff
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorene Altamore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Husdpeth
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Jackson
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Jackson
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trayvon James
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Johnson
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Josey
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lai-l'y Kingera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vannesha Knott
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Koch
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Laird
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Langan
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Iones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tejon Marcet Adams
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nanacy Baldwin
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph P. Beberaggi
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dmond Kennard Belt
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shauntee Bilups
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Bradent
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim D. Brogdon
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carter Burnet
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Chamberlin
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malcolm Antonio
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger K. Davis
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane H. Evans
Represented By: John Bruegger
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie A. Foster
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Thomas Giddens
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvinene Goode
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iescha Hall
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorene Altmore
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah Fackson
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell Emanuelle Jones
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Kingera
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Jones
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: John Bruegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer-Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jaime Ashley Welsh
Represented By: Patrick M. Fahey
Represented By: Robert Reginald Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation
Represented By: Jaime Ashley Welsh
Represented By: Patrick M. Fahey
Represented By: Robert Reginald Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation
Represented By: Patrick M. Fahey
Represented By: Robert Reginald Simpson
Represented By: Jaime Ashley Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glaxosmithkline LLC
Represented By: Robert Reginald Simpson
Represented By: Lauren R. Greenspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glaxosmithkline Holdings (Americas), Inc.
Represented By: Robert Reginald Simpson
Represented By: Lauren R. Greenspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Represented By: James O. Craven
Represented By: James I. Glasser
Represented By: Robert Reginald Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Joseph W. Martini
Represented By: Janna Douville Eastwood
Represented By: Robert Reginald Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Joseph W. Martini
Represented By: Janna Douville Eastwood
Represented By: Robert Reginald Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?