Williams v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Stephen J. Williams
Defendant: Daryl Norval Smith, Jason Aubrey George, Billy Joe Nolen and Federal Aviation Administration
Case Number: 3:2022cv01630
Filed: December 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Sarala V Nagala
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. Given Plaintiff's filing of proof of service (ECF No. #22 ), Plaintiff need not complete and return the USM 285 forms and other forms described in ECF No. #24 at this time. The United States Marshals Service will not be engaged to serve the complaint. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(a)(2) and 6(d), Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by March 24, 2023. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 01/26/2023. (Kuegler, Adam)
January 26, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Federal Aviation Administration to 3/24/2023; Jason Aubrey George to 3/24/2023; Billy Joe Nolen to 3/24/2023; Daryl Norval Smith to 3/24/2023. (Bozek, M.)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. SELF-REPRESENTED FILERS ARE REQUIRED TO COMPLY WITH THE JUDGE'S STANDARD ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER WHICH IS ATTACHED. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 1/25/2023.(Bozek, M.)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 01/25/2023. (Kuegler, Adam)
January 25, 2023 Filing 24 USM 285 forms together with Summons, Order 5, 6, 7, 13, and 23 with all instructions to complete and return to Clerk's office mailed to Stephen J. Williams, 12 September Road, Storrs, CT 06268-2806 the next business day. (Mendez, D)
January 25, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 MOTION for Judgment MOTION for Writ of Mandamus filed by Stephen J. Williams, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Stephen J. Williams, #7 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Stephen J. Williams, #6 Electronic Filing Order, 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement. Signed by Clerk on 1/25/2023. (Mendez, D)
January 23, 2023 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen J. Williams. Federal Aviation Administration served on 1/20/2023, answer due 2/10/2023; Jason Aubrey George served on 1/20/2023, answer due 2/10/2023; Billy Joe Nolen served on 1/20/2023, answer due 2/10/2023; Daryl Norval Smith served on 1/20/2023, answer due 2/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Mendez, D)
January 23, 2023 Filing 21 EXPARTE MOTION, by Stephen J. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Mendez, D)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #15 Ex Parte Motion by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing. Plaintiff's motion does not contain the following language from the standard form, to which the Court directed Plaintiff: "I understand that if my motion is granted, I must complete the Court's required training class on electronic filing for self-represented litigants." It is clear that Plaintiff believes that, because he is a lawyer and presumably has some familiarity with filing documents electronically, he need not complete the Court's required training class. In this litigation, however, Plaintiff is proceeding as an ordinary self-represented litigant and is therefore subject to the rules and regulations that apply to that category of filers. While the present motion is being denied without prejudice to refiling, if Plaintiff continues to refuse to acknowledge that he will complete the Court's required training class on electronic filing for self-represented litigants, the Court will not grant any future motions for Plaintiff to participate in electronic filing. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 01/19/2023. (Kuegler, Adam)
January 19, 2023 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Daryl Norval Smith* with answer to complaint due within *60* days.*Stephen J. Williams* *12 September Road* *Storrs, CT 06268-2806*. (Mendez, D)
January 19, 2023 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Billy Joe Nolen* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. *Stephen J. Williams* *12 September Road* *Storrs, CT 06268-2806*. (Mendez, D)
January 19, 2023 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Jason Aubrey George* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. *Stephen J. Williams* *12 September Road* *Storrs, CT 06268-2806*. (Mendez, D)
January 19, 2023 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Federal Aviation Administration* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. *Stephen J. Williams* *12 September Road* *Storrs, CT 06268-2806*. (Mendez, D)
January 19, 2023 Filing 15 EXPARTE MOTION, by Stephen J. Williams. (Mendez, D)
January 19, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Federal Aviation Administration, Jason Aubrey George, Billy Joe Nolen, Daryl Norval Smith, by Stephen J. Williams. (Mendez, D)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #9 Motion Regarding ECF Filing. Plaintiff is proceeding in this action as a self-represented litigant. Accordingly, if he wishes to participate in electronic filing, he must complete and submit a Motion by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing. The appropriate template for submitting such a motion is available at the following link: https://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/motion-self-represented-litigant-participate-electronic-filing. In addition, the Court directs Plaintiff to review the District of Connecticut's Guide for Self-Represented Litigants, which provides important information regarding motions to participate in electronic filing, service, and other topics relevant to self-represented parties. The Guide for Self-Represented Litigants is available at the following link: https://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/guide-self-represented-litigants. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 01/18/2023. (Kuegler, Adam)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff has filed ECF No. 12, in which he clarifies that his 88-year-old mother supports his basic needs. In such a situation, the Court would be permitted to require Plaintiff to submit a statement of the financial resources of his mother. See Amanda M. v. Kijakazi, No. 3:22-cv-353 (SRU) (TOF), 2022 WL 1395941 (D. Conn. Apr. 29, 2022) (citing cases). The Court exercises its discretion, however, to grant Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis even without a statement of the resources of his mother, given his representations that he has no income of his own. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 01/18/2023. (Kuegler, Adam)
January 11, 2023 Filing 11 EX PARTE Document, by Stephen J. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Mendez, D) Modified on 1/13/2023 to correct docket text (Mendez, D).
