White et al v. Connecticut Judicial Branch
Plaintiff: Crystal White, Albert Cuseo, III and Albert Robert Cuseo, III
Defendant: Connecticut Judicial Branch
Case Number: 3:2023cv00100
Filed: January 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2023 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Crystal White.(White, Crystal)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Doc. #19 ).The Court GRANTS only in part the motion for extension of time to February 16, 2023 to file any response explaining why the complaint should not be dismissed or file an amended complaint that overcomes the concerns stated by the Court's order to show cause. The Court is not convinced that more time is needed for the plaintiffs to convert their pleading to proper filing format. If they are unable to do so, then they may file their response manually at the Clerk's Office of the nearest federal court. It is so ordered.Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/10/23. (Barry, Donna)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Doc. #18 ). The Court GRANTS only in part the motion for extension of time for one more week to February 16, 2023 to file any response explaining why the complaint should not be dismissed or file an amended complaint that overcomes the concerns stated by the Court's order to show cause. The Court is not convinced that more time is needed for the plaintiffs to convert their pleading to proper filing format. If they are unable to do so, then they may file their response manually at the Clerk's Office of the nearest federal court. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/9/23. (Barry, Donna)
February 9, 2023 Filing 19 First MOTION for Extension of Time until March 1, 2023 Time necessary to convert Amended Complaint and supporting documents, exhibits, affidavits, evidence to PDF format and scan with OCR software into searchable text, etc. to Federal format and to file Amended Complaint (Response to Docket Entry 15) to Amend Complaint by Crystal White. (White, Crystal)
February 8, 2023 Filing 18 First MOTION for Extension of Time until March 1, 2023to convert Amended Complaint, supporting documents, exhibits, affidavits, evidence to PDF format, scan with OCR software into searchable text, etc. and to Amend Complaint by Albert Robert Cuseo, III. (Cuseo, Albert)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. SELF-REPRESENTED FILERS ARE REQUIRED TO COMPLY WITH THE JUDGE'S STANDARD ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER WHICH IS ATTACHED. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/26/23.(Barry, Donna)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #5 and #6 Motions to Participate in Electronic Filing. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/26/23. (Heavenrich, S.)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY COMPLAINT SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED. It appears that the complaint does not allege facts to establish a plausible ground for the Court's exercise of jurisdiction or for a grant of relief and is therefore subject to dismissal under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). The Court intends to dismiss this action unless by February 9, 2023 the plaintiffs either file a response explaining why the complaint should not be dismissed or file an amended complaint that overcomes the concerns stated in this ruling. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/26/23. (Heavenrich, S.) Modified on 1/30/2023 to change document type. (Chartier, AnnMarie).
January 26, 2023 Filing 14 Docket Entry Correction re #13 Electronic Service Documents - Entered prematurely. (Chartier, AnnMarie)
January 26, 2023 Filing 13 ENTERED IN ERROR - NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 Appearance Self Represented Party filed by Albert Cuseo, III, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Crystal White, #9 Appearance Self Represented Party filed by Crystal White, #11 Electronic Filing Order, #12 Protective Order, #6 MOTION for to Participate in Electronic Filing Order filed by Albert Cuseo, III, #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Declaratory Judgment filed by Crystal White, Albert Cuseo, III, 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,, #8 Consent to Electronic Notice filed by Albert Cuseo, III, #1 Complaint filed by Crystal White, Albert Cuseo, III, #10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 MOTION for to Participate in Electronic Filing Order filed by Crystal White Signed by Clerk on 1/26/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie) Modified on 1/26/2023 TO ENTER IN ERROR.(Chartier, AnnMarie).
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/25/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/25/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/26/2023 Discovery due by 7/27/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2023 Signed by Clerk on 1/25/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
January 25, 2023 Filing 9 Appearance Self Represented Party by Crystal White. (Fanelle, N.)
January 25, 2023 Filing 8 Consent to Electronic Notice by Albert Cuseo, III. (Fanelle, N.)
January 25, 2023 Filing 7 Appearance Self Represented Party by Albert Cuseo, III. (Fanelle, N.)
January 25, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Participate in Electronic Filing by Albert Cuseo, III. (Fanelle, N.)
January 25, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Participate in Electronic Filing by Crystal White. (Fanelle, N.)
January 25, 2023 Filing 4 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 1/25/2023. (Fanelle, N.)
January 25, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Declaratory Judgment by Albert Cuseo, III, Crystal White. Responses due by 2/15/2023. (Fanelle, N.)
January 25, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Crystal White. (Fanelle, N.)
January 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Connecticut Judicial Branch, filed by Crystal White, Albert Cuseo, III. (Fanelle, N.)
January 25, 2023 Case Reassigned to Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. Judge Michael P. Shea no longer assigned to the case. (Oliver, T.)
January 25, 2023 Judge Michael P. Shea and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White et al v. Connecticut Judicial Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Cuseo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Robert Cuseo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connecticut Judicial Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?