Perfetti v. Connecticut Orthopaedic Specialists, PC et al
Plaintiff: Silvia Perfetti
Defendant: Connecticut Orthopaedic Specialists, PC, Philip A. Minotti and Howmedica Osteonics Corp doing business as Stryker Orthopaedics
Case Number: 3:2023cv00075
Filed: January 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The Motion to Stay (ECF No. 13) is GRANTED substantially for the reasons set forth in Defendant Howmedica Osteonics Corp.'s brief (ECF No. 13-1). If the case is transferred to the MDL court, the plaintiff will be free to raise her jurisdictional objections, as well as her concerns about the risk of separate state court and federal court trials, in the MDL court.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 2/6/2023. (Davis, Christina)
February 2, 2023 Filing 18 OBJECTION re #13 MOTION to Stay Expedited Consideration Requested for Temporary Stay of All Proceedings Pending MDL Transfer filed by Silvia Perfetti. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Pianka, Andrew)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. The plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's #13 motion for a temporary stay no later than Monday, February 6, 2023. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 2/2/2023. (Davis, Christina)
February 2, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen M. Costello on behalf of Connecticut Orthopaedic Specialists, PC, Philip A. Minotti (Costello, Ellen)
February 2, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Stay Expedited Consideration Requested for Temporary Stay of All Proceedings Pending MDL Transfer. Responses due by 2/6/2023 (Johnson, D.)
February 1, 2023 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Homedica Motion to Stay by Connecticut Orthopaedic Specialists, PC, Philip A. Minotti. (Flanagan, Robert)
February 1, 2023 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Connecticut Orthopaedic Specialists, PC. (Flanagan, Robert)
January 30, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay Expedited Consideration Requested for Temporary Stay of All Proceedings Pending MDL Transfer by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.Responses due by 2/20/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Temporary Stay, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Strate, Christopher)
January 30, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Flanagan, Jr on behalf of Connecticut Orthopaedic Specialists, PC, Philip A. Minotti (Flanagan, Robert)
January 30, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Pianka on behalf of Silvia Perfetti (Pianka, Andrew)
January 25, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Silvia Perfetti.Responses due by 2/15/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Pianka, Andrew)
January 23, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 5 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Howmedica Osteonics Corp, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Howmedica Osteonics Corp, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #8 Protective Order, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Howmedica Osteonics Corp, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Howmedica Osteonics Corp Signed by Clerk on 1/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Peterson, M)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 1/20/2023. (Peterson, M)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 1/20/2023. (Peterson, M)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/21/2023. Discovery due by 7/22/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 8/26/2023. Signed by Clerk on 1/20/2023. (Peterson, M)
January 20, 2023 Filing 5 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 1/20/2023.(Anastasio, F.)
January 20, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher H. Strate on behalf of Howmedica Osteonics Corp. d/b/a Stryker Orthopaedics (Strate, Christopher)
January 20, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. d/b/a Stryker Orthopaedics re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Pending Motions (Strate, Christopher)
January 20, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. d/b/a Stryker Orthopaedics identifying Corporate Parent Stryker Corporation for Howmedica Osteonics Corp. d/b/a Stryker Orthopaedics. (Strate, Christopher)
January 20, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. d/b/a Stryker Orthopaedics from Superior Court Judicial District of New Haven, case number NNH-CV23-6129059-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7205930, filed by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. d/b/a Stryker Orthopaedics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Statement in Support of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Strate, Christopher)
January 20, 2023 Judge Michael P. Shea and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perfetti v. Connecticut Orthopaedic Specialists, PC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia Perfetti
Represented By: Andrew J. Pianka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connecticut Orthopaedic Specialists, PC
Represented By: Ellen M. Costello
Represented By: Robert J. Flanagan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip A. Minotti
Represented By: Ellen M. Costello
Represented By: Robert J. Flanagan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp doing business as Stryker Orthopaedics
Represented By: Christopher H. Strate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?