Mewn Media Inc. v. Kadena LLC
Plaintiff: Mewn Media Inc.
Defendant: Kadena LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00465
Filed: April 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert A Richardson
Referring Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. Defendant has filed a #20 Motion to Dismiss. On or before June 29, 2023, Plaintiff shall either file a response to the motion or file an amended complaint in which it pleads as many facts as possible, consistent with Rule 11, to address the alleged defects discussed in Defendant's memorandum of law. The Court will not allow further amendments after June 29, 2023. If Plaintiff chooses to amend and if Defendant renews its motion to dismiss, Defendant may incorporate by reference any prior briefing. In light of this response deadline and in light of the Defendant's filing of its motion to dismiss on grounds similar to those raised in the Court's June 2 order (ECF No. 16), the deadline for the Plaintiff to respond to the June 2 order (ECF No. 16) is hereby amended to be June 29, 2023, the same due date for its response to the motion to dismiss (be it an amended complaint or a brief in opposition).Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 6/9/2023. (Davis, Christina)
June 8, 2023 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT re #21 Memorandum in Support of Motion Signed By Stuart Popejoy filed by Kadena LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cretella, Michael)
June 8, 2023 Filing 21 Memorandum in Support re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [of subject matter] filed by Kadena LLC. (Cretella, Michael)
June 8, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [of subject matter] by Kadena LLC.Responses due by 6/29/2023 (Cretella, Michael)
June 8, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Order Permitting Defendant to Limit Disclosure Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Order by Kadena LLC. (Cretella, Michael)
June 8, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Guere on behalf of Kadena LLC (Guere, Samantha)
June 8, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Thomas Cretella on behalf of Kadena LLC (Cretella, Michael)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. It appears that Plaintiff's #15 Statement re: Jurisdiction does not allege an adequate basis for the Court's subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332 over Defendant Kadena LLC because it does not properly allege the citizenship of Defendant. The statement identifies Defendant Kadena LLC as "a manager-managed Connecticut limited liability company comprised of two managers," both "citizen[s]" of Pennsylvania. ECF No. 15 at 1-2. As previously stated, "for purposes of diversity jurisdiction, a limited liability company has the citizenship of its membership." Handelsman v. Bedford Vill. Assocs. Ltd. P'ship, 213 F.3d 48, 51-52 (2d Cir. 2000) (internal citations omitted). In other words, Plaintiff must identify and state the citizenship of each member of Kadena LLC. It is not clear from Plaintiff's notice or its attachments whether the identified managers are members or if so, whether the LLC also has other, non-manager members. If Plaintiff cannot determine whether there are other members, it may take limited discovery aimed at identifying the citizenship of Defendant's members. Within 14 days, plaintiff shall file a statement adequately setting forth the basis for the Court's jurisdiction. Failure to respond to this order will result in dismissal of the case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 6/2/2023. (Davis, Christina)
May 30, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE by Mewn Media Inc. Statement re: Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of N. Singh, Esq., #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A)(Rao, Prerna)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nitoj P. Singh and Anthony J. Fusaro to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/25/2023. Signed by Clerk on 5/26/2023. (Peterson, M)
May 25, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nitoj P. Singh, Anthony J. Fusaro to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Mewn Media Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Prerna Rao, Esq., #2 Affidavit N. Singh, Esq., #3 Affidavit A. Fusaro, Esq., #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #5 Notice- N. Singh, #6 Notice- A. Fusaro)(Rao, Prerna)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. It appears that the #1 complaint does not allege an adequate basis for the Court's subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332 because it does not properly allege complete diversity as to Defendant Kadena LLC. "If subject matter jurisdiction is lacking and no party has called the matter to the court's attention, the court has the duty to dismiss the action sua sponte." Durant, Nichols, Houston, Hodgson & Cortese-Costa P.C. v. Dupont, 565 F.3d 56, 62 (2d Cir. 2009). The complaint identifies Defendant Kadena LLC as "a Connecticut limited liability company, with, upon information and belief, its principal place of business in New York, New York." ECF No. #1 at 2. This statement is insufficient to determine LLC citizenship for diversity purposes because principal place of business, domicile, or state of existence do not determine a LLC's citizenship. "[F]or purposes of diversity jurisdiction, a limited liability company has the citizenship of its membership." Handelsman v. Bedford Vill. Assocs. Ltd. P'ship, 213 F.3d 48, 51-52 (2d Cir. 2000) (internal citations omitted). Plaintiff must state the citizenship of each member of Kadena LLC. If any member of Kadena LLC is itself an LLC, the plaintiff must also state the citizenship of each member of that LLC. Within 14 days, Plaintiff shall file a statement adequately setting forth the basis for the Court's jurisdiction, or this case will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/15/2023. (Davis, Christina)
May 12, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Kadena LLC waiver sent on 4/12/2023, answer due 6/11/2023 filed by Mewn Media Inc.. (Rao, Prerna)
April 18, 2023 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement by Mewn Media Inc.. (Rao, Prerna)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. The motion (ECF No. #8 ) is DENIED for failure to conform to Local Rule 83.1(d)(1)(b) (The motion shall be accompanied by an affidavit, duly sworn and executed by the proposed visiting attorney: identifying the bar of each court of which said attorney is and has ever been a member, and the corresponding bar identification number(s); or if no such numbers have been assigned, so stating.). The motion can be re-filed in accordance with the Local Rule. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 4/17/2023. (Peterson, M)
April 14, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nitoj P. Singh, Anthony J. Fusaro to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $400 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7312041) by Mewn Media Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit P. Rao, Esq., #2 Affidavit N. Singh, Esq., #3 Affidavit A. Fusaro, Esq., #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #5 Notice- N. Singh, #6 Notice- A. Fusaro)(Rao, Prerna)
April 13, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Prerna Rao on behalf of Mewn Media Inc. (Rao, Prerna)
April 13, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint filed by Mewn Media Inc. Signed by Clerk on 4/13/2023. (Peterson, M)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 4/12/2023. (Peterson, M)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 4/12/2023. (Peterson, M)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/11/2023. Discovery due by 10/12/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 11/16/2023. Signed by Clerk on 4/12/2023. (Peterson, M)
April 12, 2023 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 4/12/2023.(Anastasio, F.)
April 12, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kadena LLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7309380.), filed by Mewn Media Inc..(Rao, Prerna)
April 12, 2023 Judge Michael P. Shea and Judge Robert A. Richardson added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mewn Media Inc. v. Kadena LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mewn Media Inc.
Represented By: Prerna Rao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kadena LLC
Represented By: Michael Thomas Cretella
Represented By: Samantha Guere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?