Cavaliere v. Walmart Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joyce Cavaliere
Defendant: Walmart Inc. and Pele Edwards
Case Number: 3:2023cv00578
Filed: May 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Referring Judge: Robert A Richardson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2023 Filing 22 Case remanded to State Court: Judicial District of Stamford Superior Court. (Samson, Jessalyn)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/15/2023. (Rickevicius, L.)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss in light of ECF No.19 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/15/2023. (Rickevicius, L.)
June 14, 2023 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Joyce Cavaliere.(De Toledo, Victoria)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Amend/Correct. The amended complaint must be e-filed on or by 6/15/2023. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/14/2023. (Rickevicius, L.)
June 14, 2023 Set Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/15/2023. (Rickevicius, L.)
May 17, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Pele Edwards, Walmart Inc.. (Dwyer, Renee)
May 15, 2023 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Joyce Cavaliere. (De Toledo, Victoria)
May 11, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Joyce Cavaliere.Responses due by 6/1/2023 (De Toledo, Victoria)
May 11, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Joyce Cavaliere.Responses due by 6/1/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(De Toledo, Victoria)
May 11, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Pele Edwards, Walmart Inc..(Dwyer, Renee)
May 5, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #11 Protective Order, #3 Disclosure Statement filed by Walmart Inc., #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Pele Edwards, Walmart Inc., #10 Electronic Filing Order, #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Pele Edwards, Walmart Inc., #6 Notice (Other) filed by Pele Edwards, Walmart Inc., 8 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Pele Edwards, Walmart Inc., #4 Notice (Other) filed by Pele Edwards, Walmart Inc., #1 Notice of Removal filed by Pele Edwards, Walmart Inc. Signed by Clerk on 5/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Samson, Jessalyn)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/4/2023.(Samson, Jessalyn)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/4/2023.(Samson, Jessalyn)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/3/2023. Discovery due by 11/3/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 12/8/2023. Signed by Clerk on 5/4/2023.(Samson, Jessalyn)
May 4, 2023 Judge Robert N. Chatigny and Judge Robert A. Richardson added. (Oliver, T.)
May 4, 2023 Filing 8 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 5/4/23.(Hushin, Z.)
May 4, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Pele Edwards, Walmart Inc..Responses due by 5/25/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Dwyer, Renee)
May 4, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE by Pele Edwards, Walmart Inc. re: Civil & Miscellaneous Orders (Dwyer, Renee)
May 4, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by Pele Edwards, Walmart Inc. re: Standing Orders (Dwyer, Renee)
May 4, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by Pele Edwards, Walmart Inc. of Pending Motions (Dwyer, Renee)
May 4, 2023 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc.. (Dwyer, Renee)
May 4, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Renee Wocl Dwyer on behalf of Pele Edwards, Walmart Inc. (Dwyer, Renee)
May 4, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pele Edwards, Walmart Inc. from Stamford Superior Court, case number FST-CV23-6060748-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7336299, filed by Pele Edwards, Walmart Inc..(Dwyer, Renee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cavaliere v. Walmart Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Cavaliere
Represented By: Victoria De Toledo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Renee Wocl Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pele Edwards
Represented By: Renee Wocl Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?