Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund et al v. Elevance, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund and Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 40 Health Fund
Defendant: Elevance, Inc., Anthem, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Anthem Blue Cross, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield and Empire Blue Cross
Case Number: 3:2022cv01541
Filed: December 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Referring Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2023 Filing 72 REPLY to Response to #41 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Anthem Blue Cross, Anthem Health Plans, Inc, Elevance, Inc., Empire Blue Cross, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield. (Geelan, Matthew)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #70 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss for good cause shown. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 06/13/2023. (Lee, Elisabeth)
June 12, 2023 Filing 70 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Anthem Blue Cross, Anthem Health Plans, Inc, Elevance, Inc., Empire Blue Cross, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield. (Geelan, Matthew)
May 17, 2023 Filing 69 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Discovery status teleconference set for 2-7-2024 at 4:00 PM before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Please dial 860-506-1344 and enter 121 480 356# as the conference ID number to participate. (Shafer, J.)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 SCHEDULING ORDER: After reviewing the parties' Joint Amended Report of Rule 26(f), Dkt. #67 , the Court approves the parties' internal deadlines and sets the following case management deadlines. A discovery status teleconference will take place on 02/07/2024 at 4:00 pm. All discovery, including but not limited to depositions of expert witnesses, shall be completed by 05/24/2024. The Motion for Class Certification is due 06/24/2024. Dispositive motions are due by 10/01/2024. If no dispositive motions are filed, the joint trial memorandum ("JTM") is due by 04/11/2025, and the bench trial will take place in June 2025 in Courtroom Two, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. If dispositive motions are filed, the JTM is due by 08/01/2025, and bench trial will take place in November 2025 in Courtroom Two, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Counsel shall be prepared to present evidence on any day during the month that the bench trial is scheduled to take place and the following month. The parties are directed to closely follow Chambers' Practices #6 -- including the deadlines and format of filings -- when completing and filing the JTM, which shall be accompanied motions in limine. All evidentiary objections raised in the JTM must be the subject of a motion in limine and supported by applicable Second Circuit precedent. The parties' exhibit binders and electronic exhibits, as well as any courtroom technology requests, must be submitted no later than 2 weeks before the scheduled bench trial. The Court also requests that any courtesy copies sent to Chambers be printed from the docket and contain the header of the Court's electronic filing system. If and/or when the parties feel that a settlement conference before a Magistrate Judge would be productive, the parties may jointly request such on the docket. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 05/16/2023.(Lee, Elisabeth)
May 16, 2023 Filing 67 Amended REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Selesnick, Julie)
May 15, 2023 Filing 66 Memorandum in Opposition re #41 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 40 Health Fund, Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Selesnick, Julie)
May 2, 2023 Filing 65 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant: Rule 16(b) conference held on 5-2-2023. Counsel will file an amended 26(f) report and proposed protective order. Total Time: 6 minutes. (Court Reporter A. Gaskins, ECRO.) (Shafer, J.)
May 1, 2023 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by W. David Maxwell on behalf of Anthem Blue Cross, Anthem Health Plans, Inc, Elevance, Inc., Empire Blue Cross, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield (Maxwell, W.)
May 1, 2023 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Briana Liston Black on behalf of Anthem Blue Cross, Anthem Health Plans, Inc, Elevance, Inc., Empire Blue Cross, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield (Black, Briana)
May 1, 2023 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Desmond Hogan on behalf of Anthem Blue Cross, Anthem Health Plans, Inc, Elevance, Inc., Empire Blue Cross, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield (Hogan, E.)
