Castillo v. Merritt Healthcare Holdings, LLC
Plaintiff: Joseph Castillo
Defendant: Merritt Healthcare Holdings, LLC Agent of d/b/a Merritt Healthcare Advisors and Merritt Healthcare Holdings, LLC doing business as Merritt Healthcare Advisors
Case Number: 3:2023cv00489
Filed: April 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Referring Judge: Robert A Richardson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting First MOTION for Extension of Time (Doc. #14 ) until July 17, 2023 to Hold a 26(f) Conference and Amended Pleading Deadline. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/14/2023. (Lewis, D)
June 14, 2023 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 7/17/2023 Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/17/2023 (Lewis, D)
June 13, 2023 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time until July 17, 2023 to Hold a 26(f) Conference and Amended Pleading Deadline by Merritt Healthcare Holdings, LLC. (Seusing, Christopher)
June 13, 2023 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/5/2023 (Lewis, D)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting First MOTION for Extension of Time (doc. #12 ) until 6/26/2023 to Respond to Complaint (Doc. #1 ). Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/19/2023. (Lewis, D)
May 19, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Merritt Healthcare Holdings, LLC to 6/26/2023. (Lewis, D)
May 18, 2023 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/26/2023 to Respond to Complaint #1 Complaint by Merritt Healthcare Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint)(Seusing, Christopher)
April 27, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Castillo. Merritt Healthcare Holdings, LLC served on 4/21/2023, answer due 5/12/2023. (Comite, Erin)
April 19, 2023 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Merritt Healthcare Holdings, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Erin Green Comite* *Scott & Scott LLP - CT* *156 South Main Street, P. O. Box 192* *Colchester, CT 06415*. (Chartier, AnnMarie)
April 19, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #8 Protective Order, #2 Disclosure Statement filed by Joseph Castillo, #7 Electronic Filing Order, 5 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph Castillo, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph Castillo, #1 Complaint filed by Joseph Castillo Signed by Clerk on 4/19/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/18/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/18/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/17/2023 Discovery due by 10/18/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 11/22/2023 Signed by Clerk on 4/18/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
April 18, 2023 Filing 5 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 4/18/2023.(Perez, J.)
April 18, 2023 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer and Judge Robert A. Richardson added. (Oliver, T.)
April 18, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Anja Rusi on behalf of Joseph Castillo (Rusi, Anja)
April 18, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P. Guglielmo on behalf of Joseph Castillo (Guglielmo, Joseph)
April 18, 2023 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement as to Rule 7.1(a)(2) Parties or Intervenors in a Diversity Case by Joseph Castillo. (Comite, Erin)
April 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Merritt Healthcare Holdings, LLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7316738.), filed by Joseph Castillo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Comite, Erin)
April 18, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Merritt Healthcare Holdings, LLC. (d/b/a Merritt Healthcare Advisors) (Comite, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo v. Merritt Healthcare Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Castillo
Represented By: Anja Rusi
Represented By: Joseph P. Guglielmo
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merritt Healthcare Holdings, LLC Agent of d/b/a Merritt Healthcare Advisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merritt Healthcare Holdings, LLC doing business as Merritt Healthcare Advisors
Represented By: Christopher Seusing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?