Modular Steel Systems, Inc. v. Htfd Bldg Co LLC et al
Plaintiff: Modular Steel Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Htfd Bldg Co LLC and Park & Main, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00081
Filed: January 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Referring Judge: Robert M Spector
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/24/2023 at 1:00 PM before Judge Kari A. Dooley. Telephonic Conference Line: 888-278-0296; Access Code: 80-77-899. (Chambers, Jillian)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties shall appear for a telephonic status conference on March 24, 2023 at 1:00 PM. A calendar entry with the details for this conference will be separately docketed. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/21/2023. (Chambers, Jillian)
March 2, 2023 Filing 24 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Pepe, Michael)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: A Settlement Conference is scheduled for April 18, 2023, at 10:30 a.m. Please see the attached Settlement Conference Order for detailed instructions regarding the conference. Signed by Judge Maria E. Garcia on 2/16/2023. (Santos, Sarah)
February 16, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference set for 4/18/2023 at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers Room 306, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Maria E. Garcia. (Santos, Sarah)
February 10, 2023 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maria E. Garcia: Telephonic Pre-Settlement Conference held on 2/10/2023. Total Time: 8 minutes (Santos, Sarah)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re 19 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Telephonic pre-settlement conference set for February 10, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Maria E. Garcia. Please call in to the Court's conference call line at 1-888-557-8511 and enter the pass code of 3852222# when prompted. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. Because the parties will likely be ordered to attend the conference, either in-person or via videoconference, counsel are instructed to obtain their client's schedules over the next ninety days and have them available during the pre-conference. Counsel should also have their own calendars available to aid in scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what, if any, information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference to maximize its chances of success. If either counsel has a firm, unavoidable conflict at the appointed date and time, e.g., a previously-scheduled appearance in another court, s/he should not file a motion for continuance on the docket but rather should call Chambers at 203-773-2022 as soon as possible with opposing counsel on the line to work out an alternate day and time for the pre-conference with Judge Garcia's law clerk. Signed by Judge Maria E. Garcia on 2/1/2023. (Santos, Sarah)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maria E. Garcia for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 1/31/2023.(Gould, K.)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Settlement Referral. A referral for settlement will enter. The referral does not impact the parties' other deadlines and obligations, to include the submission of a Rule 26(f) Report and the Rule 7.1 corporate disclosure obligations. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 1/30/2023. (Chambers, Jillian)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint on or before March 31, 2023. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 1/30/2023. (Chambers, Jillian)
January 30, 2023 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Settlement for Referral to Magistrate by Htfd Bldg Co LLC, Park & Main, LLC. (Perkins, Tasia)
January 30, 2023 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 31, 2023 Respond to Complaint #1 Complaint by Htfd Bldg Co LLC, Park & Main, LLC. (Perkins, Tasia)
January 30, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Tasia E. Perkins on behalf of Htfd Bldg Co LLC, Park & Main, LLC (Perkins, Tasia)
January 30, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter E. Strniste, Jr on behalf of Htfd Bldg Co LLC, Park & Main, LLC (Strniste, Peter)
January 30, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Modular Steel Systems, Inc.. Park & Main, LLC served on 1/30/2023, answer due 2/20/2023. (Pepe, Michael)
January 30, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Modular Steel Systems, Inc.. Htfd Bldg Co LLC served on 1/30/2023, answer due 2/20/2023. (Pepe, Michael)
January 30, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Htfd Bldg Co LLC to 3/31/2023; Park & Main, LLC to 3/31/2023. (Chambers, Jillian)
January 24, 2023 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Park & Main, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael Vincent Pepe* *Saxe, Doernberger & Vita, PC* *35 Nutmeg Drive, Ste. 140* *Trumbull, CT 06611*. (Fanelle, N.)
January 24, 2023 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Htfd Bldg Co LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael Vincent Pepe* *Saxe, Doernberger & Vita, PC* *35 Nutmeg Drive, Ste. 140* *Trumbull, CT 06611*. (Fanelle, N.)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Modular Steel Systems, Inc., #7 Protective Order, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Modular Steel Systems, Inc., #6 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Modular Steel Systems, Inc., #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 1/24/2023. (Fanelle, N.)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 1/23/2023. (Fanelle, N.)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 1/23/2023. (Fanelle, N.)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/24/2023 Discovery due by 7/25/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 8/29/2023 Signed by Clerk on 1/23/2023. (Fanelle, N.)
January 23, 2023 Filing 4 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 1/23/2023.(Anastasio, F.)
January 23, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Vincent Pepe on behalf of MODULAR STEEL SYSTEMS, INC. (Pepe, Michael)
January 23, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MODULAR STEEL SYSTEMS, INC.. (Pepe, Michael)
January 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7208352.), filed by MODULAR STEEL SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pepe, Michael)
January 23, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to HTFD BLDG CO LLC. (Pepe, Michael)
January 23, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to PARK & MAIN LLC. (Pepe, Michael)
January 23, 2023 Judge Kari A. Dooley and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Modular Steel Systems, Inc. v. Htfd Bldg Co LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Modular Steel Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Vincent Pepe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Htfd Bldg Co LLC
Represented By: Peter E. Strniste, Jr.
Represented By: Tasia E. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park & Main, LLC
Represented By: Peter E. Strniste, Jr.
Represented By: Tasia E. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?