USA v. Glock GMBH 27Gen5 Pistol Cal: 40 SN BWBW076 et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Glock GMBH 27Gen5 Pistol Cal: 40 SN BWBW076, Rounds Speer Ammunition Cal: 40 and Rounds Winchester-Western Ammunition Cal: 40
Claimant: Jean Carlo Vega
Case Number: 3:2023cv00478
Filed: April 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert A Richardson
Referring Judge: Omar A Williams
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2023 Filing 15 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jean Carlo Vega: Motion for default judgment due by 7/10/2023. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed or this action will be dismissed. (Velez, F.)
June 12, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Jean Carlo Vega by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Default Judgment)(Nelson, David)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting ECF No. #12 , Motion for Default Entry. The Clerk of Court respectfully is requested to enter default as to claimant Jean Carlo Vega. The government shall file a motion for default judgment on or before July 10, 2023. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 6/9/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)
May 31, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Jean Carlo Vega by USA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Request for 55a Default)(Nelson, David)
May 30, 2023 Filing 11 RETURN ON SERVICE by Publication filed by USA. Last publication date May 18, 2023. (Nelson, David)
May 30, 2023 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by USA (Nelson, David)
May 16, 2023 Filing 9 WARRANT of Arrest in Rem issued. (Peterson, M)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting ECF No. #7 , Motion for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest In Rem. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 5/15/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)
May 11, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Warrant of Arrest in Rem)(Nelson, David)
April 18, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint filed by USA Signed by Clerk on 4/18/2023. (Peterson, M)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 4/17/2023. (Peterson, M)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 4/17/2023. (Peterson, M)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/16/2023. Discovery due by 10/17/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 11/21/2023. Signed by Clerk on 4/17/2023. (Peterson, M)
April 17, 2023 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 4/17/23.(Hushin, Z.)
April 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rounds Speer Ammunition Cal: 40, Rounds Winchester-Western Ammunition Cal: 40, Glock GMBH 27Gen5 Pistol Cal: 40 SN BWBW076, filed by USA.(Nelson, David) Modified on 4/17/2023 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.).
April 17, 2023 Judge Omar A. Williams and Judge Robert A. Richardson added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Glock GMBH 27Gen5 Pistol Cal: 40 SN BWBW076 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: David Christopher Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glock GMBH 27Gen5 Pistol Cal: 40 SN BWBW076
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rounds Speer Ammunition Cal: 40
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rounds Winchester-Western Ammunition Cal: 40
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jean Carlo Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?