Kaman Aerospace Corp. v. Central Copters, Inc.
Plaintiff: KAMAN AEROSPACE CORPORATION and Kaman Aerospace Corp.
Defendant: CENTRAL COPTERS, INC.
Case Number: 3:2022cv01445
Filed: November 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Sarala V Nagala
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Central Copters, Inc. waiver sent on 11/21/2022, answer due 1/20/2023 filed by Kaman Aerospace Corp.. (Smith, Kevin)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 12/7/2022.(Bozek, M.)
November 16, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Central Copters, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kevin M. Smith* *Wiggin & Dana* *One Century Tower, 265 Church Street P.O. Box 1832* *New Haven, CT 06508-1832*. (Bozek, M.)
November 16, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Kaman Aerospace Corp., #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Kaman Aerospace Corp., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Kaman Aerospace Corp., #7 Standing Protective Order, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Kaman Aerospace Corp., #6 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 11/16/2022.(Bozek, M.)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/11/2022.(Bozek, M.)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/11/2022.(Bozek, M.)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/10/2023. Discovery due by 5/13/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 6/17/202. Signed by Clerk on 11/11/2022.(Bozek, M.)
November 11, 2022 Judge Sarala V. Nagala and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Freberg, B)
November 11, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robyn E. Gallagher on behalf of KAMAN AEROSPACE CORPORATION (Gallagher, Robyn)
November 11, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KAMAN AEROSPACE CORPORATION identifying Other Affiliate Kaman Corporation, Other Affiliate Kaman Aerospace Group, Inc. for KAMAN AEROSPACE CORPORATION. (Smith, Kevin)
November 11, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Smith on behalf of KAMAN AEROSPACE CORPORATION (Smith, Kevin)
November 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CENTRAL COPTERS, INC. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7134260.), filed by KAMAN AEROSPACE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Kevin)
November 11, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to CENTRAL COPTERS, INC.. (Smith, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaman Aerospace Corp. v. Central Copters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAMAN AEROSPACE CORPORATION
Represented By: Robyn E. Gallagher
Represented By: Kevin M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaman Aerospace Corp.
Represented By: Kevin M. Smith
Represented By: Robyn E. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRAL COPTERS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?