Guerrero v. Merritt Healthcare Holdings, LLC
Plaintiff: Jessica Guerrero
Defendant: Merritt Healthcare Holdings, LLC doing business as Merritt Healthcare Advisors
Case Number: 3:2023cv00389
Filed: March 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Referring Judge: Robert M Spector
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time #35 First MOTION for Extension of Time until June 26, 2023 to Hold a 26(f) Conference and Amended Pleading Deadline. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 05/24/2023. (Lee, Elisabeth)
May 24, 2023 Reset deadlines: 26(f) conference and amended pleadings now due by 6-26-2023 per Dkt. 36 Order. (Shafer, J.)
May 23, 2023 Filing 35 First MOTION for Extension of Time until June 26, 2023 to Hold a 26(f) Conference and Amended Pleading Deadline by Merritt Healthcare Holdings, LLC. (Seusing, Christopher)
May 19, 2023 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #31 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kevin Laukaitis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7352143) by Jessica Guerrero. (Laukaitis, Kevin)
May 19, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Laukaitis on behalf of Jessica Guerrero (Laukaitis, Kevin)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER on Motion granting the #31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission. Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/18/2023. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/19/2023. (Gaskins, A)
May 18, 2023 Filing 31 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kevin Laukaitis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7352143) by Jessica Guerrero. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kevin Laukaitis)(Comite, Erin)
May 9, 2023 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nicholas A. Colella to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by Jessica Guerrero. (Colella, Nicholas)
May 9, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Colella on behalf of Jessica Guerrero (Colella, Nicholas)
May 9, 2023 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Elizabeth Pollock-Avery to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by Jessica Guerrero. (Pollock-Avery, Elizabeth)
May 9, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Pollock-Avery on behalf of Jessica Guerrero (Pollock-Avery, Elizabeth)
May 9, 2023 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Gary F. Lynch to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by Jessica Guerrero. (Lynch, Gary)
May 9, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary F. Lynch on behalf of Jessica Guerrero (Lynch, Gary)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/8/2023. Signed by Clerk on 5/9/2023. (Gaskins, A.)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/8/2023. Signed by Clerk on 5//9/2023. (Gaskins, A.)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/8/2023. Signed by Clerk on 5/9/2023. (Gaskins, A.)
May 5, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nicholas A. Colella to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by Jessica Guerrero. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Nicholas A. Colella)(Comite, Erin)
May 5, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Elizabeth Pollock-Avery to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by Jessica Guerrero. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Elizabeth Pollock-Avery)(Comite, Erin)
May 5, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Gary F. Lynch to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by Jessica Guerrero. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Gary F. Lynch)(Comite, Erin)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying without prejudice to refiling #14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Gary F. Lynch to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice, #15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Elizabeth Pollock-Avery to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice, and #16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nicholas A. Colella to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice for failure to comply with Local Rule 83.1(d)(1), which requires counsel to submit "an affidavit, duly sworn and executed" rather than a declaration. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 05/04/2023. (Lee, Elisabeth)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 First MOTION for Extension of Time until June 26, 2023 to Respond to Complaint #1 Complaint for good cause shown and on consent by opposing counsel. See D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 7(b). The responsive pleading deadline is 06/26/2023. For all future filings, the parties are ORDERED to comply with this Court's Electronic Filing Preferences available at https://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/content/vanessa-l-bryant. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 04/26/2023. (Lee, Elisabeth)
April 26, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nicholas A. Colella to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7325652) by Jessica Guerrero. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas A. Colella)(Comite, Erin)
April 26, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Elizabeth Pollock-Avery to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7325643) by Jessica Guerrero. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Pollock-Avery)(Comite, Erin)
April 26, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Gary F. Lynch to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7325609) by Jessica Guerrero. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Gary F. Lynch)(Comite, Erin)
April 26, 2023 Answer deadline updated to 6-26-2023 per Dkt. 17 Order. (Shafer, J.)
April 25, 2023 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time until June 26, 2023 to Respond to Complaint #1 Complaint, by Merritt Healthcare Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint)(Seusing, Christopher)
April 13, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Guerrero. Merritt Healthcare Holdings, LLC served on 4/5/2023, answer due 4/26/2023. (Guglielmo, Joseph)
March 30, 2023 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Merritt Healthcare Holdings, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Erin Green Comite* *Scott & Scott LLP - CT* *156 South Main Street, P. O. Box 192* *Colchester, CT 06415*. (Shafer, J.)
March 30, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #8 Standing Protective Order, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, #3 Notice of Appearance, #9 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #2 Notice of Appearance, Dkt. 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, and #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 3-30-2023. (Shafer, J.)
March 30, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement as to Rule 7.1(a)(2) Parties or Intervenors in a Diversity Case by Jessica Guerrero. (Comite, Erin)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3-29-2023. (Shafer, J.)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3-29-2023. (Shafer, J.)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3-29-2023. (Shafer, J.)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: amended pleadings due by 5-28-2023, discovery due by 9-28-2023, and dispositive motions due by 11-2-2023. Signed by Clerk on 3-29-2023. (Shafer, J.)
March 29, 2023 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Freberg, B)
March 29, 2023 Filing 4 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 3/29/2023.(Perez, J.)
March 29, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Anja Rusi on behalf of Jessica Guerrero (Rusi, Anja)
March 29, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P. Guglielmo on behalf of Jessica Guerrero (Guglielmo, Joseph)
March 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Merritt Healthcare Holdings, LLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7291263.), filed by Jessica Guerrero. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Comite, Erin) Modified on 3/29/2023 to remove defendant's party text (Perez, J.).
March 29, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Merritt Healthcare Holdings, LLC, d/b/a Merritt Healthcare Advisors. (Comite, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guerrero v. Merritt Healthcare Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Guerrero
Represented By: Anja Rusi
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P. Guglielmo
Represented By: Elizabeth Pollock-Avery
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Represented By: Kevin Laukaitis
Represented By: Nicholas Colella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merritt Healthcare Holdings, LLC doing business as Merritt Healthcare Advisors
Represented By: Christopher Seusing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?