Standard Insurance Company v. Camp et al
Plaintiff: Standard Insurance Company
Defendant: Nancy L. Camp, Haley Ann Font, Sophia Rae Font, A.J.F., I.R.F. and John/Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2022cv01486
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Referring Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 17, 2023 Plead by Haley Ann Font. (Mullins, Patrick)
January 13, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Mullins on behalf of Haley Ann Font (Mullins, Patrick)
January 3, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Standard Insurance Company. Nancy L. Camp served on 12/28/2022, answer due 1/18/2023. (Matteo, Nicole)
January 3, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Standard Insurance Company. Haley Ann Font served on 12/28/2022, answer due 1/18/2023. (Matteo, Nicole)
January 2, 2023 Filing 13 RESPONSE re 12 Order on Motion to Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem, by Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Matteo, Nicole)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad litem. Within 10 days, Plaintiff Standard Insurance Company shall submit a list of no more than five suitable candidates for the Court's consideration. Any response by Defendants shall be filed within 14 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/27/22. (Tooker, Aimee)
December 9, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Sophia Rae Font waiver sent on 11/28/2022, answer due 1/27/2023 filed by Standard Insurance Company. (Magratten, Brooks)
November 28, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem by Standard Insurance Company. (Magratten, Brooks)
November 23, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Nancy L. Camp, Haley Ann Font, Sophia Rae Font* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Nicole M. Matteo- Pierce Atwood LLP* *One Financial Plaza, 26th Floor* *Providence, RI 02903*. (Sichanh, Christina)
November 23, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Standard Insurance Company, #1 Complaint filed by Standard Insurance Company, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Standard Insurance Company, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 11/23/2022.(Sichanh, Christina)
November 22, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Standard Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent StanCorp Financial Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Meiji Yasuda Life Insurance Company for Standard Insurance Company. (Matteo, Nicole)
November 22, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole M. Matteo on behalf of Standard Insurance Company (Matteo, Nicole)
November 22, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Nancy L. Camp, Haley Ann Font, Sophia Rae Font. (Matteo, Nicole)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/21/2022.(Sichanh, Christina)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/21/2022.(Sichanh, Christina)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/20/2023 Discovery due by 5/23/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 6/27/2023 Signed by Clerk on 11/21/2022.(Sichanh, Christina)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 11/21/22.(Hushin, Z.)
November 21, 2022 Judge Janet Bond Arterton and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Oliver, T.)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7145532.), filed by Standard Insurance Company.(Matteo, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Standard Insurance Company v. Camp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Nicole M. Matteo
Represented By: Brooks R. Magratten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy L. Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haley Ann Font
Represented By: Patrick M. Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sophia Rae Font
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.J.F.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.R.F.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?