Rozynski v. Hartford Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Stanley Rozynski
Defendant: Hartford Hospital and Hartford HealthCare Corporation
Case Number: 3:2023cv00431
Filed: April 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert M Spector
Referring Judge: Omar A Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Stanley Rozynski.Responses due by 6/12/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Adams, Elizabeth)
May 22, 2023 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Hospital, filed by Stanley Rozynski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redlined Amended Complaint)(Adams, Elizabeth)
May 18, 2023 Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 3/31/2024; Dispositive Motions due by 5/31/2024; Joint Trial Memorandum due by 5/31/2024. (Velez, F.)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 GENERAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The court thanks the parties for submitting their Rule 26(f) Planning Report, see ECF No. 18, and hereby APPROVES and ADOPTS all deadlines proposed therein, except as modified by this order. All discovery shall be completed on or before March 31, 2024, all interim discovery deadlines hereby are incorporated by reference and may be amended by agreement of the parties without the court's approval provided those amendments do not delay the deadline for completion of all discovery. Any dispositive motions shall be filed on or before May 31, 2024. The parties' Joint Trial Memorandum shall be filed on or before May 31, 2024, if dispositive motions are not filed. If such motions are filed, the court will set a deadline for the Joint Trial Memorandum at the time it disposes of the dispositive motion(s). The case shall be trial ready within thirty (30) days from the date the parties file their Joint Trial Memorandum. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 05/18/23. (Codeanne, K.)
May 16, 2023 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Adams, Elizabeth)
May 1, 2023 Filing 17 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Hospital.(Harper, Bradley)
April 19, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Mark Harper on behalf of Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Hospital (Harper, Bradley)
April 19, 2023 Set Deadline: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/19/2023. (Velez, F.)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading, ECF No. 14, to and including May 1, 2023. It is so ordered.Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 04/18/23. (Codeanne, K.)
April 13, 2023 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time until May 1, 2023 to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Hospital. (Niemiroski, Sarah)
April 6, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Hospital, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Hospital, #7 Disclosure Statement filed by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, #11 Protective Order, #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 8 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #10 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Hospital, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Hospital, #6 Disclosure Statement filed by Hartford Hospital, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Hospital Signed by Clerk on 4/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Peterson, M)
April 5, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE re: Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 4-5-2023. (Attachments: #1 Identification of Initial Discovery Protocol for Employment Cases) (Shafer, J.)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 4/5/2023. (Peterson, M)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 4/5/2023. (Peterson, M)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/4/2023. Discovery due by 10/5/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 11/9/2023. Signed by Clerk on 4/5/2023. (Peterson, M)
April 5, 2023 Filing 8 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 4/5/23.(Hushin, Z.)
April 5, 2023 Judge Omar A. Williams and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Freberg, B)
April 5, 2023 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement (Corporate Disclosure Statement) by Hartford HealthCare Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Hartford HealthCare Corporation for Hartford HealthCare Corporation. (Murphy, Peter)
April 5, 2023 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement (Corporate Disclosure Statement) by Hartford Hospital identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Hospital for Hartford Hospital. (Murphy, Peter)
April 5, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Hospital re #1 Notice of Removal, (Notice of Pending Motions) (Murphy, Peter)
April 5, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Hospital re #1 Notice of Removal, (Statement Regarding Standing Order in Removed Cases) (Murphy, Peter)
April 5, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Niemiroski on behalf of Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Hospital (Niemiroski, Sarah)
April 5, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Joseph Murphy on behalf of Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Hospital (Murphy, Peter)
April 5, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Hospital from Hartford Superior Court, case number HHD-CV23-6167348S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7300405, filed by Hartford HealthCare Corporation, Hartford Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Murphy, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rozynski v. Hartford Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Rozynski
Represented By: Elizabeth Knight Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Hospital
Represented By: Sarah Niemiroski
Represented By: Peter Joseph Murphy
Represented By: Bradley Mark Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford HealthCare Corporation
Represented By: Sarah Niemiroski
Represented By: Peter Joseph Murphy
Represented By: Bradley Mark Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?