Jusino v. Reis et al
Plaintiff: Jose A. Jusino
Defendant: Jennifer Reis, Nick Rodrigues, Angel Quiros, William Mulligan, Carlos Nunez, Lalitha Pieri, Damian Doran, Wolf-Craig and Dougherty
Case Number: 3:2023cv00132
Filed: February 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Jose A. Jusino. Responses due by 3/23/2023 (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint) (Oliver, T.)
February 15, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Jose A. Jusino. Responses due by 3/8/2023 (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint) (Oliver, T.)
February 15, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jose A. Jusino. (Oliver, T.)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis;. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 2/13/23. (Pesta, J.)
February 10, 2023 Filing 11 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jose A. Jusino. (Oliver, T.)
February 10, 2023 Filing 10 Prisoner Authorization Form by Jose A. Jusino. (Oliver, T.)
February 10, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jose A. Jusino. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Oliver, T.)
February 7, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF INSUFFICIENCY. The plaintiff has filed a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; in other words, he seeks to commence a federal lawsuit without pre-paying the filing fee. A federal law, 28 U.S.C. 1915, permits him to do so if, among other things, he submits a financial affidavit showing that he is unable to pay, accompanied by a certified copy of his inmate trust account statement for the six month period preceding his complaint. To assist inmates in demonstrating inability to pay, the District of Connecticut has prepared a standard-form in forma pauperis application.In this case, the plaintiff submitted the wrong in forma pauperis application form. He also did not submit a certified copy of his inmate trust account statement. His application is therefore insufficient. The Court notes that it came to the same conclusion on February 2, 2023 in the plaintiffs similar in forma pauperis application in 23-cv-126 (SRU). The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to send the plaintiff a blank copy of the correct application form at his address of record. The plaintiff is directed to fill out the form completely and accurately, and to file it with the Clerk of the Court along with a certified copy of his inmate trust account statement covering at least the period from August 1, 2022 to February 1, 2023. If he does not do so by February 24, 2023, his case may be dismissed. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 2/7/2023.(Corriette, M.)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/1/2023. (Oliver, T.)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Prisoner E-Filing Standing Order on Prisoner Electronic Filing Program Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/1/2023. (Oliver, T.)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/1/2023. (Oliver, T.)
February 1, 2023 Filing 4 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 2/1/2023.(Samson, Jessalyn)
February 1, 2023 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jose A. Jusino. (Samson, Jessalyn)
February 1, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jose A. Jusino. (Samson, Jessalyn)
February 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jose A. Jusino.(Samson, Jessalyn)
February 1, 2023 Judge Stefan R. Underhill and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Shafer, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jusino v. Reis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Jusino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Reis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Rodrigues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Quiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Mulligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lalitha Pieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damian Doran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolf-Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?