USA v. Frias et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Juan Carlos Frias, USA Tax, LLC, Multi Latin Services, LLC and Connecticut Tax and Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00165
Filed: February 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Nunc pro tunc Consent Motion for Extension of Time to May 15, 2023 To File a Responsive Pleading to #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/27/2023. (Rickevicius, L.)
March 27, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Connecticut Tax and Services, Inc. to 5/15/2023; Juan Carlos Frias to 5/15/2023; Multi Latin Services, LLC to 5/15/2023; USA Tax, LLC to 5/15/2023. (Rickevicius, L.)
March 24, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 15, 2023 To File a Responsive Pleading #1 Complaint by Connecticut Tax and Services, Inc., Juan Carlos Frias, Multi Latin Services, LLC, USA Tax, LLC. (Alfin, Jared)
March 16, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared M. Alfin on behalf of Connecticut Tax and Services, Inc., Juan Carlos Frias, Multi Latin Services, LLC, USA Tax, LLC (Alfin, Jared)
February 27, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Connecticut Tax and Services, Inc. served on 2/22/2023, answer due 3/15/2023. (Caves, Daniel)
February 27, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Multi Latin Services, LLC served on 2/22/2023, answer due 3/15/2023. (Caves, Daniel)
February 27, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. USA Tax, LLC served on 2/22/2023, answer due 3/15/2023. (Caves, Daniel)
February 27, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA. Juan Carlos Frias served on 2/22/2023, answer due 3/15/2023. (Caves, Daniel)
February 10, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to * All Defendants * with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel M. Caves* *P.O. Box 55* *Ben Franklin Station* *Washington, DC 20044-0055*. (Samson, Jessalyn)
February 10, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by USA Signed by Clerk on 2/10/2023.(Samson, Jessalyn)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 2/9/2023.(Samson, Jessalyn)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 2/9/2023.(Samson, Jessalyn)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/10/2023. Discovery due by 8/11/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2023. Signed by Clerk on 2/9/2023.(Samson, Jessalyn)
February 9, 2023 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 2/9/2023.(Anastasio, F.)
February 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Caves, Daniel)
February 9, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Caves, Daniel)
February 9, 2023 Judge Robert N. Chatigny and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Frias et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Daniel M. Caves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Carlos Frias
Represented By: Jared M. Alfin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Tax, LLC
Represented By: Jared M. Alfin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multi Latin Services, LLC
Represented By: Jared M. Alfin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connecticut Tax and Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jared M. Alfin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?