Roman et al v. Exactech, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Victor M Roman and Romona Roman
Defendant: Exactech, Inc., Exactech, U.S., Inc., TPG, Inc., Osteon Holdings, Inc., Osteon Merger Sub, Inc., Osteon Intermediate Holdings II, Inc., Exactech US, Inc. and TPG Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00403
Filed: March 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Referring Judge: Robert M Spector
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2023 Acknowledgment of Receipt re: Case Transferred Out - Case transferred from Connecticut has been opened in Eastern District of New York as case 1:23-cv-02944, filed 04/21/2023. (Oliver, T.)
April 21, 2023 Case electronically transferred to the Eastern District of New York. (Oliver, T.)
April 20, 2023 Filing 9 MDL TRANSFER ORDER: Case transferred to the Eastern District of New York. Signed by Clerk of the Panel, John W. Nichols, MDL Panel 4/20/2023. (Gaskins, A.)
April 20, 2023 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Sichanh, Christina)
April 3, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc., Osteon Holdings, Inc., Osteon Intermediate Holdings II, Inc., Osteon Merger Sub, Inc., TPG Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jeffrey Kanca* *Early, Ludwick, Sweeney & Meisenkothen, LLC* *265 Church Street 11th Floor* *New Haven, CT 06508*. (Gaskins, Andrea)
April 3, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #1 Complaint, filed by Romona Roman, Victor M Roman, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,, #5 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 4/3//2023.(Gaskins, Andrea)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/31/2023.(Gaskins, Andrea)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/31/2023.(Gaskins, Andrea)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/31/2023.(Gaskins, Andrea)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/30/2023 Discovery due by 9/30/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 11/4/2023 Signed by Clerk on 3/31/2023.(Gaskins, Andrea)
March 31, 2023 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 3/31/2023.(Anastasio, F.)
March 31, 2023 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Freberg, B)
March 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Exactech, Inc., Exactech, U.S., Inc., Osteon Holdings, Inc., Osteon Intermediate Holdings II, Inc., Osteon Merger Sub, Inc., TPG, Inc. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7294684.), filed by Victor M Roman, Romona Roman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kanca, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Exactech, U.S., Inc.. (Kanca, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Exactech, Inc.. (Kanca, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Osteon Holdings, Inc.. (Kanca, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Osteon Merger Sub, Inc.. (Kanca, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to TPG, Inc.. (Kanca, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Osteon Intermediate Holdings II, Inc.. (Kanca, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roman et al v. Exactech, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor M Roman
Represented By: Jeffrey Kanca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romona Roman
Represented By: Jeffrey Kanca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech, U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPG, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osteon Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osteon Merger Sub, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osteon Intermediate Holdings II, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPG Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?