Choh et al v. Brown University et al
Plaintiff: Tamenang Choh and Grace Kirk
Defendant: Brown University, Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York, Cornell University, Trustees of Dartmouth College, Harvard University, Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania, Princeton University, Yale University and Ivy League Council of Presidents
Case Number: 3:2023cv00305
Filed: March 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert M Spector
Referring Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2023 Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by David Gringer on behalf of Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania (Gringer, David)
May 5, 2023 Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth P. Waxman on behalf of Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania (Waxman, Seth)
May 5, 2023 Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Schoenfeld on behalf of Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania (Schoenfeld, Alan)
May 3, 2023 Filing 128 MOTION for Attorney(s) Charles Loughlin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7334381) by Yale University. (Daly, Deirdre)
May 3, 2023 Filing 127 MOTION for Attorney(s) Christopher Fitzpatrick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7334379) by Yale University. (Daly, Deirdre)
May 3, 2023 Filing 126 MOTION for Attorney(s) Benjamin F. Holt to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7334359) by Yale University. (Daly, Deirdre)
May 3, 2023 Filing 125 MOTION for Attorney(s) Douglas E. Litvack to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7334045) by Trustees of Dartmouth College. (Daly, Deirdre)
May 3, 2023 Filing 124 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #71 MOTION for Attorney(s) Terri L. Mascherin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7311717) by Trustees of Dartmouth College. (Daly, Deirdre)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting #117 Motion for Attorney Andrew C. Elliott to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 5/1/2023. (Mendez, D)
May 1, 2023 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Normand on behalf of Tamenang Choh, Grace Kirk (Normand, Edward)
April 28, 2023 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren J. Hartz on behalf of Trustees of Dartmouth College (Hartz, Lauren)
April 28, 2023 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Meaghan Anne Ryan on behalf of Ivy League Council of Presidents (Ryan, Meaghan)
April 28, 2023 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek Ludwin on behalf of Ivy League Council of Presidents (Ludwin, Derek)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #113 Motion for Attorney Rosa Morales to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 4/27/2023. (Mendez, D)
April 27, 2023 Filing 117 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew C. Elliott to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7327212) by Trustees of Dartmouth College. (Daly, Deirdre)
April 26, 2023 Filing 116 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Edward Normand to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7263231) by Tamenang Choh, Grace Kirk. (Normand, Edward)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #105 Motion for Attorney Lauren J. Hartz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 4/25/2023. (Mendez, D)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting #104 Motion for Attorney Ishan K. Bhabha to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 4/25/2023. (Mendez, D)
April 25, 2023 Filing 113 MOTION for Attorney(s) Rosa Morales to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7324722) by Princeton University. (Daly, Deirdre)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #103 Motion for Attorney Jordan Ludwig to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 4/25/2023. (Mendez, D)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #102 Motion for Attorney Juan A. Arteaga to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 4/25/2023. (Mendez, D)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting #94 Motion for Attorney David Gringer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 4/21/2023. (Mendez, D)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting #93 Motion for Attorney(s) Seth P. Waxman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 4/21/2023. (Mendez, D)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #92 Motion for Attorney(s) Alan E. Schoenfeld to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 4/21/2023. (Mendez, D)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #90 Motion for Attorney Meaghan Ryan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 4/21/2023. (Mendez, D)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #89 Motion for Attorney Derek Ludwin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 4/21/2023. (Mendez, D)
April 21, 2023 Filing 105 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lauren J. Hartz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7321040) by Trustees of Dartmouth College. (Daly, Deirdre)
April 21, 2023 Filing 104 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ishan K. Bhabha to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7321015) by Trustees of Dartmouth College. (Daly, Deirdre)
April 21, 2023 Filing 103 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jordan Ludwig to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7320960) by Princeton University. (Daly, Deirdre)
April 21, 2023 Filing 102 MOTION for Attorney(s) Juan A. Arteaga to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7320958) by Princeton University. (Daly, Deirdre)