January 6, 2023 Filing 12 ExParte Document, by Stephen J. Williams. (Mendez, D)
January 3, 2023 Set Deadline: Dismissal due by 1/17/2023. (Bozek, M.)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis appears to be incomplete because it fails to list the values or amounts of any of Plaintiff's income and monthly obligations. In the section pertaining to income, the Court seeks clarification as to how Plaintiff pays for his basic needs, given that he reports no income through employment, government benefits, or other income of any kind. Given that his complaint states that he is a commercial pilot, see ECF No. 1 at paragraph 6, the Court seeks explanation of Plaintiff's representations as to his income. Plaintiff also has not listed the amounts of any monthly obligations, including for the categories of "student loans," "COVID suspension," and "zero" that he wrote in, or for basic necessities such as food and housing. In order for this action to proceed, Plaintiff must either pay the filing fee or submit a supplemental financial affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis by January 17, 2023. For the avoidance of doubt, the Court instructs Plaintiff that he must list all of his income, assets, and monthly obligations in his financial affidavit, with explanations, if necessary, to provide the Court with sufficient information to determine if he qualifies for in forma pauperis status. The Court will not consider any other motions in this action until Plaintiff either pays the filing fee or is granted in forma pauperis status, and will dismiss this action if Plaintiff takes neither action by January 17, 2023. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 01/03/2023. (Kuegler, Adam)
December 29, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION Regarding ECF Filing, by Stephen J. Williams. Motions referred to Maria E. Garcia. (Mendez, D)
December 29, 2022 Docket Entry Correction re #8 Electronic Service Documents entered in error. (Mendez, D)
December 27, 2022 Filing 8 **ENTERED IN ERROR** NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 MOTION for Judgment MOTION for Writ of Mandamus filed by Stephen J. Williams, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Stephen J. Williams, #7 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Stephen J. Williams, #6 Electronic Filing Order, 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement. Signed by Clerk on 12/27/2022. (Mendez, D) Modified on 12/29/2022 (Mendez, D).
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 12/22/2022. (Mendez, D)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 12/22/2022. (Mendez, D)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/20/2023. Discovery due by 6/23/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 7/28/2023. Signed by Clerk on 12/22/2022. (Mendez, D)
December 22, 2022 Filing 4 EMERGENCY MOTION for a Declaratory Judgment (Responses due by 1/12/2023) and MOTION for Mandamus Relief by Stephen J. Williams. (Peterson, M)
December 22, 2022 Filing 3 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 12/22/2022. (Peterson, M)
December 22, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stephen J. Williams. (Peterson, M)
December 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Aviation Administration, Jason Aubrey George, Billy Joe Nolen, Daryl Norval Smith, filed by Stephen J. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover sheet) (Peterson, M)
December 22, 2022 Judge Sarala V. Nagala and Magistrate Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl Norval Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Aubrey George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Joe Nolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Aviation Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?