April 25, 2023 Filing 61 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Rule 16(b) conference set for 5-2-2023 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom Two, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. (Shafer, J.)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER: After reviewing the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report, the Court determines a Rule 16(b) Conference is necessary. The Court schedules a Rule 16(b) Conference on 05/02/2023 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2. The parties shall be prepared to address 1) the proposed scheduling order in light of the uncharacteristically long discovery period, 2) outstanding ESI and document production negotiations, and 3) outstanding privilege log negotiations. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 04/25/2023. (Lee, Elisabeth)
April 21, 2023 Filing 59 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Gertner, Abigail)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #55 Motion for Attorney W. David Maxwell to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 4/11/2023. (Gaskins, A.)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Attorney E. Desmond Hogan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 4/11/2023. (Gaskins, A.)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Attorney Briana Liston Black to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 4/11/2023. (Gaskins, A.)
April 10, 2023 Filing 55 MOTION for Attorney(s) to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice 52 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, W. David Maxwell by Anthem Blue Cross, Anthem Health Plans, Inc, Elevance, Inc., Empire Blue Cross, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield. Responses due by 5/1/2023 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Durham, Michael) Modified on 4/11/2023 to correct event (Gaskins, A).
April 10, 2023 Filing 54 MOTION for Attorney(s) to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice 52 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, E. Desmond Hogan by Anthem Blue Cross, Anthem Health Plans, Inc, Elevance, Inc., Empire Blue Cross, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield. Responses due by 5/1/2023 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Durham, Michael) Modified on 4/11/2023 to correct event (Gaskins, A).
April 10, 2023 Filing 53 MOTION for Attorney(s) to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice 52 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Briana Liston Black by Anthem Blue Cross, Anthem Health Plans, Inc, Elevance, Inc., Empire Blue Cross, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield. Responses due by 5/1/2023 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Durham, Michael) Modified on 4/11/2023 to correct event (Gaskins, A).
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying without prejudice to refiling #48 MOTION for Attorney(s) Briana Liston Black to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; denying without prejudice to refiling #49 MOTION for Attorney(s) E. Desmond Hogan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; and denying without prejudice to refiling #50 MOTION for Attorney(s) W. David Maxwell to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice for failure to satisfy Rule 83.1 of this District's Local Civil Rules of Procedure. The Rule requires the attorney to submit an affidavit, not a declaration. The contents of the declarations are otherwise compliant. Counsel is instructed to refile the motions and submit an affidavit instead of a declaration. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 03/31/2023. (Lee, Elisabeth)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #47 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 41 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint until May 15, 2023 for good cause shown. See D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 7(b). Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss is due 05/15/2023 and Defendants' Reply is due 06/20/2023. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 03/30/2023. (Lee, Elisabeth)
March 30, 2023 Reset deadline as to #41 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint: response is now due by 5-15-2023 and reply is now due by 6-20-2023 per Dkt. 51 Order. (Shafer, J.)
March 28, 2023 Filing 50 MOTION for Attorney(s) W. David Maxwell to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7289768) by Anthem Blue Cross, Anthem Health Plans, Inc, Elevance, Inc., Empire Blue Cross, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Durham, Michael)
March 28, 2023 Filing 49 MOTION for Attorney(s) E. Desmond Hogan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7289754) by Anthem Blue Cross, Anthem Health Plans, Inc, Elevance, Inc., Empire Blue Cross, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Durham, Michael)
March 28, 2023 Filing 48 MOTION for Attorney(s) Briana Liston Black to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7289736) by Anthem Blue Cross, Anthem Health Plans, Inc, Elevance, Inc., Empire Blue Cross, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Durham, Michael)
March 28, 2023 Filing 47 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #41 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint until May 15, 2023 by Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 40 Health Fund, Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund. (Adler, Gregg)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying without prejudice to refiling #43 MOTION for Attorney(s) Briana Liston Black to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice, #44 MOTION for Attorney(s) E. Desmond Hogan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice, and #45 MOTION for Attorney(s) W. David Maxwell to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. These motions fail to satisfy the District of Connecticut's Local Civil Rule 83.1(d)(b), which requires counsel to "identify[ ] the bar of each court of which said attorney is and has ever been a member, and the corresponding bar identification number(s); or if no such numbers have been assigned, so stating." Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 03/20/2023. (Lee, Elisabeth)