April 21, 2023 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Leon Cramer on behalf of Tamenang Choh, Grace Kirk (Cramer, Eric)
April 21, 2023 Filing 100 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #65 MOTION for Attorney(s) Eric L. Cramer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7309256) by Tamenang Choh, Grace Kirk. (Cramer, Eric)
April 21, 2023 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Hoffman Lent on behalf of Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York (Lent, Karen)
April 21, 2023 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Kocoras on behalf of Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York (Kocoras, John)
April 21, 2023 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Lynn Van Gelder on behalf of Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York (Van Gelder, Amy)
April 20, 2023 Filing 96 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #70 MOTION for Attorney(s) Zachary Fardon to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7311710) by Cornell University. (Daly, Deirdre)
April 20, 2023 Filing 95 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #69 MOTION for Attorney(s) Norman A. Armstrong, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7311623) by Cornell University. (Daly, Deirdre)
April 20, 2023 Filing 94 MOTION for Attorney(s) David Gringer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7319964) by Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania. (Daly, Deirdre)
April 20, 2023 Filing 93 MOTION for Attorney(s) Seth P. Waxman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7319955) by Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania. (Daly, Deirdre)
April 20, 2023 Filing 92 MOTION for Attorney(s) Alan E. Schoenfeld to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7319948) by Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania. (Daly, Deirdre)
April 19, 2023 Filing 91 Disclosure Statement by Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania. (Daly, Deirdre)
April 19, 2023 Filing 90 MOTION for Attorney(s) Meaghan Ryan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7317398) by Ivy League Council of Presidents. (Daly, Deirdre)
April 19, 2023 Filing 89 MOTION for Attorney(s) Derek Ludwin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7317390) by Ivy League Council of Presidents. (Daly, Deirdre)
April 19, 2023 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J Walker on behalf of Tamenang Choh, Grace Kirk (Walker, Daniel)
April 19, 2023 Filing 87 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #64 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel J. Walker to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7309239) by Tamenang Choh, Grace Kirk. (Walker, Daniel)
April 18, 2023 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Terri L. Mascherin on behalf of Trustees of Dartmouth College (Mascherin, Terri)
April 18, 2023 Filing 85 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grace Kirk, Tamenang Choh. Ivy League Council of Presidents served on 4/14/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (Cesaroni, John)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #77 Motion for Attorney(s) John C. Kocoras to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 4/17/2023. (Mendez, D)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #71 Motion for Attorney Terri L. Mascherin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/16/2023. Signed by Clerk on 4/17/2023. (Mendez, D)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #70 Motion for Attorney Zachary Fardon to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/16/2023. Signed by Clerk on 4/17/2023. (Mendez, D)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Attorney Norman A. Armstrong, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/16/2023. Signed by Clerk on 4/17/2023. (Mendez, D)
April 17, 2023 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Renata Hesse on behalf of Harvard University (Hesse, Renata)
April 17, 2023 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane McGimsey on behalf of Harvard University (McGimsey, Diane)
April 14, 2023 Filing 78 Disclosure Statement by Ivy League Council of Presidents. (Allen, David)
April 14, 2023 Filing 77 MOTION for Attorney(s) John C. Kocoras to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York. (Daly, Deirdre)
April 14, 2023 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Madden on behalf of Tamenang Choh, Grace Kirk (Madden, Patrick)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #68 Motion for Attorney Amy L. Van Gelder to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 4/14/2023. (Mendez, D)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #67 Motion for Attorney Karen Hoffman Lent to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 4/14/2023. (Mendez, D)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Attorney Eric L. Cramer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/13/2023. Signed by Clerk on 4/14/2023. (Mendez, D)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #64 Motion for Attorney Daniel J. Walker to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/13/2023. Signed by Clerk on 4/14/2023. (Mendez, D)
April 14, 2023 Filing 71 MOTION for Attorney(s) Terri L. Mascherin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7311717) by Trustees of Dartmouth College. (Daly, Deirdre)
April 14, 2023 Filing 70 MOTION for Attorney(s) Zachary Fardon to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7311710) by Cornell University. (Daly, Deirdre)
April 14, 2023 Filing 69 MOTION for Attorney(s) Norman A. Armstrong, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7311623) by Cornell University. (Daly, Deirdre)
