Demato v. Walmart Inc.
Plaintiff: Susan Demato
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00110
Filed: January 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Defendant is to file its opposition, re #16 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion to Remand, and the basis for its removal by MARCH 28, 2023. (Responses due by 3/28/2023). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/20/2023. (DeRubeis, B.)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER terminating #19 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 31, 2023 to file responsive pleading #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion is terminated as moot in light of Amended Motion for Extension of Time to Plead (Doc. No. 20). SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/20/2023. (DeRubeis, B.)
March 16, 2023 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Amended as to #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court until March 31, 2023 by Walmart Inc.. (Dwyer, Renee)
March 15, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 31, 2023 to file responsive pleading #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Walmart Inc.. (Dwyer, Renee)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until April 9, 2023 to file responsive pleading. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/9/2023. (DeRubeis, B.)
March 9, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Walmart Inc. to 4/9/2023. (DeRubeis, B.)
March 8, 2023 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until April 9, 2023 to file responsive pleading by Walmart Inc.. (Dwyer, Renee)
February 23, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Amend/Correct #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court to Include Proper Signature and Affidavit by Susan Demato.Responses due by 3/16/2023 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion)(Romanello, Joseph)
February 23, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Susan Demato.Responses due by 3/16/2023 (Romanello, Joseph)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 9, 2023 to file a Responsive Pleading. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/14/2023. (DeRubeis, B.)
February 14, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Walmart Inc. to 3/9/2023. (DeRubeis, B.)
February 9, 2023 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 9, 2023 to file a Responsive Pleading by Walmart Inc.. (Dwyer, Renee)
January 30, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal filed by Walmart Inc., #9 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart Inc., #5 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart Inc., #6 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart Inc., #10 Protective Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Walmart Inc., #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #11 Order, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Walmart Inc. Signed by Clerk on 1/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Freberg, B)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER RE DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/27/2023.(Freberg, B)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/27/2023.(Freberg, B)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/27/2023.(Freberg, B)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/28/2023; Discovery due by 7/29/2023; Dispositive Motions due by 9/2/2023. Signed by Clerk on 1/27/2023.(Freberg, B)
January 27, 2023 Filing 7 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 1/27/23.(Hushin, Z.)
January 27, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE by Walmart Inc. re: Standing Orders (Dwyer, Renee)
January 27, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by Walmart Inc. re: Civil & Miscellaneous Orders (Dwyer, Renee)
January 27, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by Walmart Inc. re: Pending Motions (Dwyer, Renee)
January 27, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc.. (Dwyer, Renee)
January 27, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Renee Wocl Dwyer on behalf of Walmart Inc. (Dwyer, Renee)
January 27, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc. from Litchfield Superior Court Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7215117, filed by Walmart Inc..(Dwyer, Renee)
January 27, 2023 Judge Janet C. Hall and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demato v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Demato
Represented By: Joseph J Romanello, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Renee Wocl Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?