Baltzell v. Connecticut CVS Pharmacy, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jone Baltzell
Defendant: Connecticut CVS Pharmacy, LLC and Reidville Drive CVS, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00067
Filed: January 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Referring Judge: Omar A Williams
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying ECF No. #18 , Motion to Remand. In this motion, Plaintiff objects to the removal of this action to federal court, but fails to mount any fulsome argument to support her request for remand. Plaintiff asserts that "this is a standard slip and fall state court case" and that "Defendants have not met their burden of showing" that a federal court may preside over the action. The court disagrees. Defendants adequately have asserted that diversity jurisdiction exists: both defendants are of diverse citizenship to Plaintiff, and the amount in controversy is in excess of $75,000. Thus, the requirements of 28 U.S.C. section 1332 are satisfied. Furthermore, the court is unaware of any authority prohibiting federal courts from hearing premises liability actions. For these reasons, the motion is denied. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 3/16/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)
March 13, 2023 Filing 20 RESPONSE re #18 Objection to Motion to Remand filed by Connecticut CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Reidville Drive CVS, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Nucci v. PHH Mortgage)(Han, Young)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. The court thanks Defendants for their Local Rule 26(f) Report. See ECF No. #17 . Plaintiff did not participate in the Local Rule 26(f) conference and therefore the court accepts the report as filed by Defendants. The court hereby APPROVES and ADOPTS all deadlines proposed therein. All discovery shall be completed on or before November 20, 2023, and all interim discovery deadlines hereby are incorporated by reference. All interim discovery deadlines may be amended by agreement of the parties without the court's approval provided those amendments do not delay the deadline for completion of all discovery. Any motions for summary judgment shall be filed on or before December 20, 2023. The parties' joint trial memorandum shall be filed on or before January 22, 2024, if no dispositive motions are filed, or within the period set by the court upon its disposition of any dispositive motions that are filed. The court thereafter will set a jury selection date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to trial on March 15, 2024. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 3/8/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)
March 7, 2023 Filing 18 First OBJECTION re #1 Notice of Removal, and Motion to Remand by Jone Baltzell. (Bassman, Eli)
March 6, 2023 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Han, Young)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting ECF No. #15 , Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file a motion for remand on or before March 7, 2023. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 2/24/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)
February 21, 2023 Filing 15 motion for extension re ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Jone Baltzell.(Bassman, Eli)
January 24, 2023 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Connecticut CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Reidville Drive CVS, Inc. re #13 Electronic Service Documents,, (Han, Young)
January 20, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,, #12 Protective Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Reidville Drive CVS, Inc., Connecticut CVS Pharmacy, LLC, #11 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 1/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Barry, L)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Standing PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 1/19/2023. (Barry, L)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 1/19/2023. (Barry, L)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/20/2023 Discovery due by 7/21/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 8/25/2023 Signed by Clerk on 1/19/2023. (Barry, L)
January 19, 2023 Judge Omar A. Williams and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Freberg, B)
January 19, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Reidville Drive CVS, Inc..(Han, Young)
January 19, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Connecticut CVS Pharmacy, LLC.(Han, Young)
January 19, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Young B. Han on behalf of Connecticut CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Reidville Drive CVS, Inc. (Han, Young)
January 19, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Reidville Drive CVS, Inc.. (Han, Young)
January 19, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Connecticut CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Han, Young)
January 19, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by Connecticut CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Reidville Drive CVS, Inc. of Pending Motions (Han, Young)
January 19, 2023 Filing 3 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 1/19/2023.(Anastasio, F.)
January 19, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE by Connecticut CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Reidville Drive CVS, Inc. of Certification Pursuant to Local Rule Standing Order on Removed Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Corporate Summary, #3 Exhibit C - Merger Document)(Han, Young)
January 19, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Reidville Drive CVS, Inc., Connecticut CVS Pharmacy, LLC from Waterbury Superior, case number UWY-CV23-6068686-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7204821, filed by Reidville Drive CVS, Inc., Connecticut CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, Summons, Return of Service, #2 Exhibit B - Merger Document, #3 Exhibit C- Nucci v. PHH Mortgage Corp.)(Han, Young)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baltzell v. Connecticut CVS Pharmacy, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jone Baltzell
Represented By: Eli Bassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connecticut CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Young B. Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reidville Drive CVS, Inc.
Represented By: Young B. Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?