April 12, 2023 Filing 68 MOTION for Attorney(s) Amy L. Van Gelder to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7309270) by Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York. (Daly, Deirdre)
April 12, 2023 Filing 67 MOTION for Attorney(s) Karen Hoffman Lent to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7309268) by Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York. (Daly, Deirdre)
April 12, 2023 Filing 66 MOTION for Attorney(s) John C. Kocoras to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7309261) by Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York. (Daly, Deirdre)
April 12, 2023 Filing 65 MOTION for Attorney(s) Eric L. Cramer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7309256) by Tamenang Choh, Grace Kirk. (Moriarty, James)
April 12, 2023 Filing 64 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel J. Walker to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7309239) by Tamenang Choh, Grace Kirk. (Moriarty, James)
April 12, 2023 Filing 63 Disclosure Statement by Cornell University. (Allen, David)
April 11, 2023 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Cotler on behalf of Tamenang Choh, Grace Kirk (Cotler, Alan)
April 11, 2023 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Najah Jacobs on behalf of Tamenang Choh, Grace Kirk (Jacobs, Najah)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #57 Motion for Attorney Renata B. Hesse to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 4/10/2023. (Mendez, D)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #56 Motion for Attorney Diane L. McGimsey to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 4/10/2023. (Mendez, D)
April 7, 2023 Filing 58 Disclosure Statement by Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York. (Allen, David)
April 6, 2023 Filing 57 MOTION for Attorney(s) Renata B. Hesse to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7302328) by Harvard University. (Daly, Deirdre)
April 6, 2023 Filing 56 MOTION for Attorney(s) Diane L. McGimsey to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7302305) by Harvard University. (Daly, Deirdre)
April 6, 2023 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Patrick F. Madden to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7263223) by Tamenang Choh, Grace Kirk. (Cesaroni, John)
April 6, 2023 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Najah A. Jacobs to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7263175) by Tamenang Choh, Grace Kirk. (Cesaroni, John)
April 6, 2023 Filing 53 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #5 MOTION for Attorney(s) Alan Cotler to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7263089) by Tamenang Choh, Grace Kirk. (Cesaroni, John)
April 5, 2023 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert E. Litan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7263204) by Tamenang Choh, Grace Kirk. (Litan, Robert)
April 5, 2023 Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Yale University. (Allen, David)
April 4, 2023 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Litan on behalf of Tamenang Choh, Grace Kirk (Litan, Robert)
April 4, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah J. Kaufman on behalf of Brown University (Kaufman, Noah)
April 4, 2023 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Roellke on behalf of Brown University (Roellke, Jon)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: The Motion to Admit Hope Brinn as Visiting Attorney (ECF No. #12 ) is hereby GRANTED. Certificate of Good Standing due by 06/03/2023. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 04/04/2023. (Ghinaglia Socorro, F.)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: The Motion to Admit Edward Normand as Visiting Attorney (ECF No. #11 ) is hereby GRANTED. Certificate of Good Standing due by 06/03/2023. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 04/04/2023. (Ghinaglia Socorro, F.)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: The Motion to Admit Patrick F. Madden as Visiting Attorney (ECF No. #10 ) is hereby GRANTED. Certificate of Good Standing due by 06/03/2023. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 04/04/2023. (Ghinaglia Socorro, F.)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: The Motion to Admit Robert E. Litan as Visiting Attorney (ECF No. #9 ) is hereby GRANTED. Certificate of Good Standing due by 06/03/2023. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 04/04/2023. (Ghinaglia Socorro, F.)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: The Motion to Admit Stephen Lagos as Visiting Attorney (ECF No. #8 ) is hereby GRANTED. Certificate of Good Standing due by 06/03/2023. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 04/04/2023. (Ghinaglia Socorro, F.)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: The Motion to Admit Najah A. Jacobs as Visiting Attorney (ECF No. #7 ) is hereby GRANTED. Certificate of Good Standing due by 06/03/2023. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 04/04/2023. (Ghinaglia Socorro, F.)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: The Motion to Admit Velvel (Devin) Freedman as Visiting Attorney (ECF No. #6 ) is hereby GRANTED. Certificate of Good Standing due by 06/03/2023. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 04/04/2023. (Ghinaglia Socorro, F.)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: The Motion to Admit Alan Cotler as Visiting Attorney (ECF No. #5 ) is hereby GRANTED. Certificate of Good Standing due by 06/03/2023. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 04/04/2023. (Ghinaglia Socorro, F.)