March 15, 2023 Filing 45 MOTION for Attorney(s) W. David Maxwell to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7274194) by Anthem Blue Cross, Anthem Health Plans, Inc, Elevance, Inc., Empire Blue Cross, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Durham, Michael)
March 15, 2023 Filing 44 MOTION for Attorney(s) E. Desmond Hogan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7274179) by Anthem Blue Cross, Anthem Health Plans, Inc, Elevance, Inc., Empire Blue Cross, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Durham, Michael)
March 15, 2023 Filing 43 MOTION for Attorney(s) Briana Liston Black to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7274134) by Anthem Blue Cross, Anthem Health Plans, Inc, Elevance, Inc., Empire Blue Cross, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Durham, Michael)
March 13, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE RE: MOTION TO DISMISS. The parties are reminded that the pendency of a motion to dismiss does not automatically stay discovery, except in cases covered by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act. See Brooks v. Macy's, Inc., No. 10-CIV-5304, 2010 WL 5297756, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Dec. 21, 2010) (collecting cases), reh'g denied, No. 10-CIV-5304, 2011 WL 1362191 (S.D.N.Y. Apr. 8, 2011); see also Moran v. Flaherty, No. 92-CV-3200, 1992 WL 276913, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Sept. 25, 1992). The court may enter a stay of discovery in its discretion upon a showing [as distinguished from an assertion] of good cause. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c); see also Integrated Sys. & Power, Inc. v. Honeywell Int'l, Inc. , No. 09-CIV-5874, 2009 WL 2777076, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Sept. 1, 2009); accord Ellington Credit Fund, Ltd. v. Select Portfolio Servs., Inc. , No. 08-CV-2437, 2009 WL 274483, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Feb. 3, 2009). In determining whether good cause exists, the court considers several factors including: (1) whether a defendant has made a strong showing that the plaintiff's claim is unmeritorious, (2) the breadth of discovery and the burden of responding to it, and (3) the risk of unfair prejudice to the party opposing the stay. Negrete v. Citibank, N.A., No. 15-CV-7250, 2015 WL 8207466, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Dec. 7, 2015). Other factors include the nature of the case, whether dismissal will resolve the case, effect of dismissal on the scope of discovery, age of the case, complexity of discovery needed, remedy sought, extensions previously granted, parties' diligence, judicial efficiency, and other appropriate factors. Discovery in this case is NOT stayed. Accordingly, any party moving to stay discovery must demonstrate, as oppose to assert, the Court should exercise its discretion to stay the case. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3-13-2023. (Shafer, J.)
March 10, 2023 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Anthem Blue Cross, Anthem Health Plans, Inc, Elevance, Inc., Empire Blue Cross, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield.Responses due by 3/31/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Appendix Table of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit A, Bricklayers ASA, #5 Exhibit B, Sheet Metal Workers ASA, #6 Exhibit C, Tiara Yachts v. BCBSM Order)(Geelan, Matthew)
March 10, 2023 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Anthem Blue Cross, Anthem Health Plans, Inc, Elevance, Inc., Empire Blue Cross, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield. (Durham, Michael)
March 10, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew H. Geelan on behalf of Anthem Blue Cross, Anthem Health Plans, Inc, Elevance, Inc., Empire Blue Cross, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield (Geelan, Matthew)
March 10, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Durham on behalf of Anthem Blue Cross, Anthem Health Plans, Inc, Elevance, Inc., Empire Blue Cross, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield (Durham, Michael)
February 3, 2023 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield waiver sent on 1/9/2023, answer due 3/10/2023 filed by Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 40 Health Fund; Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund. (Adler, Gregg)
February 3, 2023 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Empire Blue Cross waiver sent on 1/9/2023, answer due 3/10/2023 filed by Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 40 Health Fund; Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund. (Adler, Gregg)
February 3, 2023 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Elevance, Inc. waiver sent on 1/9/2023, answer due 3/10/2023 filed by Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 40 Health Fund; Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund. (Adler, Gregg)
February 3, 2023 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Anthem Health Plans, Inc waiver sent on 1/9/2023, answer due 3/10/2023 filed by Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 40 Health Fund; Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund. (Adler, Gregg)
February 3, 2023 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Anthem Blue Cross waiver sent on 1/9/2023, answer due 3/10/2023 filed by Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 40 Health Fund; Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund. (Adler, Gregg)
January 25, 2023 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #20 MOTION for Attorney(s) to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice, #10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Shanon J. Carson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7175571) by Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 40 Health Fund, Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund. (Carson, Shanon)
