Cashman et al v. King et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Cashman and Patricia Cashman
Defendant: Kathleen King, Town of Clinton, Planning and Zoning Commission of the Town of Clinton and Veronica Lopez
Case Number: 3:2023cv00177
Filed: February 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert M Spector
Referring Judge: Omar A Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. The court thanks the parties for their Local Rule 26(f) Reports. See ECF Nos. #15 and #16 . Each party independently filed the report, though the filings are identical in substance. The court hereby APPROVES and ADOPTS all deadlines proposed therein. All discovery shall be completed on or before October 31, 2024, and all interim discovery deadlines hereby are incorporated by reference. All interim discovery deadlines may be amended by agreement of the parties without the court's approval provided those amendments do not delay the deadline for completion of all discovery. The parties hereby are granted permission to serve more than 25 interrogatories. Any motions for summary judgment shall be filed on or before December 1, 2024. The parties' joint trial memorandum shall be filed on or before December 1, 2024, if no dispositive motions are filed, or within the period set by the court upon its disposition of any dispositive motions that are filed. The court thereafter will set a jury selection date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to trial on January 15, 2025.Finally, the court notes that there is one additional defendant, Veronica Lopez, who has yet to appear in this action. It is unclear whether this defendant has been served, and the court acknowledges that the deadline for service is not until next month. However, the court reminds Plaintiffs that Local Rule 4(d) requires proof of service to be filed within seven days of receipt thereof. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 3/27/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)
March 26, 2023 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Labbadia, Pat)
March 26, 2023 Filing 15 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Gerarde, Thomas)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting ECF No. #13 , Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to the complaint on or before April 15, 2023. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 3/23/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)
March 23, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Town of Clinton to 4/15/2023; Kathleen King to 4/15/2023; Planning and Zoning Commission of the Town of Clinton to 4/15/2023. (Wagner, Rebecca)
March 22, 2023 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until April 15, 2023 within which to file a response to the plaintiffs' complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Town of Clinton, Kathleen King, Planning and Zoning Commission of the Town of Clinton. (Gerarde, Thomas)
March 16, 2023 Set Deadline: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/26/2023. (Velez, F.)
February 13, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Planning and Zoning Commission of the Town of Clinton, Town of Clinton, Kathleen King, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Planning and Zoning Commission of the Town of Clinton, Town of Clinton, Kathleen King, #6 Notice (Other) filed by Planning and Zoning Commission of the Town of Clinton, Town of Clinton, Kathleen King, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Planning and Zoning Commission of the Town of Clinton, Town of Clinton, Kathleen King, #11 Protective Order, #10 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice (Other), filed by Planning and Zoning Commission of the Town of Clinton, Town of Clinton, Kathleen King, 8 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,, #5 Jury Demand filed by Planning and Zoning Commission of the Town of Clinton, Town of Clinton, Kathleen King, #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Notice (Other) filed by Planning and Zoning Commission of the Town of Clinton, Town of Clinton, Kathleen King Signed by Clerk on 2/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Barry, L)
February 13, 2023 Filing 8 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 2/10/2023.(Anastasio, F.)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Standing PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 2/10/2023. (Barry, L)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 2/10/2023. (Barry, L)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/11/2023 Discovery due by 8/12/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 9/16/2023 Signed by Clerk on 2/10/2023. (Barry, L)
February 10, 2023 Judge Omar A. Williams and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Oliver, T.)
February 10, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE by Kathleen King, Planning and Zoning Commission of the Town of Clinton, Town of Clinton re #1 Notice of Removal, (Notice to Counsel LR5(b)) (Gerarde, Thomas)
February 10, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE by Kathleen King, Planning and Zoning Commission of the Town of Clinton, Town of Clinton re #1 Notice of Removal, (Compliance with Standing Order) (Gerarde, Thomas)
February 10, 2023 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kathleen King, Planning and Zoning Commission of the Town of Clinton, Town of Clinton. (Gerarde, Thomas)
February 10, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by Kathleen King, Planning and Zoning Commission of the Town of Clinton, Town of Clinton re #1 Notice of Removal, (Notice of Pending Motions) (Gerarde, Thomas)
February 10, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by Kathleen King, Planning and Zoning Commission of the Town of Clinton, Town of Clinton re #1 Notice of Removal, (Certificate of Filing and Notice of Service of Removal) (Attachments: #1 State Court Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Gerarde, Thomas)
February 10, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Gerarde on behalf of Kathleen King, Planning and Zoning Commission of the Town of Clinton, Town of Clinton (Gerarde, Thomas)
February 10, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Town of Clinton, Kathleen King, Planning and Zoning Commission of the Town of Clinton Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7233519, filed by Town of Clinton, Kathleen King, Planning and Zoning Commission of the Town of Clinton. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint)(Gerarde, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cashman et al v. King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Cashman
Represented By: Pat Labbadia, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Cashman
Represented By: Pat Labbadia, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen King
Represented By: Thomas R. Gerarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Clinton
Represented By: Thomas R. Gerarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planning and Zoning Commission of the Town of Clinton
Represented By: Thomas R. Gerarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?