April 3, 2023 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trustees of Dartmouth College. (Allen, David)
April 3, 2023 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Princeton University. (Allen, David)
April 3, 2023 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Harvard University. (Allen, David)
April 3, 2023 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brown University. (Allen, David)
April 3, 2023 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #30 MOTION for Attorney(s) Noah J. Kaufman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7293190) by Brown University. (Daly, Deirdre)
April 3, 2023 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #29 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jon R. Roellke to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7293189) by Brown University. (Daly, Deirdre)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Appear for Attorney Noah J. Kaufman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/2/2023. Signed by Clerk on 4/3/2023. (Barry, L)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Appear for Attorney Jon R. Roellke to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/2/2023. Signed by Clerk on 4/3/2023. (Barry, L)
March 31, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Brown University to 5/15/2023; Cornell University to 5/15/2023; Harvard University to 5/15/2023; Ivy League Council of Presidents to 5/15/2023; Princeton University to 5/15/2023; Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York to 5/15/2023; Trustees of Dartmouth College to 5/15/2023; Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania to 5/15/2023; Yale University to 5/15/2023. (Ferguson, L.)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: The Joint Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #28 ) is hereby GRANTED. The defendants shall move to dismiss, answer, or otherwise respond to the plaintiffs' Complaint by May 15, 2023. The plaintiffs shall file any oppositions to any motions to dismiss by June 29, 2023. The defendants shall file any reply in further support of any motions to dismiss by July 27, 2023. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 03/31/2023. (Ghinaglia Socorro, F.)
March 31, 2023 Filing 30 MOTION for Attorney(s) Noah J. Kaufman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7293190) by Brown University. (Daly, Deirdre)
March 31, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jon R. Roellke to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7293189) by Brown University. (Daly, Deirdre)
March 30, 2023 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until May 15, 2023 to move to dismiss, answer or respond to Complaint; June 29, 2023 for oppositions to motions to dismiss and July 27, 2023 for replies to motions to dismiss #1 Complaint by Brown University, Cornell University, Harvard University, Ivy League Council of Presidents, Princeton University, Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York, Trustees of Dartmouth College, Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania, Yale University. (Allen, David)
March 30, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Allen on behalf of Brown University, Cornell University, Harvard University, Ivy League Council of Presidents, Princeton University, Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York, Trustees of Dartmouth College, Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania, Yale University (Allen, David)
March 30, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Deirdre M. Daly on behalf of Brown University, Cornell University, Harvard University, Ivy League Council of Presidents, Princeton University, Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York, Trustees of Dartmouth College, Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania, Yale University (Daly, Deirdre)
March 22, 2023 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grace Kirk, Tamenang Choh. Trustees of Dartmouth College served on 3/17/2023, answer due 4/7/2023. (Moriarty, James)
March 21, 2023 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grace Kirk, Tamenang Choh. Yale University served on 3/13/2023, answer due 4/3/2023. (Moriarty, James)
March 21, 2023 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grace Kirk, Tamenang Choh. Harvard University served on 3/13/2023, answer due 4/3/2023. (Moriarty, James)
March 16, 2023 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grace Kirk, Tamenang Choh. Brown University served on 3/13/2023, answer due 4/3/2023. (Moriarty, James)
March 16, 2023 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grace Kirk, Tamenang Choh. Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York served on 3/9/2023, answer due 3/30/2023. (Moriarty, James)
March 16, 2023 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grace Kirk, Tamenang Choh. Princeton University served on 3/13/2023, answer due 4/3/2023. (Moriarty, James)
March 16, 2023 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grace Kirk, Tamenang Choh. Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania served on 3/13/2023, answer due 4/3/2023. (Moriarty, James)
March 16, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grace Kirk, Tamenang Choh. Cornell University served on 3/10/2023, answer due 3/31/2023. (Moriarty, James)
March 8, 2023 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Brown University, Cornell University, Harvard University, Ivy League Council of Presidents, Princeton University, Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York, Trustees of Dartmouth College, Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania, Yale University* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Stephen M. Kindseth* *Zeisler & Zeisler, P.C.* *10 Middle Street 15th Floor* *Bridgeport, CT 06604*. (Barry, L)