January 23, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Shanon Jude Carson on behalf of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 40 Health Fund, Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund (Carson, Shanon)
January 20, 2023 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Abigail J. Gertner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7175579), #19 MOTION for Attorney(s) to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 40 Health Fund, Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund. (Gertner, Abigail)
January 20, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail Gertner on behalf of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 40 Health Fund, Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund (Gertner, Abigail)
January 20, 2023 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Karen Handorf to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7175585), #18 MOTION for Attorney(s) to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 40 Health Fund, Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund. (Handorf, Karen)
January 20, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Handorf on behalf of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 40 Health Fund, Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund (Handorf, Karen)
January 20, 2023 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Julie Selesnick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7175550), #17 MOTION for Attorney(s) to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 40 Health Fund, Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund. (Selesnick, Julie)
January 20, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Selesnick on behalf of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 40 Health Fund, Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund (Selesnick, Julie)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Shanon Carson. Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/19/2023. Signed by Clerk on 1/18/2023. (Mendez, D)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Abigail Gertner. Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/19/2023. Signed by Clerk on 1/18/2023. (Mendez, D)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Karen Handorf. Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/19/2023. Signed by Clerk on 1/18/2023. (Mendez, D)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Julie Selesnick. Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/19/2023. Signed by Clerk on 1/18/2023. (Mendez, D)
January 10, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Amend/Correct 14 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, Shanon Carson by Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 40 Health Fund, Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund.Responses due by 1/31/2023 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration)(Adler, Gregg) Modified on 1/18/2023 to change motion type (Mendez, D).
January 10, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Amend/Correct 15 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, Abigail Gertner by Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 40 Health Fund, Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund.Responses due by 1/31/2023 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration)(Adler, Gregg) Modified on 1/18/2023 to change motion type (Mendez, D).
January 10, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Amend/Correct 16 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, Karen Handorf by Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 40 Health Fund, Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund.Responses due by 1/31/2023 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration)(Adler, Gregg) Modified on 1/18/2023 to change motion type (Mendez, D).
January 10, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend/Correct 13 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, of Julie Selesnick by Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 40 Health Fund, Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund.Responses due by 1/31/2023 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration)(Adler, Gregg) Modified to correct motion type on 1/18/2023 (Rynne, Michelle).
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Karen Handorf to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice because the affidavit is noncompliant with Local Rule 83.1(d)(1)(b) which states that "the motion shall be accompanied by an affidavit...(b) identifying the bar of each court of which said attorney is and has ever been a member, and the corresponding bar identification number(s); or if no such numbers have been assigned[.]" If a bar membership number has not been assigned, then the affidavit should directly state so rather than "N/A." The Court denies the motion without prejudice. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 01/04/2023. (Mullings, Ricardo)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Abigail J. Gertner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice because the affidavit is noncompliant with Local Rule 83.1(d)(1)(b) which states that "the motion shall be accompanied by an affidavit...(b) identifying the bar of each court of which said attorney is and has ever been a member, and the corresponding bar identification number(s); or if no such numbers have been assigned[.]" If a bar membership number has not been assigned, then the affidavit should directly state so rather than "N/A." The Court denies the motion without prejudice.. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 01/04/2023. (Mullings, Ricardo)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Shanon J. Carson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice because the affidavit is noncompliant with Local Rule 83.1(d)(1)(b) which states that "the motion shall be accompanied by an affidavit... (b) identifying the bar of each court of which said attorney is and has ever been a member, and the corresponding bar identification number(s); or if no such numbers have been assigned[.]" If a bar membership number has not been assigned, then the affidavit should directly state so rather than "N/A." The Court denies the motion without prejudice. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 01/04/2023. (Mullings, Ricardo)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Julie Selesnick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice because the affidavit is noncompliant with Local Rule 83.1(d)(1)(b) which states that "the motion shall be accompanied by an affidavit...(b) identifying the bar of each court of which said attorney is and has ever been a member, and the corresponding bar identification number(s); or if no such numbers have been assigned[.]" If a bar membership number has not been assigned, then the affidavit should directly state so rather than "N/A." The Court denies the motion without prejudice. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 01/04/2023. (Mullings, Ricardo)
December 20, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Karen Handorf to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7175585) by Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 40 Health Fund, Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration)(Adler, Gregg)
December 20, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Abigail J. Gertner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7175579) by Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 40 Health Fund, Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration)(Adler, Gregg)
December 20, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Shanon J. Carson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7175571) by Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 40 Health Fund, Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration)(Adler, Gregg)
December 20, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Julie Selesnick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7175550) by Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 40 Health Fund, Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration)(Adler, Gregg)
December 6, 2022 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Anthem Blue Cross, Anthem Health Plans, Inc, Elevance, Inc., Empire Blue Cross, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gregg D. Adler* *Livingston, Adler, Pulda, Meiklejohn & Kelly* *557 Prospect Ave.* *Hartford, CT 06105-2922*. (Shafer, J.)
December 6, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of Dkts. 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement; #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines; #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices; #4 Electronic Filing Order; #5 Standing Protective Order; and #1 Complaint. Signed by Clerk on 12-6-2022. (Shafer, J.)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12-5-2022. (Shafer, J.)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12-5-2022. (Shafer, J.)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12-5-2022. (Shafer, J.)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: amended pleadings due by 2-3-2023, discovery due by 6-6-2023, and dispositive motions due by 7-11-2023. Signed by Clerk on 12-5-2022. (Shafer, J.)
December 5, 2022 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 12/05/2022.(Anastasio, F.)
December 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anthem Blue Cross, Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Elevance, Inc., Empire Blue Cross, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7157128.), filed by Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund, Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 40 Health Fund.(Adler, Gregg)
December 5, 2022 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Anthem Blue Cross, Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Elevance, Inc., Empire Blue Cross, Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield. (Adler, Gregg)
December 5, 2022 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund et al v. Elevance, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elevance, Inc.
Represented By: E. Desmond Hogan
Represented By: Matthew H. Geelan
Represented By: Michael G. Durham
Represented By: Briana Liston Black
Represented By: W. David Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem, Inc.
Represented By: E. Desmond Hogan
Represented By: Matthew H. Geelan
Represented By: Michael G. Durham
Represented By: Briana Liston Black
Represented By: W. David Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Health Plans, Inc doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Represented By: E. Desmond Hogan
Represented By: Matthew H. Geelan
Represented By: Michael G. Durham
Represented By: Briana Liston Black
Represented By: W. David Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross
Represented By: E. Desmond Hogan
Represented By: Matthew H. Geelan
Represented By: Michael G. Durham
Represented By: Briana Liston Black
Represented By: W. David Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Blue Cross Blue Shield
Represented By: E. Desmond Hogan
Represented By: Matthew H. Geelan
Represented By: Michael G. Durham
Represented By: Briana Liston Black
Represented By: W. David Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Blue Cross
Represented By: E. Desmond Hogan
Represented By: Matthew H. Geelan
Represented By: Michael G. Durham
Represented By: Briana Liston Black
Represented By: W. David Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund
Represented By: Gregg D. Adler
Represented By: Shanon Jude Carson
Represented By: Abigail Gertner
Represented By: Karen Handorf
Represented By: Julie Selesnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers' Local No. 40 Health Fund
Represented By: Gregg D. Adler
Represented By: Abigail Gertner
Represented By: Karen Handorf
Represented By: Shanon Jude Carson
Represented By: Julie Selesnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?