March 8, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,, #15 Protective Order, #14 Electronic Filing Order, #13 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Tamenang Choh, Grace Kirk Signed by Clerk on 3/7/2023.(Barry, L)
March 8, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Hope E. Brinn to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7263738) by Tamenang Choh, Grace Kirk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kindseth, Stephen)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Standing PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 3/7/2023. (Barry, L)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 3/7/2023.(Barry, L)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/6/2023 Discovery due by 9/6/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 10/11/2023 Signed by Clerk on 3/7/2023. (Barry, L)
March 7, 2023 Judge Alvin W. Thompson and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Freberg, B)
March 7, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Edward Normand to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7263231) by Tamenang Choh, Grace Kirk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kindseth, Stephen)
March 7, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Patrick F. Madden to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7263223) by Tamenang Choh, Grace Kirk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kindseth, Stephen)
March 7, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert E. Litan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7263204) by Tamenang Choh, Grace Kirk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kindseth, Stephen)
March 7, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stephen Lagos to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7263200) by Tamenang Choh, Grace Kirk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kindseth, Stephen)
March 7, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Najah A. Jacobs to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7263175) by Tamenang Choh, Grace Kirk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kindseth, Stephen)
March 7, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Velvel (Devin) Freedman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7263149) by Tamenang Choh, Grace Kirk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kindseth, Stephen)
March 7, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney(s) Alan Cotler to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7263089) by Tamenang Choh, Grace Kirk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kindseth, Stephen)
March 7, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John Louis Cesaroni on behalf of Tamenang Choh, Grace Kirk (Cesaroni, John)
March 7, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Moriarty on behalf of Tamenang Choh, Grace Kirk (Moriarty, James)
March 7, 2023 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 3/7/2023.(Anastasio, F.)
March 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7262825.), filed by Grace Kirk, Tamenang Choh.(Kindseth, Stephen)
March 7, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Kindseth, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Choh et al v. Brown University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamenang Choh
Represented By: James M. Moriarty
Represented By: John Louis Cesaroni
Represented By: Stephen M. Kindseth
Represented By: Alan Cotler
Represented By: Daniel J Walker
Represented By: Patrick Madden
Represented By: Edward Normand
Represented By: Eric Leon Cramer
Represented By: Najah Jacobs
Represented By: Robert E. Litan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Kirk
Represented By: James M. Moriarty
Represented By: John Louis Cesaroni
Represented By: Stephen M. Kindseth
Represented By: Robert E. Litan
Represented By: Alan Cotler
Represented By: Daniel J Walker
Represented By: Edward Normand
Represented By: Eric Leon Cramer
Represented By: Najah Jacobs
Represented By: Patrick Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown University
Represented By: David R. Allen
Represented By: Deirdre M. Daly
Represented By: Jon Roellke
Represented By: Noah J. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York
Represented By: Amy Lynn Van Gelder
Represented By: David R. Allen
Represented By: Deirdre M. Daly
Represented By: John C. Kocoras
Represented By: Karen Hoffman Lent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornell University
Represented By: David R. Allen
Represented By: Deirdre M. Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of Dartmouth College
Represented By: David R. Allen
Represented By: Deirdre M. Daly
Represented By: Terri L. Mascherin
Represented By: Lauren J. Hartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard University
Represented By: David R. Allen
Represented By: Deirdre M. Daly
Represented By: Diane McGimsey
Represented By: Renata Hesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania
Represented By: David R. Allen
Represented By: Deirdre M. Daly
Represented By: Alan Schoenfeld
Represented By: David Gringer
Represented By: Seth P. Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princeton University
Represented By: David R. Allen
Represented By: Deirdre M. Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yale University
Represented By: David R. Allen
Represented By: Deirdre M. Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivy League Council of Presidents
Represented By: Deirdre M. Daly
Represented By: Derek Ludwin
Represented By: David R. Allen
Represented By: Meaghan Anne Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?